This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Elm 3DS Innovations LLC v. Micron Technology Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2014 Elm 3DS Innovations LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Micron Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Leonard P. Stark and Judge Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-01431

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Leonard P. Stark

Referral Judge

Judge Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elm 3DS Innovations LLC

Defendants

Micron Semiconductor Products Inc.

Micron Technology Inc.

Micron Consumer Products Group Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Aaron R. Fahrenkrog

Anthony F. Schlehuber

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christine S. Yun Sauer

Kelsey J. Thorkelson

Logan J. Drew

Matthew J.M. Pelikan

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Samuel L. Walling

Sharon E. Roberg-Perez

William H. Manning

Defendant Attorneys

Frederick L. Cottrell, III

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Selena E. Molina

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Travis Steven Hunter

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brian Cook

Hana O. Chen

John C. Kappos

Xin-Yi Zhou

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#65

#66

#67

#68

#69

#70

#71

#72

#73

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) Joint STIPULATION regarding Representative Products by Elm 3DS Innovations LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 9 and 10) filed by Micron Consumer Products Group Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Inc..(Molina, Selena) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) PROPOSED ORDER -- Protective Order by Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Inc.. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sina Aria - filed by Micron Consumer Products Group Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Inc.. (Molina, Selena) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters relating to discovery disputes (see, e.g., C.A. No. 14-1432 D.I. 100, 101, 102, 103), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) ELM's proposed protective order provision to allow "in-house" counsel, including Mr. Epstein, limited access to the other side's confidential information is REJECTED and Defendants' proposal, whereby in-house counsel would not have access to the other side's confidential information, is ADOPTED; (2) SK hynix's request that he Court determine that ELM's infringement claims do not contain ELM's confidential information is GRANTED; and (3) the teleconference scheduled for tomorrow, February 12, is CANCELLED. With respect to (1), the Court previously determined that Mr. Epstein would be treated like in-house counsel, and Defendants' proposed provision complies with that ruling. That Plaintiff has little or no confidential information to produce, while Defendants may produce much such information, is not a situation of Defendants' creation, and poses risks of unfair competitive harm to Defendants should a competitive decisionmaker affiliated with Plaintiff inadvertently use Defendants' confidential information against them. Defendants' offer to consider allowing Mr. Epstein limited access to confidential information on a case-by-case basis in furtherance of settlement reasonably promotes the important interest in fostering case resolution, while recognizing that other important interests are also implicated by the parties' present dispute. Plaintiff has able outside counsel on which it can rely to be informed about the strengths and weaknesses of its case. With respect to (2), the Court disagrees with Plaintiff's argument that its infringement theories constitute "other non-public sensitive information" entitled to protection from third-party and public disclosure even in the midst of a patent infringement lawsuit Plaintiff chose to file. To the extent Plaintiff interprets the language the parties propose to include in a protective order to allow Plaintiff to treat its contentions as confidential, the parties shall include in their proposed protective order different language that is consistent with the Court's ruling on this dispute. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/11/16. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01430-LPS-CJB, 1:14-cv-01431-LPS-CJB, 1:14-cv-01432-LPS-CJB (ntl) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Elm's Disclosure of Its Initial Damages Model filed by Elm 3DS Innovations LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Micron Technology, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., and Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc.'s Objections to Elm's Notice of Deposition of Micron Pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 30(b)(6) filed by Micron Consumer Products Group Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Response to Plaintiff's February 2, 2016 Letter - re (65 in 1:14-cv-01431-LPS-CJB, 101 in 1:14-cv-01432-LPS-CJB, 83 in 1:14-cv-01430-LPS-CJB) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File List of Accused Products to February 29, 2016 - filed by Elm 3DS Innovations LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Kappos, Brian Cook, Xin-Yi Zhou and Hana Oh Chen - filed by Micron Consumer Products Group Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Inc.. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elm 3DS Innovations LLC. Micron Consumer Products Group Inc. served on 3/3/2015, answer due 3/24/2015; Micron Semiconductor Products Inc. served on 3/3/2015, answer due 3/24/2015; Micron Technology Inc. served on 3/3/2015, answer due 3/24/2015. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Elm 3DS Innovations LLC (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Procedures Order by Elm 3DS Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/1/14. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01430-LPS, 1:14-cv-01431-LPS, 1:14-cv-01432-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William H. Manning, Samuel L. Walling, Aaron R. Fahrenkrog, Christine Yun Sauer, and Matthew J.M. Pelikan - filed by Elm 3DS Innovations LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Elm 3DS Innovations LLC. (dmp, ) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) SEE ATTACHED FORM;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Micron Consumer Products Group Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1630407.) - filed by Elm 3DS Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICRON CONSUMER PRODUCTS GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J.M. Pelikan