This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2016 at 01:09:59 (UTC).

Ernesto Espinoza v. Leo Apotheker et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2011 Ernesto Espinoza filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Leo Apotheker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block and Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:11-CV-01454

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block

Judge

Judge Andrew J. Guilford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ernesto Espinoza

Consolidated Plaintiff

Larry Salat

Defendants

Gary M Reiner

Marc L Andreessen

Sari M Baldauf

R Todd Bradley

Catherine A Lesjak

Dominique Senequier

Hewlett Packard Company

Leo Apotheker

Shumeet Banerji

John H Hammergren

Lawrence T Babbio, Jr

Ann M Livermore

Rajiv L Gupta

Raymond J Lane

Margaret C Whitman

Patricia F Russo

G Kennedy Thompson

In Re

Hewlett-Packard Company Shareholder Derivative Litigation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank J Johnson

Attorney at Johnson and Weaver LLP

600 West Broadway, Suite 1540

San Diego, CA 92101

Julia M Williams

Attorney at Robbins Arroyo LLP

600 B Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Kevin S Kim

Attorney at Robbins Arroyo LLP

600 B Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Shane P Sanders

Attorney at Robbins Arroyo LLP

600 B Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

In Re and Defendant Attorneys

Robert Elliot Gooding, Jr

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

5 Park Plaza Suite 1750

Irvine, CA 92614

Eric S Waxman

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher and Flom LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3144

Kevin P Muck

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Marie Bafus

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

555 California Street 12Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Tahir I Golden

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

555 California Street 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Boris Feldman

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Katherine L Henderson

Attorney at Wilson Sonsinni Goodrich and Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Daniel S Floyd

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue 46Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David Samuel Han

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Dean J Kitchens

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Jennifer R Bagosy

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

5 Park Plaza Suite 1750

Irvine, CA 92614

Marc J Sonnenfeld

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

Monique E Cho

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 S Grand Avenue Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Todd William Smith

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

5 Park Plaza Suite 1750

Irvine, CA 92614

Gregory J Weingart

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

355 South Grand Avenue 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Laura Wirth

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

355 South Grand Avenue 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Verified Shareholder Derivative COMPLAINT against defendants, nominal defendant Marc L Andreessen, Leo Apotheker, Lawrence T Babbio, Jr, Sari M Baldauf, Shumeet Banerji, Rajiv L Gupta, John H Hammergren, Hewlett Packard Company, Raymond J Lane, Catherine A Lesjak, Ann M Livermore, Gary M Reiner, Patricia F Russo, Dominique Senequier, G Kennedy Thompson, Margaret C Whitman. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato.(Filing fee $ 350 paid) Jury Demand., filed by plaintiff Ernesto Espinoza.(twdb) (twdb). (Entered: 09/22/2011)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ernesto Espinoza (twdb) (twdb). (Entered: 09/22/2011)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 08-05 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as SACV11-01454 DOC (ANx). (ade) (Entered: 10/03/2011)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Elliot Gooding, Jr on behalf of Defendant Hewlett Packard Company (Gooding, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jennifer R Bagosy on behalf of Defendant Hewlett Packard Company (Bagosy, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/03/2011)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Monique E Cho on behalf of Defendant Hewlett Packard Company (Cho, Monique) (Entered: 10/03/2011)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV11-01404 AG (RNBx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV11-01454 AG (RNBx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (dro) (Entered: 10/11/2011)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hewlett Packard Company answer now due 11/11/2011, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Hewlett Packard Company.(Bagosy, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/12/2011)

#9

(#9) APPLICATION for attorney Jill M. Baisinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Hewlett Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case - Baisinger)(Bagosy, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/21/2011)

#101

(#101) NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Catherine A Lesjak. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants Leo Apotheker, R. Todd Bradley and Catherine A. Lesjak's Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint)(Schatz, Steven) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#102

(#102) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Nominal Defendant Hewlett Packard Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Floyd, Daniel) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#103

(#103) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Directors' Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendants Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T Babbio, Jr, Sari M Baldauf, Shumeet Banerji, Rajiv L Gupta, John H Hammergren, Raymond J Lane, Ann M Livermore, Gary M Reiner, Patricia F Russo, Dominique Senequier, G Kennedy Thompson, Margaret C Whitman. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Waxman, Eric) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#104

(#104) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case Directors' Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint 103 , Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case 101 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 102 filed by Defendant Leo Apotheker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Wirth, Laura) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#105

(#105) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File (1) an Omnibus Brief in Opposition to All Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint; (2) to Extend Page Limits for Omnibus Opposition Brief; and (3) to Modify Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Ernesto Espinoza, Larry Salat. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sanders, Shane) (Entered: 01/02/2015)

#106

(#106) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Todd William Smith on behalf of Defendant Hewlett Packard Company (Attorney Todd William Smith added to party Hewlett Packard Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Todd) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

#107

(#107) ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Modifying Briefing and Hearing on Motions to Dismiss 105 . ( Motions reset for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) See Order for more information. (twdb) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#108

(#108) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 23.1(c) filed by Plaintiffs Ernesto Espinoza, Larry Salat. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sanders, Shane) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#109

(#109) ORDER Regarding Voluntary Dismissal of Action by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of the Action 108 , the Court hereby Orders as follows: 1. Notice of this Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal and Order shall be: (i) included in a Form 8-K filed with the U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission; and (ii) posted on the "Investor Relations" page of Hewlett-Packard Inc.'s website for a period of at least two weeks. 2. In the event no shareholder seeks to intervene within thirty (30) days of issuance of the notice, this Action shall be dismissed on the terms provided for in this Stipulation and Order, with prejudice as to Plaintiffs but otherwise without prejudice as to Hewlett Packard and/or any other Hewlett-Packard shareholders. 3. The Parties shall bear their own fees and costs in connection with the Action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) ORDER Regarding Voluntary Dismissal of Action by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of the Action 108 , the Court hereby Orders as follows: 1. Notice of this Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal and Order shall be: (i) included in a Form 8-K filed with the U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission; and (ii) posted on the "Investor Relations" page of Hewlett-Packard Inc.'s website for a period of at least two weeks. 2. In the event no shareholder seeks to intervene within thirty (30) days of issuance of the notice, this Action shall be dismissed on the terms provided for in this Stipulation and Order, with prejudice as to Plaintiffs but otherwise without prejudice as to Hewlett Packard and/or any other Hewlett-Packard shareholders. 3. The Parties shall bear their own fees and costs in connection with the Action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 23.1(c) filed by Plaintiffs Ernesto Espinoza, Larry Salat. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sanders, Shane) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Modifying Briefing and Hearing on Motions to Dismiss 105 . ( Motions reset for hearing on 4/27/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) See Order for more information. (twdb) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Todd William Smith on behalf of Defendant Hewlett Packard Company (Attorney Todd William Smith added to party Hewlett Packard Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Todd) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File (1) an Omnibus Brief in Opposition to All Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint; (2) to Extend Page Limits for Omnibus Opposition Brief; and (3) to Modify Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Ernesto Espinoza, Larry Salat. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sanders, Shane) (Entered: 01/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case Directors' Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint 103 , Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case 101 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 102 filed by Defendant Leo Apotheker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Wirth, Laura) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Directors' Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendants Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T Babbio, Jr, Sari M Baldauf, Shumeet Banerji, Rajiv L Gupta, John H Hammergren, Raymond J Lane, Ann M Livermore, Gary M Reiner, Patricia F Russo, Dominique Senequier, G Kennedy Thompson, Margaret C Whitman. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Waxman, Eric) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Nominal Defendant Hewlett Packard Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Floyd, Daniel) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Catherine A Lesjak. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants Leo Apotheker, R. Todd Bradley and Catherine A. Lesjak's Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint)(Schatz, Steven) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Elliot Gooding, Jr counsel for In Re Hewlett-Packard Company Shareholder Derivative Litigation. Jennifer Bagosy is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Robert E. Gooding, Jr.. (Attorney Robert Elliot Gooding, Jr added to party Hewlett-Packard Company Shareholder Derivative Litigation(pty:inre))(Gooding, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION for attorney Karen Pieslak Pohlmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Hewlett Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case - Pohlmann)(Bagosy, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION for attorney Jill M. Baisinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Hewlett Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case - Baisinger)(Bagosy, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hewlett Packard Company answer now due 11/11/2011, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Hewlett Packard Company.(Bagosy, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/12/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV11-01404 AG (RNBx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV11-01454 AG (RNBx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (dro) (Entered: 10/11/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Monique E Cho on behalf of Defendant Hewlett Packard Company (Cho, Monique) (Entered: 10/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jennifer R Bagosy on behalf of Defendant Hewlett Packard Company (Bagosy, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Elliot Gooding, Jr on behalf of Defendant Hewlett Packard Company (Gooding, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 08-05 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as SACV11-01454 DOC (ANx). (ade) (Entered: 10/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ernesto Espinoza (twdb) (twdb). (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Verified Shareholder Derivative COMPLAINT against defendants, nominal defendant Marc L Andreessen, Leo Apotheker, Lawrence T Babbio, Jr, Sari M Baldauf, Shumeet Banerji, Rajiv L Gupta, John H Hammergren, Hewlett Packard Company, Raymond J Lane, Catherine A Lesjak, Ann M Livermore, Gary M Reiner, Patricia F Russo, Dominique Senequier, G Kennedy Thompson, Margaret C Whitman. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato.(Filing fee $ 350 paid) Jury Demand., filed by plaintiff Ernesto Espinoza.(twdb) (twdb). (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HP INC., fka Hewlett-Packard Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julia M. Williams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin S Kim

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shane Palmesano Sanders