This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 23:51:51 (UTC).

Edwards Lifesciences AG v. CoreValve, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2014 Edwards Lifesciences AG filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CoreValve, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    14-1409

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edwards Lifesciences AG

Defendant

CoreValve, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Edward R. Reines as principal counsel for Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC. Service: 04/14/2014 by email. [147750]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC. Service: 04/14/2014 by email. [147751]

#4

(#4) MOTION of Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 04/14/2014 by email. [147758]

#5

(#5) Exhibits to declaration of Edward R. Reines in support of Appellants' emergency motion to stay for Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC. Service: 04/14/2014 by email. [147817]

#7

(#7) ORDER filed. The appellees' response to the motion for a stay [4] is due no later than noon on Thursday, April 17, 2014. The motion to expedite briefing is granted. The appellants' opening brief is due May 12, 2014. The appellees' brief is due June 12, 2014. The reply brief and joint appendix are due June 19, 2014. No extensions. (Per Curiam). Service: 04/14/2014 by clerk. [147880]

#8

(#8) Notice of Appeal and Certified list received from the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Service: 04/15/2014 by clerk. [148048]

#9

(#9) Final Notice of Docketing issued to the parties. Service: 04/15/2014 by clerk. [148049]

#10

(#10) Letter from Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC Regarding Effective Date of Preliminary Injunction. Service: 04/15/2014 by email. [148304]

#48

(#48) BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Consortium of Physicians and Surgeons [46]. Title: Brief Amici Curiae of C onsortium of Physicians and Surgeoins in suppor of CoreVale Inc and Medtronic CoreVale, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 20. Service: 05/19/2014 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 05/27/2014. [155670]

#50

(#50) Notice of Rejection to Barbara Jones Amicus Curiae AARP, the following document(s) cannot be filed: [49] attorney entry of appearance. Reason(s) document is not text-searchable. Service: by.

#51

(#51) Entry of appearance for Barbara Jones as principal counsel for. Service: 05/20/2014 by email. [155826]

#52

(#52) Entry of appearance for Barbara Jones as principal counsel for. Service: 05/20/2014 by email. [155847]

#53

(#53) BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for AARP [44]. Title: Brief for Amicus Curiae AARP in support of Appellants and Arguing for Reversal of Preliminary Injunction, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 16. Service: 05/16/2014 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 05/27/2014. [155857]

#56

(#56) MOTION of Appellants CoreValve, Inc., Medtronic Corevalve, LLC and Appellees Edwards Lifesciences AG and Edwards Lifesciences LLC to terminate appeal through Voluntary Dismissal. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/29/2014 by email. [157839]

#57

(#57) ORDER granting motion to terminate appeal [56] filed by Appellees Edwards Lifesciences LLC, Edwards Lifesciences AG and Appellants Medtronic Corevalve, LLC and CoreValve, Inc.. Service: 06/02/2014 by clerk. [158108]

#58

(#58) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Service: 06/02/2014 by clerk. [158110]

#0130304100

(#0130304100) TENDERED from Brief for Amicus Curiae AARP in Support of Appellants and arguing for Reversal of Preliminary Injunction Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/16/2014 by email. [155006]

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130304100) TENDERED from Brief for Amicus Curiae AARP in Support of Appellants and arguing for Reversal of Preliminary Injunction Title: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Service: 05/16/2014 by email. [155006]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Service: 06/02/2014 by clerk. [158110]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) ORDER granting motion to terminate appeal [56] filed by Appellees Edwards Lifesciences LLC, Edwards Lifesciences AG and Appellants Medtronic Corevalve, LLC and CoreValve, Inc.. Service: 06/02/2014 by clerk. [158108]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) MOTION of Appellants CoreValve, Inc., Medtronic Corevalve, LLC and Appellees Edwards Lifesciences AG and Edwards Lifesciences LLC to terminate appeal through Voluntary Dismissal. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/29/2014 by email. [157839]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for AARP [44]. Title: Brief for Amicus Curiae AARP in support of Appellants and Arguing for Reversal of Preliminary Injunction, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 16. Service: 05/16/2014 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 05/27/2014. [155857]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) Entry of appearance for Barbara Jones as principal counsel for. Service: 05/20/2014 by email. [155847]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) Entry of appearance for Barbara Jones as principal counsel for. Service: 05/20/2014 by email. [155826]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) Notice of Rejection to Barbara Jones Amicus Curiae AARP, the following document(s) cannot be filed: [49] attorney entry of appearance. Reason(s) document is not text-searchable. Service: by.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Consortium of Physicians and Surgeons [46]. Title: Brief Amici Curiae of C onsortium of Physicians and Surgeoins in suppor of CoreVale Inc and Medtronic CoreVale, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 20. Service: 05/19/2014 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 05/27/2014. [155670]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Entry of appearance for Mark A. Lemley as principal counsel for Consortium of Physicians and Surgeons. Service: 05/19/2014 by email. [155643]

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION of Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC Leave to submit preliminary injunction hearing transcript. Response/Opposition is due 04/28/2014 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/15/2014 by email. [148305]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC Regarding Effective Date of Preliminary Injunction. Service: 04/15/2014 by email. [148304]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Final Notice of Docketing issued to the parties. Service: 04/15/2014 by clerk. [148049]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Appeal and Certified list received from the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Service: 04/15/2014 by clerk. [148048]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER filed. The appellees' response to the motion for a stay [4] is due no later than noon on Thursday, April 17, 2014. The motion to expedite briefing is granted. The appellants' opening brief is due May 12, 2014. The appellees' brief is due June 12, 2014. The reply brief and joint appendix are due June 19, 2014. No extensions. (Per Curiam). Service: 04/14/2014 by clerk. [147880]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Exhibits to declaration of Edward R. Reines in support of Appellants' emergency motion to stay for Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC. Service: 04/14/2014 by email. [147817]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION of Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 04/14/2014 by email. [147758]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC. Service: 04/14/2014 by email. [147751]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Edward R. Reines as principal counsel for Appellants CoreValve, Inc. and Medtronic Corevalve, LLC. Service: 04/14/2014 by email. [147750]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. [147748] Entry of Appearance due 04/28/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/28/2014. Docketing Statement due 04/28/2014. Certified List due on 05/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less