This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:53:01 (UTC).

Enventure Global Technology, Inc. v. Mohawk Energy, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2015 Enventure Global Technology, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mohawk Energy, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:15-CV-01053

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Vanessa D Gilmore

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Enventure Global Technology, Inc.

Counter Claimants

Andrei Filippov

Mohawk Energy, Ltd.

Scott Benzie

3Rd Party Defendants

Shell International Exploration and Production, Inc.

Shell Oil Company

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Claimant

Mohawk Energy, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Myall S Hawkins

Richard V. Wells

Sean Alan Roberts

Lisa H Meyerhoff

Counter Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Ernest W Boyd, Jr

Corey Jacob Seel

Gordon T Arnold

James Collins Ferrell

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Tyler T VanHoutan

John R Keville

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#43

#44

#45

#46

#47

#48

#49

#50

#51

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Shell International Exploration and Production, Inc. 3/7/2016; Shell Oil Company 3/7/2016. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Shell International Exploration and Production, Inc., Shell Oil Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(VanHoutan, Tyler) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Keville on behalf of Shell International Exploration and Production, Inc., Shell Oil Company, filed. (Keville, John) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER denying 39 Motion for Protective Order. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond; Answer due for Shell Oil Company and Shell International Exploration and Production, Inc. 2/29/2016. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) RESPONSE to 41 Amended Answer (Enventure Global Technology, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Mohawk Energy, Ltd.s First Amended Counterclaims), filed by Enventure Global Technology, Inc.. (Meyerhoff, Lisa) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shell International Exploration and Production, Inc., Shell Oil Company identifying Parent Corporation of Third-Party Defendant Shell Oil Company is Royal Dutch Shell PLC and Parent Corporation of Third-Party Defendant Shell International Exploration and Production Inc. is Shell Oil Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(VanHoutan, Tyler) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Third-Party Mohawk Energy, Ltd.'s Third Party Complaint by Shell International Exploration and Production, Inc., Shell Oil Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(VanHoutan, Tyler) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Joint Claim Construction Statement (P.R.4-3) by Enventure Global Technology, Inc., filed. (Meyerhoff, Lisa) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) RESPONSE in Opposition to 39 MOTION for Protective Order, 40 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Enventure Global Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 cited case, # 2 Declaration of Myall Hawkins, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Hawkins Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Hawkins Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Hawkins Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Hawkins Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Hawkins Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Hawkins Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Hawkins Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 8 to Hawkins Declaration, # 11 Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint by Andrei Filippov, Mohawk Energy, Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Boyd, Ernest) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FILED IN ERROR SEE DOCKET ENTRY 10 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Andrei Filippov, Mohawk Energy, Ltd., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Boyd, Ernest) Modified on 6/17/2015 (gkelner, 4). (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Andrei Filippov, Mohawk Energy, Ltd., filed.(Boyd, Ernest) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Answer due for All Defendants by 6/18/2015.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint/Other Miscellaneous Relief ( Filing fee $ 46 receipt number 0541-14861155.) filed by Andrei Filippov, Mohawk Energy, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, Ernest) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Agreed CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enventure Global Technology, Inc., filed.(Meyerhoff, Lisa) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/4/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) (Attachments: # 1 Judge's Procedure) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 04/24/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Myall S. Hawkins on behalf of Enventure Global Technology, Inc., filed. (Hawkins, Myall) (Entered: 04/24/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrei Filippov, Mohawk Energy, Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-14757032) filed by Enventure Global Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meyerhoff, Lisa) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less