Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 05:45:02 (UTC).

Enovsys LLC v. Nextel Communications

Case Summary

On 08/23/2006 Enovsys LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Nextel Communications. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:06-CV-05306

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Ronald S.W. Lew

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman

 

Party Details

Defendant

Nextel South Corporation

Counter Defendant

Enovsys LLC

Counter Claimants

Sprint Spectrum L P

Nextel Communications Inc

Sprint Solutions Inc

Nextel of California Inc

Nextel of New York Inc

Nextel of Texas Inc

Nextel South Corp

Sprint Nextel Corporation

Nextel West Corp

Nextel Communications

Nextel Communications of the Mid-Atlantic Inc

Sprint Communications Company LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

John Allcock

Randall E Kay

Michael K Han

Erica Pascal

Donald R. Dunner

Andrew J Vance

Edward J Marshall

Meredith J Fitzpatrick

Joshua M Briones

Raymond W Mort, III

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Gregory S Dovel

John Jeffrey Eichmann

Manuel C Nelson

Minda R Schechter

Bruce G Chapman

Keith Douglas Fraser

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendant Nextel Communications.(Filing fee $350.00 paid) Jury Demanded , filed by plaintiff Enovsys LLC.(pcl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Enovsys LLC. (pcl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(pcl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Enovsys LLC. Related Case(s): CV 06-3402 RSWL (SHx) (rn, ) (Entered: 09/01/2006)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Enovsys LLC, upon Nextel Communications Inc, a Delaware corporation; served on 8/24/2006, answer due 9/13/2006. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure statute, upon Mary Drummond, Process Agent, Authorized to Accept Service of Process. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/06/2006)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 06-3402 RSWL (SHx). Case transfered from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Carolyn Turchin to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and Stephen J. Hillman for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 06-5306 RSWL (SHx).Signed by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew (rn, ) (Entered: 09/06/2006)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM against Enovsys LLC; filed by defendant Nextel Communications.(mg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2006)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nextel Communications. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2006)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Nextel Communications, re Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim 7 , Certificate of Interested Parties 8 ; served on 9/13/06. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2006)

#438

(#438) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 02-13-08, 9:02 a.m. (Amber, Leandra) (Entered: 02/02/2009)

#439

(#439) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings May 16, 2008 @ 4:20 p.m. (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 02/03/2009)

#440

(#440) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on May 16, 2008 @ 4:20 p.m.. Court Reporter: Victoria L. Valine, CSR, RMR, CRR, phone number www.victoriavalinecsr.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 02/03/2009)

#441

(#441) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings May 16, 2008 @ 4:20 p.m. (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 02/03/2009)

#442

(#442) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46) 439 (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 02/03/2009)

#443

(#443) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Enovsys LLC, re Confidential Exhibits 15-18 to the Declaration of Jeff Eichmann in support of Plaintiff Enovsys' opening claim construction brief 187 served on 12/28/07. (cbr) (Entered: 07/06/2010)

#444

(#444) MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 433 ; CCA # 2009-1167. The decision of the district court is affirmed. Mandate received in this district on 10/15/2010. (dmap) (Entered: 10/21/2010)

#445

(#445) NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Dismiss all claims and counterclaims of Plaintiff and Defendants filed by Plaintiff Enovsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed order of dismissal)(Eichmann, John) (Entered: 10/29/2010)

#446

(#446) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice all Claims and Counterclaims 445 asserted between Plaintiff Counter Defendant and Defendants, Counter Claimants, and the Court being of the opinion that said motion should be GRANTED, that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, Counter Defendant Enovsys LLC and Defendants, Counter claimants Sprint Spectrum L.P., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp., Nextel of California, Inc., Nextel Communications, Inc., Nextel Communications of The Mid-Atlantic, Inc., Nextel of New York, Inc., Nextel South Corp., Nextel of Texas, Inc., and Nextel West Corp., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by theparty that incurred them. (jp) (Entered: 11/02/2010)

446 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#446) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice all Claims and Counterclaims 445 asserted between Plaintiff Counter Defendant and Defendants, Counter Claimants, and the Court being of the opinion that said motion should be GRANTED, that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, Counter Defendant Enovsys LLC and Defendants, Counter claimants Sprint Spectrum L.P., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp., Nextel of California, Inc., Nextel Communications, Inc., Nextel Communications of The Mid-Atlantic, Inc., Nextel of New York, Inc., Nextel South Corp., Nextel of Texas, Inc., and Nextel West Corp., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by theparty that incurred them. (jp) (Entered: 11/02/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#445) NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Dismiss all claims and counterclaims of Plaintiff and Defendants filed by Plaintiff Enovsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed order of dismissal)(Eichmann, John) (Entered: 10/29/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#444) MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 433 ; CCA # 2009-1167. The decision of the district court is affirmed. Mandate received in this district on 10/15/2010. (dmap) (Entered: 10/21/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#443) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Enovsys LLC, re Confidential Exhibits 15-18 to the Declaration of Jeff Eichmann in support of Plaintiff Enovsys' opening claim construction brief 187 served on 12/28/07. (cbr) (Entered: 07/06/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#442) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46) 439 (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 02/03/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#441) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings May 16, 2008 @ 4:20 p.m. (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 02/03/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#440) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on May 16, 2008 @ 4:20 p.m.. Court Reporter: Victoria L. Valine, CSR, RMR, CRR, phone number www.victoriavalinecsr.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 02/03/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#439) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings May 16, 2008 @ 4:20 p.m. (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 02/03/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#438) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 02-13-08, 9:02 a.m. (Amber, Leandra) (Entered: 02/02/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#437) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-13-08, 9:02 a.m. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 613-0179. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2009. (Amber, Leandra) (Entered: 02/02/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
425 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER TO Counterclaim 7 ; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Enovsys LLC.(yl, ) (Entered: 09/21/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Nextel Communications, re Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim 7 , Certificate of Interested Parties 8 ; served on 9/13/06. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nextel Communications. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM against Enovsys LLC; filed by defendant Nextel Communications.(mg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 06-3402 RSWL (SHx). Case transfered from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Carolyn Turchin to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and Stephen J. Hillman for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 06-5306 RSWL (SHx).Signed by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew (rn, ) (Entered: 09/06/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiff Enovsys LLC, upon Nextel Communications Inc, a Delaware corporation; served on 8/24/2006, answer due 9/13/2006. The Summons and Complaint were served by personal service, by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure statute, upon Mary Drummond, Process Agent, Authorized to Accept Service of Process. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/06/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Enovsys LLC. Related Case(s): CV 06-3402 RSWL (SHx) (rn, ) (Entered: 09/01/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(pcl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Enovsys LLC. (pcl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendant Nextel Communications.(Filing fee $350.00 paid) Jury Demanded , filed by plaintiff Enovsys LLC.(pcl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEXTEL OF TEXAS, INC. D/B/A SPRINT NEXTEL CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where NEXTEL COMMUINCATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where NEXTEL SOUTH CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION is a litigant