This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2016 at 14:24:21 (UTC).

Dykes (ID 53861) v. Agnew

Case Summary

On 01/07/2014 Dykes ID 53861 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Agnew. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge Sam A. Crow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:14-CV-03005

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Sam A. Crow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larnell Dykes

Ellsworth, KS 67439

Defendants

Jerry Agnew

Janet Payne

Interested Party

Kansas Department of Corrections

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Robert E. Wasinger

Attorney at Kansas Department of Corrections - Ellsworth

1607 State Street, Po Box 107

Ellsworth, KS 67439-0107

Interested Party Attorney

Linden G. Appel

Attorney at Kansas Department of Corrections - Topeka

714 Sw Jackson, Suite 300

Topeka, KS 66603

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#17

#18

#19

#20

#21

#22

#23

#24

#25

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER ENTERED: Interested Party Kansas Department of Corrections' fourth motion 24 for extension of time is granted. The time in which to prepare the Martinez Report is extended up to and including September 17, 2014. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/21/14. Mailed to pro se party Larnell Dykes by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Fourth MOTION for extension of time to File Martinez Report by Defendant Jerry Agnew(Wasinger, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER ENTERED: Interested Party Kansas Department of Corrections' third motion 22 for extension of time is granted. The time in which to prepare the Martinez Report is extended up to and including August 18, 2014. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 07/22/14. Mailed to pro se party Larnell Dykes by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 07/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Third MOTION for extension of time To File Martinez Report by Defendant Jerry Agnew(Wasinger, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER ENTERED: Interested Party Kansas Department of Corrections' motion 20 for extension of time is granted. The time in which to prepare the Martinez Report is extended up to and including July 18, 2014. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/11/14. (Mailed to pro se party Larnell Dykes by regular mail.) (smnd) (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Second MOTION for extension of time TO FILE A MARTINEZ REPORT by Defendant Jerry Agnew(Wasinger, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER ENTERED: Interested Party Kansas Department of Corrections' motion 18 for extension of time is granted. The time in which to prepare the Martinez Report is extended up to and including June 18, 2014. Plaintiff's motion 17 for reconsideration is denied. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/16/14. (Mailed to pro se party Larnell Dykes by regular mail.) (smnd) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for extension of time TO FILE MARTINEZ REPORT by Defendant Jerry Agnew(Wasinger, Robert) (Entered: 05/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment by Plaintiff Larnell Dykes (smnd) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF NON-SERVICE re: Waiver of Service of Summons upon Defendant Jerry Agnew; defendant no longer employed by Kansas Department of Corrections (smnd) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office regarding waiver, complaint and order mailed by first class mail on 03/04/14 to Defendant Jerry Agnew (smnd) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER ENTERED: The clerk of the court shall prepare waiver of service forms pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/18/14. (Mailed to pro se party Larnell Dykes by regular mail.) (smnd) (Entered: 03/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Larnell Dykes (smnd) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Amendment of Pleading by Plaintiff Larnell Dykes re 1 Complaint (smnd) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF NON-SERVICE re: Waiver of Service of Summons upon Defendant Jerry Agnew; defendant no longer employed by Kansas Department of Corrections (smnd) (Entered: 03/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 2 to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. The clerk of the court shall prepare waiver of service forms pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Procedure. The clerk of the court shall enter the Kansas Department of Corrections as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez report. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 02/24/14. (Mailed to pro se party Larnell Dykes by regular mail.) (smnd) (Entered: 02/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attempt to Comply with Court Order by Plaintiff Larnell Dykes (smnd) (Entered: 02/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days in which to submit to the court an initial partial filing fee of $27.00. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fees as required herein may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 1/29/2014. (Mailed to pro se party Larnell Dykes by regular mail.) (smnd) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Larnell Dykes (Attachments: #(1) Inmate Account Statement) (smnd) (Entered: 01/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plantiff Larnell Dykes (smnd) (Entered: 01/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kansas Department of Corrections is a litigant