This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:03:23 (UTC).

Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation v. Runway Safe LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2015 Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Runway Safe LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00546

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

Runway Safe Inc.

Runway Safe LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Richard W. Goldstucker

Attorney at Kilpatrick, Townsend & Stockton, LLP

1100 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Steven J. Wingard

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, L.L.P.

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Paige Arnette Amstutz

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Russell A. Korn

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

1100 Peachtree Street, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309-4528

Stephen E. McConnico

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Frederick L. Whitmer

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

31 West 52Nd St., 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan D Albright

Attorney at Bracewell & Giuliani LLP

111 Congress Ave., Suite 2300

Austin, TX 78701

Christopher J. Fahy

Attorney at Quarles & Brady, LLP

300 N. Lasalle St.

Chicago, IL 60654

Matthew T. Ingersoll

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

300 North Lasalle St.

Chicago, IL 60654

Richard W. Young

Attorney at Quarles & Brady, LLP

300 N Lasalle St.

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael H. Fleck

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

300 North Lasalle Street, Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7552553). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

#3

(#3) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (afd) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

#4

(#4) Letters to Frederick L. Whitmer and Richard Goldstucker re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

#5

(#5) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for Richard W. Goldstucker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7588326) by on behalf of Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard W. Goldstucker. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for Frederick L. Whitmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7610292) by on behalf of Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Frederick L. Whitmer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#69

(#69) NOTICE of Decision in IPR2015-01921 For U.S. Patent No. 7,597,502 by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

#68

(#68) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel, ADR Report Deadline due by 4/16/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2016, Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2016, Expert Discovery due by 7/15/16, Joinder of Parties due by 3/11/2016, Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2016. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (os) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#67

(#67) NOTICE Parties' Joint Claim Construction Statement by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#66

(#66) Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed by Parties by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#65

(#65) ORDER LIFTING STAY, ( Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/12/2016 at 09:00AM before Judge Lee Yeakel). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#64

(#64) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Conference Call held on 2/10/2016. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(dm) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#63

(#63) Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 15, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 2/24/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2016, (Rodriguez, Arlinda) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#62

(#62) STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Discovery by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

#61

(#61) ORDER Cancelling Technology Tutorial, ( Claim Construction Hearing reset for 4/13/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel,). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) NOTICE of Decision in IPR2015-01921 For U.S. Patent No. 7,597,502 by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel, ADR Report Deadline due by 4/16/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2016, Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2016, Expert Discovery due by 7/15/16, Joinder of Parties due by 3/11/2016, Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2016. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (os) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) NOTICE Parties' Joint Claim Construction Statement by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed by Parties by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) ORDER LIFTING STAY, ( Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/12/2016 at 09:00AM before Judge Lee Yeakel). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Conference Call held on 2/10/2016. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(dm) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 15, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 2/24/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2016, (Rodriguez, Arlinda) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Discovery by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) ORDER Cancelling Technology Tutorial, ( Claim Construction Hearing reset for 4/13/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel,). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) EXHIBITS by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (dm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2016: # 1 Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Exhibits 6-7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibits 9-12, # 5 Exhibits 13-15, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibits 17-20, # 8 Exhibits 21-22, # 9 Exhibits 23-29, # 10 Exhibit 30, # 11 Exhibit 31a, # 12 Exhibit 31b, # 13 Exhibit 32a, # 14 Exhibit 32b, # 15 Exhibit 32c, # 16 Exhibit 32d, # 17 Exhibits 101-103, # 18 Exhibit 104, # 19 Exhibits 105-108, # 20 Exhibit 109) (klw). (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Frederick L. Whitmer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for Frederick L. Whitmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7610292) by on behalf of Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard W. Goldstucker. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for Richard W. Goldstucker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7588326) by on behalf of Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letters to Frederick L. Whitmer and Richard Goldstucker re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (afd) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7552553). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Engineered Arresting Systems Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.