This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 13:46:23 (UTC).

Diligence Maritime, Ltd. v. Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2016 Diligence Maritime, Ltd filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III and Judge Jay C. Zainey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-00451

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III

Judge

Judge Jay C. Zainey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diligence Maritime, Ltd.

Defendants

Sonada Agro Limited

Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU

Agribusiness United North America, Inc.

Agribusiness Multi-Modal Commodities, Inc.

Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC

Agribusiness United DMCC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon Kyle Thibodeaux

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

T. Patrick O'Leary

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Andrew Struben de Klerk

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Alfred Tadros

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Alan Davis

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (clc) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting 14 Motion to File Release Bond. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#10

(#10) Return of Service of Writ of Foreign Attachment served on T. Patrick O'Leary on 1/20/2016.(bwn) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#11

(#11) Return of Service of Writ of Foreign Attachment on 1/20/2016.(bwn) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#18

(#18) Request of Summons Issued as to Agribusiness Multi-Modal Commodities, Inc., Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU, Agribusiness United DMCC, Agribusiness United North America, Inc., Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC filed by Diligence Maritime, Ltd. re 1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC, # 2 Summons Agribusiness United Multi-Modal Commodities Inc., # 3 Summons Agribusiness United North America Inc., # 4 Summons Agribusiness United DMCC, # 5 Summons Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU)(O'Leary, T.) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

#16

(#16) Special Vessel Release Bond BOND in the amount of $ 650,000.00 posted by Sonada Agro Limited (jrc) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting 3 Motion to Allow Barges and/or Vessel to Load or Discharge Cargo, Burn Fuel and Move Within the Port. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (bwn) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#19

(#19) Summons Issued as to Agribusiness Multi-Modal Commodities, Inc., Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU, Agribusiness United DMCC, Agribusiness United North America, Inc., Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(ajn) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to Agribusiness Multi-Modal Commodities, Inc., Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU, Agribusiness United DMCC, Agribusiness United North America, Inc., Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC, Sonada Agro Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(jrc) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#14

(#14) EXPARTE/CONSENT Amended MOTION to File Release Bond by Sonada Agro Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Davis, Alan) Modified on 2/24/2016 to edit docket text (bwn). (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#17

(#17) ORDER dismissing as moot 13 Motion for Bond. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Issuance of Writ of Foreign Attachment. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (bwn) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#4

(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Diligence Maritime Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(O'Leary, T.) Modified on 1/19/2016 (clc). (3cc USM) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (bwn) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#9

(#9) WRIT of Foreign Attachment issued. (3cc USM) (clc) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#3

(#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to allow barges and/or Vessel to load or discharge cargo, burn fuel and move within the port. by Diligence Maritime, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(O'Leary, T.) Modified on 1/19/2016 (clc). (3cc USM) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#13

(#13) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to File Release Bond by Sonada Agro Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)Attorney Alan Davis added to party Sonada Agro Limited(pty:dft).(Davis, Alan) Modified on 2/23/2016 to edit docket text (bwn). (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#2

(#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Issuance of Writ of Foreign Attachment by Diligence Maritime, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(O'Leary, T.) Modified on 1/19/2016 (clc).(3cc USM) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Summons Issued as to Agribusiness Multi-Modal Commodities, Inc., Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU, Agribusiness United DMCC, Agribusiness United North America, Inc., Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(ajn) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Request of Summons Issued as to Agribusiness Multi-Modal Commodities, Inc., Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU, Agribusiness United DMCC, Agribusiness United North America, Inc., Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC filed by Diligence Maritime, Ltd. re 1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC, # 2 Summons Agribusiness United Multi-Modal Commodities Inc., # 3 Summons Agribusiness United North America Inc., # 4 Summons Agribusiness United DMCC, # 5 Summons Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU)(O'Leary, T.) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER dismissing as moot 13 Motion for Bond. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Special Vessel Release Bond BOND in the amount of $ 650,000.00 posted by Sonada Agro Limited (jrc) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting 14 Motion to File Release Bond. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) EXPARTE/CONSENT Amended MOTION to File Release Bond by Sonada Agro Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Davis, Alan) Modified on 2/24/2016 to edit docket text (bwn). (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to File Release Bond by Sonada Agro Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)Attorney Alan Davis added to party Sonada Agro Limited(pty:dft).(Davis, Alan) Modified on 2/23/2016 to edit docket text (bwn). (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Summons Issued as to Agribusiness Multi-Modal Commodities, Inc., Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU, Agribusiness United DMCC, Agribusiness United North America, Inc., Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC, Sonada Agro Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(jrc) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Return of Service of Writ of Foreign Attachment on 1/20/2016.(bwn) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Return of Service of Writ of Foreign Attachment served on T. Patrick O'Leary on 1/20/2016.(bwn) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WRIT of Foreign Attachment issued. (3cc USM) (clc) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (bwn) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting 3 Motion to Allow Barges and/or Vessel to Load or Discharge Cargo, Burn Fuel and Move Within the Port. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (bwn) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Issuance of Writ of Foreign Attachment. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (bwn) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (clc) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Diligence Maritime Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(O'Leary, T.) Modified on 1/19/2016 (clc). (3cc USM) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to allow barges and/or Vessel to load or discharge cargo, burn fuel and move within the port. by Diligence Maritime, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(O'Leary, T.) Modified on 1/19/2016 (clc). (3cc USM) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Issuance of Writ of Foreign Attachment by Diligence Maritime, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(O'Leary, T.) Modified on 1/19/2016 (clc).(3cc USM) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Agribusiness Multi Commodities, Inc., Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU, Agribusiness United DMCC, Agribusiness United North America, Inc., Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC, Sonada Agro Limited (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5191960)filed by Diligence Maritime, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Verification, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney T. Patrick O'Leary added to party Diligence Maritime, Ltd.(pty:pla).(O'Leary, T.) Modified on 1/19/2016 (clc). (3cc USM) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.