This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2018 at 04:37:47 (UTC).

Duchow v. Government Employees Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/09/2015 Duchow filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Government Employees Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01957

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Duchow

Defendant

Government Employees Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly M. Hult

Defendant Attorney

Gregory Keith Falls

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/17/15. (sgrim)

#12

(#12) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/7/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 11/30/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/16/15. (sgrim)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/17/15. (sgrim)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/7/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 11/30/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/16/15. (sgrim)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly M. Hult