This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2016 at 21:15:29 (UTC).

Eveready Battery Co Inc et al v. Dorco USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2015 Eveready Battery Co Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Dorco USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Michael P. Shea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-00493

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Schick Manufacturing, Inc.

Eveready Battery Co Inc

Defendants

Dorco USA, Inc.

Pace Shave

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan A. Harris

Attorney at Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP-HTFD

90 State House Square, 9Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103-3702

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

#17

#18

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Signed by Clerk on 12/1/15.(Johnson, D.) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of All Defendants by All Plaintiffs (Harris, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER. The Court GRANTS the Plaintiff's motion 14 for an extension of time until December 1, 2015, to serve Defendants. Further extensions are unlikely. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/30/15. (Bradley, K.) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/01/2015 to serve process by Eveready Battery Co Inc, Schick Manufacturing, Inc.. (Harris, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion 12 for an extension of time until October 2, 2015, to serve Defendants. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/31/15. (Bradley, K.) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/02/2015 for Service of Process by Eveready Battery Co Inc, Schick Manufacturing, Inc.. (Harris, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 10 Standing ORDER in Patent Cases. Signed by Clerk on 04/03/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Standing ORDER in Patent Cases: Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/03/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Pace Shave* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonathan A. Harris* *Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP-HTFD* *90 State House Square, 9th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103-3702*. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dorco USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonathan A. Harris* *Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP-HTFD* *90 State House Square, 9th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103-3702*. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Eveready Battery Co Inc, Schick Manufacturing, Inc., 4 Terminate Hearings, Electronic Filing Order, 1 Complaint filed by Eveready Battery Co Inc, Schick Manufacturing, Inc., 5 Protective Order, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 04/03/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent Form Completed (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/03/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/03/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 07/03/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2015; Discovery due by 10/3/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 11/2/2015. Signed by Clerk on 04/03/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eveready Battery Company, Inc., Schick Manufacturing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Energizer Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Eveready Battery Company, Inc. for Schick Manufacturing, Inc.; Corporate Parent Energizer Holdings, Inc. for Eveready Battery Company, Inc.. (Harris, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3560541.), filed by Eveready Battery Company, Inc., Schick Manufacturing, Inc..(Harris, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less