This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:16:43 (UTC).

Ericsson Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2015 Ericsson Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00289

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants

Ericsson Inc.

Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson

Counter Claimant

Apple Inc.

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

David Keyzer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Aaron R Hand

Brandon Goble Shelton

Joseph John Fraresso

Mike McKool

Theodore Stevenson, III

Henry Charles Bunsow

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ruffin B Cordell

Allen Franklin Gardner

Benjamin Charles Elacqua

Benjamin K Thompson

Clayton C James

David McDonald Prichard

Jackob Ben-Ezra

Jacqueline Tio

Jane J Du

Leah A Edelman

Matthew R McCullough

Melissa Richards Smith

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

David Folsom

David Michael Keyzer

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#108

#109

#110

#111

#112

#113

#114

#115

#116

115 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/29/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#116) REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: settled(Folsom, David) (Entered: 12/29/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#115) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#114) ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#113) ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#112) Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Claims and Counterclaims by Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunsow, Henry) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#111) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 98 MOTION to Strike Apple Inc.'s Indefiniteness Contentions In the Joint Claim Construction Statement filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10)(Elacqua, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#110) REPLY to Response to Motion re 98 MOTION to Strike Apple Inc.'s Indefiniteness Contentions In the Joint Claim Construction Statement filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Hand, Aaron) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#109) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Apple Inc. (Bufe, John) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#108) Submission of Joint Claim Construction Chart - P.R. 4-5(d) by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Hand, Aaron) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#107) SEALED OPPOSITION to Motion re 98 MOTION to Strike Apple Inc.'s Indefiniteness Contentions In the Joint Claim Construction Statement filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Elacqua, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
96 More Docket Entries
03/05/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mike McKool on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (McKool, Mike) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas A Cawley on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bunsow, Henry) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron R Hand on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Hand, Aaron) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Denise M De Mory on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (De Mory, Denise) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Corporate Parent Ericsson Holding II Inc. for Ericsson Inc.; Corporate Parent None for Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Bunsow, Henry) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/27/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2015
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5077037.), filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bunsow, Henry) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less