This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:59:15 (UTC).

Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC v. Schlumberger Limited (Schlumberger N.V.) et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2014 Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Schlumberger Limited Schlumberger N. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Lee Yeakel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00112

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC

Petitioners

Austin Geomodeling, Inc.

Charlotte Rutherford

Defendants

Schlumberger Limited

Schlumberger Technology Corporation

Schlumberger Limited (Schlumberger N.V.)

Schlumberger Holdings Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

John J Edmonds

Attorney at Collins, Edmonds & Pogorzelski, PLLC

1616 S. Voss Rd., Ste. 125

Houston, TX 77057

Matthew C. Juren

Attorney at Collins, Edmonds, Pogorzelski, Schlather & Tower PLLC

1616 S. Voss Road, Suite 125

Houston, TX 77057

Henry Pogorzelski

Attorney at Collins Edmonds Pogorzelski Schlather & Tower PLLC

1616 S. Voss Road, Suite 125

Houston, TX 77057

Shea Neal Palavan

Attorney at Collins, Edmonds, Pogorzelski, Schlater & Tower PLLC

1616 South Voss Road, Suite 124

Houston, TX 77057

Michael James Collins

Attorney at Collins Edmonds Pogorzelski Schlather & Tower PLLC

1616 S. Voss Road, Suite 125

Houston, TX 77018

Matthew M Zarghouni

Attorney at Fomby & Zarghouni LLC

4669 Southwest Freeway, Ste 575

Houston, TX 77027

Timothy C. Shelby

Attorney at Ahmad Zavisanos Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing

1221 Mckinney, Suite 3460

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant Attorneys

Ann Marie Wahls

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

330 North Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Gabriel K. Bell

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Maximilian A. Grant

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Paige Arnette Amstutz

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Stephen E. McConnico

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico LLP

One American Center, 600 Congress Ave., 15Th Floor

Austin, TX 78701

Steven J. Wingard

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, L.L.P.

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Terrence J. Connolly

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Thomas Humphrey

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Elizabeth M. Roesel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Eugene Chiu

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#137

#138

#139

#140

#141

#142

#143

#144

#145

304 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#145) ORDER GRANTING 144 Motion for Leave to File Uncorrupted Versions of Certain Exhibits Previously Filed. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#144) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Uncorrupted Versions of Certain Exhibits Previously Filed with its Supplemental Submission in Support of Its Motion to Disqualify Counsel and to Dismiss without Prejudice by Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Schlumberger Limited (Schlumberger N.V.), Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 145, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 269, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 169, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 273, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 274, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 157, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 276, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 277, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 171, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 163, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 164, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 165, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 310, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 148, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 311, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 173, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 174, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 175, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 147, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 170, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 160, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 166, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 167, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 168, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 317, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 344b, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 322b, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 328a, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 334a, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 340a, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 345, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit 346, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit 347, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit 348)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 07/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#143) ORDER GRANTING 142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#142) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , Matthew Juren, by Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Juren, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#141) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (dm) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#140) NOTICE of Filing Transcript Purchase Order Form 22 (Federal Circuit Court No: 15-1628; 15-1629) by Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#139) Letter and Appeal Information Sheet sent to the Federal Circuit regarding appeal filed by Interested Party. (dm) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#138) Cover Letter and Appeal Information Sheet sent to the Federal Ciruit regarding appeal filed by Plaintiff. (dm) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#137) Appeal of Order entered by District Judge 135 , 134 by Acacia Research Group, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-7410567) (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#136) Appeal of Order entered by District Judge 135 , 134 by Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-7392392) (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint; Schlumberger Holdings Corporation answer due 3/31/2014; Schlumberger Limited answer due 3/31/2014; Schlumberger Technology Corporation answer due 3/31/2014. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc) (Entered: 03/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Sara) (Entered: 02/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC. Schlumberger Technology Corporation served on 2/7/2014, answer due 2/28/2014. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC. Schlumberger Holdings Corporation served on 2/7/2014, answer due 2/28/2014. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC. Schlumberger Limited served on 2/7/2014, answer due 2/28/2014. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (kkc) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC. (Summonses as to (i) Schlumberger Limited (Schlumberger N.V.); (ii) Schlumberger Holdings Corporation; and (iii) Schlumberger Technology Corporation) (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of complaint. (os) (Entered: 02/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-6217188), filed by Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collins, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dynamic 3D Geosolutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Schlumberger LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant