This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:46:52 (UTC).

Eva A. Garcia v. Trans Union LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2015 Eva A Garcia filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Trans Union LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00278

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eva A. Garcia

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group

Trans Union LLC

3Rd Party Defendant

Comfort Air Engineering, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin R. Bingham

Attorney at Bingham & Lea, P.C.

319 Maverick Street

San Antonio, TX 78212

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas A. Clarke

Attorney at Attorney at Law

8026 Vantage Drive, Suite 105

San Antonio, TX 78230

Allison Amie Reddoch

Attorney at Strasburger & Price LLP

2801 Network Blvd., Suite 600

Frisco, TX 75034

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Tiffanie Stegall Clausewitz

Attorney at The Rosenblatt Law Firm, P.C.

16719 Huebner Rd - Bldg 1

San Antonio, TX 78248

James D. Rosenblatt

Attorney at The Rosenblatt Law Firm, PC

16719 Huebner Rd. - Bldg 1

San Antonio, TX 78248

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7357784), filed by Eva A. Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bingham, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Eva A. Garcia. (Bingham, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group, Trans Union LLC. (wg) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney Allison Amie Reddoch added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) by Trans Union LLC.(Reddoch, Allison) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

#5

(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union LLC. (Reddoch, Allison) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

#6

(#6) Tolteca Enterprises' ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney Thomas A. Clarke added to party Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group (pty:dft) by Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group.(Clarke, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

#7

(#7) Order & Advisory for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court.( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/20/2015,), Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

#8

(#8) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Comfort Air Engineering, Inc., filed by Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group.(sf) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Third Party Complaint: Comfort Air Engineering, Inc.. (wg) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#24

(#24) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 23 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eva A. Garcia, Comfort Air Engineering, Inc., Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Comfort Air Engineering, Inc., Eva A. Garcia, Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bingham, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Eva A. Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bingham, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#21

(#21) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 20 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Trans Union LLC. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Reddoch, Allison) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#19

(#19) ORDER Vacating Hearing set for 10/14/2015. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (sf) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER: Status Conference reset for 10/14/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (sf) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#17

(#17) ORDER RE: 16 Notice of Settlement. The Court Orders to submit a Stipulation of Dismissal or an Agreed Judgment on or before October 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (sf) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Settlement by Eva A. Garcia (Bingham, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 23 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eva A. Garcia, Comfort Air Engineering, Inc., Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Comfort Air Engineering, Inc., Eva A. Garcia, Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bingham, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Eva A. Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bingham, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 20 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Trans Union LLC. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Reddoch, Allison) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER Vacating Hearing set for 10/14/2015. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (sf) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER: Status Conference reset for 10/14/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (sf) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER RE: 16 Notice of Settlement. The Court Orders to submit a Stipulation of Dismissal or an Agreed Judgment on or before October 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (sf) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Settlement by Eva A. Garcia (Bingham, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Attorney Vacation Letter by Comfort Air Engineering, Inc. (Clausewitz, Tiffanie) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Original ANSWER to 8 Third Party Complaint . Attorney Tiffanie Stegall Clausewitz added to party Comfort Air Engineering, Inc.(pty:3pd) by Comfort Air Engineering, Inc..(Clausewitz, Tiffanie) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Third Party Complaint: Comfort Air Engineering, Inc.. (wg) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Comfort Air Engineering, Inc., filed by Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group.(sf) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order & Advisory for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court.( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/20/2015,), Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Tolteca Enterprises' ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney Thomas A. Clarke added to party Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group (pty:dft) by Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group.(Clarke, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union LLC. (Reddoch, Allison) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney Allison Amie Reddoch added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) by Trans Union LLC.(Reddoch, Allison) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a The Phoenix Recovery Group, Trans Union LLC. (wg) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Eva A. Garcia. (Bingham, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7357784), filed by Eva A. Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bingham, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.