This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:39:29 (UTC).

Dynamic Hosting Company LLC v. Brother International Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/24/2014 Dynamic Hosting Company LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Brother International Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-01070

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dynamic Hosting Company LLC

Defendant

Brother International Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kris Yue Teng

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Zachariah Harrington

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Matthew J Antonelli

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Califf Teal Cooper

Attorney at OSHA Liang LLP

Two Houston Center, 909 Fannin, Suite 3500

Houston, TX 77010

Larry Dean Thompson, Jr

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste 450

Houston, TX 77006

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC

102 North College Avenue

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

John T Moehringer

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft - NY

One World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

Michael Brian Powell

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft - NY

One World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

Everett McClyde Upshaw

Attorney at Upshaw PLLC

811 S. Central Expressway, Suite 307

Richardson, TX 75080

Danielle V Tully

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft - NY

One World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

Regina M Lutz

Attorney at Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft - NY

One World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/25/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kris Yue Teng on behalf of Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Teng, Kris) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Dynamic Hosting Company LLC OF RELATED CASES (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Brother International Corporation. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)

#9

(#9) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 12/07/2014)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Califf Teal Cooper on behalf of Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

#12

(#12) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:14-cv-1067. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

#13

(#13) ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Brother International Corporation - filed by plaintiff's counsel for defendant Brother International Corporation (Teng, Kris) Modified on 12/19/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/19/2014)

#14

(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Judge Rodney Gilstrap no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/2/15. (mrm, ) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John T Moehringer on behalf of Brother International Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5047281. (Moehringer, John) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

#16

(#16) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Regina M Lutz on behalf of Brother International Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5047322. (Lutz, Regina) Modified on 2/6/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 02/06/2015)

#17

(#17) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Danielle V Tully on behalf of Brother International Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5047374. (Tully, Danielle) Modified on 2/6/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 02/06/2015)

#18

(#18) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Brian Powell on behalf of Brother International Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5047407. (Powell, Michael) Modified on 2/6/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 02/06/2015)

#19

(#19) ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/14/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/14/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Brian Powell on behalf of Brother International Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5047407. (Powell, Michael) Modified on 2/6/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Danielle V Tully on behalf of Brother International Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5047374. (Tully, Danielle) Modified on 2/6/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Regina M Lutz on behalf of Brother International Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5047322. (Lutz, Regina) Modified on 2/6/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John T Moehringer on behalf of Brother International Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5047281. (Moehringer, John) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Judge Rodney Gilstrap no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/2/15. (mrm, ) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Brother International Corporation - filed by plaintiff's counsel for defendant Brother International Corporation (Teng, Kris) Modified on 12/19/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:14-cv-1067. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Califf Teal Cooper on behalf of Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Cooper, Califf) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 12/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Brother International Corporation. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Dynamic Hosting Company LLC OF RELATED CASES (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kris Yue Teng on behalf of Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Teng, Kris) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/25/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Dynamic Hosting Company LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4942895.), filed by Dynamic Hosting Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.