This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 09:51:52 (UTC).

Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island et al v. Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2015 Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-07006

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island

Defendants

Citigroup Global Markets Inc.

Jefferies LLC

Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc.

SG Americas Securities, LLC

Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.

Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC

Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency

Goldman, Sachs & Co.

RBS Securities Inc.

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

Barclays Capital Inc.

Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.

Countrywide Securities Corporation

HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.

BMO Capital Markets Corp.

UBS Securities LLC

TD Securities (USA) LLC

BNP Paribas Securities Corp.

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randi Dawn Bandman

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP (LA)

9601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 510

Los Angeles, CA 90210

Defendant Attorneys

Jay B. Kasner

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

David C. Esseks

Attorney at Allen & Overy, LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Todd Steven Fishman

Attorney at Allen & Overy, LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Omari Largos Royter Mason

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

425 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10017

Thomas C. Rice

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

David J. Woll

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Richard C. Pepperman, II

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Susannah Providence Torpey

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Penny Shane

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Stephen Ehrenberg

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Greg Donald Andres

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Joel Murray Cohen

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

David Harold Braff

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Matthew Alexander Schwartz

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

David A. Paul

Attorney at Cantor Fitzgerald

110 East 59Th Street

New York, NY 10022

Jennifer Kennedy Park

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Gabrielle Frances Levin

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Edward Nathaniel Moss

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP(NYC)

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Other Attorneys

Jerome Steven Fortinsky

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP (NY)

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

40 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11354609)Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island.(Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Samuel H. Rudman re: that this action be filed as related to 15-cv-05794. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated.(Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barclays Capital Inc., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BMO Capital Markets Corp., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#135

(#135) ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate the above-captioned actions under Case No. 15 Civ. 5794 (PGG). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/15/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(ama) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#134

(#134) ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 121 Motion for Brian O. O'Mara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2015) (mro) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#133

(#133) ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 122 Motion for David W. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2015) (mro) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#132

(#132) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 124 Motion for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/08/2015) (ama) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#131

(#131) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Adam Kirsch on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Kirsch, Mark) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#130

(#130) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas, Inc., Other Affiliate UBS Group AG for UBS Securities LLC. Document filed by UBS Securities LLC.(Levin, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#129

(#129) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabrielle Frances Levin on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Levin, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#128

(#128) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Nomura Holding America Inc. for Nomura Securities International, Inc.. Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc..(Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

#127

(#127) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Lyon Holley on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#135) ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate the above-captioned actions under Case No. 15 Civ. 5794 (PGG). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/15/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-05794-PGG et al.(ama) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#134) ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 121 Motion for Brian O. O'Mara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2015) (mro) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#133) ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 122 Motion for David W. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2015) (mro) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#132) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 124 Motion for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/08/2015) (ama) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Adam Kirsch on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Kirsch, Mark) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas, Inc., Other Affiliate UBS Group AG for UBS Securities LLC. Document filed by UBS Securities LLC.(Levin, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabrielle Frances Levin on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Levin, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Nomura Holding America Inc. for Nomura Securities International, Inc.. Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc..(Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Lyon Holley on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Flug Davidoff on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Davidoff, Amanda) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Countrywide Securities Corporation, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BMO Capital Markets Corp., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barclays Capital Inc., re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Samuel H. Rudman re: that this action be filed as related to 15-cv-05794. Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated.(Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11354609)Document filed by Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island.(Rudman, Samuel) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.