This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:41:06 (UTC).

Elynne Moore, Lucretia Vanderwende Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2015 Elynne Moore, Lucretia Vanderwende was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00284

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Suzanne J Hornish

Thomas E Hornish

Sammamish 4257 LLC

Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust

1237 E Lk Sammamish Shore Ln Se

Sammamish, WA 98075

Sammamish Homeowners

Defendant

County of King

Counter Defendants

Elynne Moore

Lucretia Vanderwende

Elizabeth Morel

Tracy Neighbors

Barbara Neighbors

Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC

Eugene Morel

Hebert Moore

Arul Menezes

Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust

1237 E Lk Sammamish Shore Ln Se

Sammamish, WA 98075

Counter Claimant

King County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Daryl Allan Deutsch

Attorney at RODGERS DEUTSCH & TURNER

Three Lake Bellevue Drive, Ste 100

Bellevue, WA 98005

Thomas S. Stewart

Attorney at STEWART WALD & MCCULLEY LLC

2100 Central, Suite 22

Kansas City, MO 64108

Michael J Smith

Attorney at STEWART WALD & MCCULLEY, LLC

100 N. Broadway, Suite 1850

St. Louis, MO 63102

Thomas E Hornish

Attorney at TEH SERVICES LLC

1237 E Lk Sammamish Shore Ln Se

Sammamish, WA 98075

Elizabeth G McCulley

Attorney at STEWART WALD & MCCULLEY LLC

2100 Central, Suite 22

Kansas City, MO 64108

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

H Kevin Wright

Attorney at KING COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE - THIRD AVE

516 Third Avenue, Rm W400

Seattle, WA 98104

Peter George Ramels

Attorney at KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (3RD AVE)

516 3Rd Ave, W554 King County Courthouse

Seattle, WA 98104

David JW Hackett

Attorney at KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

500 4Th Ave, Ste 900

Seattle, WA 98104-5039

Barbara Flemming

Attorney at KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

500 4Th Ave, Ste 900

Seattle, WA 98104-5039

Emily J Harris

David Ian Freeburg

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-3922580) Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Arul Menezes(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Elynne Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Hebert Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Barbara Neighbors(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Tracy Neighbors(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Sammamish Homeowners(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish, Trustees (pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Lucretia Vanderwende(pty:pla), filed by Lucretia Vanderwende, Tracy Neighbors, Hebert Moore, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish, Trustees, Elynne Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, Arul Menezes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Deutsch, Daryl) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

#2

(#2) Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) King County. (ST) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas S. Stewart FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Suzanne J Hornish, Thomas E Hornish, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, Lucretia Vanderwende (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3924818 (Deutsch, Daryl) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth McCulley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Suzanne J Hornish, Thomas E Hornish, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, Lucretia Vanderwende (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3924829 (Deutsch, Daryl) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER re 3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas S. Stewart for Suzanne J Hornish, Thomas E Hornish, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, for Lucretia Vanderwende, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#6

(#6) ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth G McCulley for Suzanne J Hornish, Thomas E Hornish, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, and for Lucretia Vanderwende, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Suzanne J Hornish, Thomas E Hornish, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, Lucretia Vanderwende (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David JW Hackett on behalf of Defendant King County. (Hackett, David) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss FRCP 12(b)(1) and (6) for Lack of Standing by Defendant King County. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2) Noting Date 4/17/2015, (Hackett, David) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

#57

(#57) MOTION TO RENOTE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT for March 11, 2016 by Plaintiffs Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Elizabeth Morel, Eugene Morel, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust, Lucretia Vanderwende. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

#58

(#58) DISREGARD. FILED IN WRONG CASE. DOCUMENT HAS INCORRECT CASE NUMBER AND CAPTION NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT KING COUNTY ; filed by Plaintiffs Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Elizabeth Morel, Eugene Morel, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust, Lucretia Vanderwende. (Stewart, Thomas) Modified on 3/3/2016 to strike per phone call from counsel(PM). (Entered: 03/03/2016)

#59

(#59) ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting plaintiffs' 57 Motion to Re-note Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support. Plaintiffs' 55 Motion for Summary Judgment is RE-NOTED for 3/11/2016. (PM) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

#60

(#60) NOTICE of Hearing 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT : ORAL ARGUMENT/Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Each side is allowed 30 minutes for argument, including rebuttal. (RM) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

#61

(#61) RESPONSE, by Counter Claimant King County, Defendant King County, to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Harris, Emily) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

#62

(#62) REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Elizabeth Morel, Eugene Morel, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust, Lucretia Vanderwende, TO RESPONSE to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

#63

(#63) NOTICE of Continued Hearing 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT : Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

#64

(#64) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Thomas Stewart, Elizabeth McCulley; Def Counsel: David Freeburg, Emily Harris, David Hackett; CR: Nancy Bauer; Motion Hearing held on 4/14/2016 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Eugene Morel, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Lucretia Vanderwende, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust, Hebert Moore, Arul Menezes, Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC, Elizabeth Morel, Elynne Moore, 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by King County. Oral argument presented. Court will issue written opinion in ten days. (RM) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

#65

(#65) ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting Defendant King County's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. From the Court's reading of Plaintiffs' amended complaint, this ruling resolves the issues raised by their litigation. If there are issues remaining to be decided, the parties are invited to bring them to the Court's attention. If not, Defendant is directed to submit a judgment reflecting the outcome of these dispositive motions and terminating the lawsuit. (PM) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting Defendant King County's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. From the Court's reading of Plaintiffs' amended complaint, this ruling resolves the issues raised by their litigation. If there are issues remaining to be decided, the parties are invited to bring them to the Court's attention. If not, Defendant is directed to submit a judgment reflecting the outcome of these dispositive motions and terminating the lawsuit. (PM) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Thomas Stewart, Elizabeth McCulley; Def Counsel: David Freeburg, Emily Harris, David Hackett; CR: Nancy Bauer; Motion Hearing held on 4/14/2016 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Eugene Morel, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Lucretia Vanderwende, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust, Hebert Moore, Arul Menezes, Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC, Elizabeth Morel, Elynne Moore, 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by King County. Oral argument presented. Court will issue written opinion in ten days. (RM) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) NOTICE of Continued Hearing 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT : Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Elizabeth Morel, Eugene Morel, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust, Lucretia Vanderwende, TO RESPONSE to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) RESPONSE, by Counter Claimant King County, Defendant King County, to 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Harris, Emily) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) NOTICE of Hearing 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT : ORAL ARGUMENT/Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Each side is allowed 30 minutes for argument, including rebuttal. (RM) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting plaintiffs' 57 Motion to Re-note Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support. Plaintiffs' 55 Motion for Summary Judgment is RE-NOTED for 3/11/2016. (PM) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) DISREGARD. FILED IN WRONG CASE. DOCUMENT HAS INCORRECT CASE NUMBER AND CAPTION NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT KING COUNTY ; filed by Plaintiffs Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Elizabeth Morel, Eugene Morel, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust, Lucretia Vanderwende. (Stewart, Thomas) Modified on 3/3/2016 to strike per phone call from counsel(PM). (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) MOTION TO RENOTE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT for March 11, 2016 by Plaintiffs Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Elizabeth Morel, Eugene Morel, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust, Lucretia Vanderwende. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) REPLY, filed by Counter Claimant King County, Defendant King County, TO RESPONSE to 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Harris, Emily) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. All pleadings filed in the future shall bear case number CV15-00284 MJP. Judge Richard A Jones no longer assigned to case by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss FRCP 12(b)(1) and (6) for Lack of Standing by Defendant King County. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2) Noting Date 4/17/2015, (Hackett, David) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David JW Hackett on behalf of Defendant King County. (Hackett, David) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Suzanne J Hornish, Thomas E Hornish, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, Lucretia Vanderwende (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth G McCulley for Suzanne J Hornish, Thomas E Hornish, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, and for Lucretia Vanderwende, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER re 3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas S. Stewart for Suzanne J Hornish, Thomas E Hornish, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, for Lucretia Vanderwende, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth McCulley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Suzanne J Hornish, Thomas E Hornish, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, Lucretia Vanderwende (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3924829 (Deutsch, Daryl) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas S. Stewart FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Suzanne J Hornish, Thomas E Hornish, Arul Menezes, Elynne Moore, Hebert Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, Lucretia Vanderwende (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3924818 (Deutsch, Daryl) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) King County. (ST) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-3922580) Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Arul Menezes(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Elynne Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Hebert Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Barbara Neighbors(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Tracy Neighbors(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Sammamish Homeowners(pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish, Trustees (pty:pla), Attorney Daryl Allan Deutsch added to party Lucretia Vanderwende(pty:pla), filed by Lucretia Vanderwende, Tracy Neighbors, Hebert Moore, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish, Trustees, Elynne Moore, Barbara Neighbors, Sammamish Homeowners, Arul Menezes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Deutsch, Daryl) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less