This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 15:59:08 (UTC).

Dependable Sales and Service, Inc. et al v. Truecar, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2015 Dependable Sales and Service, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Truecar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01742

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Judge

Judge P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc.

Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc.

FOC, Inc

Curran Volkswagen, Inc.

Valley Motors, Inc.

Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc.

McCafferty Motors of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Kia of Mechanicsburg

Fred Beans Ford Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Hyundai of Doylestown

Fordham Auto Sales, Inc.

JJM Atlantic Automotive LLC d/b/a Atlantic CJDR

Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc

North Bay Cadillac Co., Inc.

Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc.

Village Motors Group, Inc. d/b/a Honda Village

Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Subaru

Paul Miller GT, Inc.

Garrands Nissan, Inc.

Tustin Buick GMC, Inc.

Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc.

Sunrise Automall LLC d/b/a Atlantic Honda

147 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leonard Anthony Bellavia

Attorney at Bellavia Gentile & Associates, LLP

200 Old Country Road, Ste. 400

Mineola, NY 11501

Robert E. Chudakoff

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP (Cleveland)

1660 West 2Nd Street, Suitte 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Steven H Blatt

Attorney at Bellavia Gentile & Associates, LLP

200 Old Country Road, Ste. 400

Mineola, NY 11501

Michael Sherban

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP (Cleveland)

1660 West 2Nd Street, Suitte 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Thomas Williams

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

500 West Madison Street, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60661

Victoria Langton

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

500 West Madison Street, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60661

Other Attorneys

Benjamin Maxwell Arrow

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Harold Paul Weinberger

Attorney at Kramer, Levin, Naftalis & Frankel, LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Soutar's

Brentlinger Enterprises

Beaver Motors Inc.

Hoffman Ford, Inc.

Norman Christopher Simon

Attorney at Kramer, Levin , Naftalis & Frankel, LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Cobb Auto Sales, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (nm). (Entered: 03/11/2015)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Truecar, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401119086)Document filed by L&S Motors Inc., Brentlinger Enterprises, World Auto Group, Inc., Route 22 Automobiles, Inc., Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Beaver Motors Inc., Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp, Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, Garber Doral, Inc, Wilson Imports, Inc., Infinity of Manhattan, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Paul Miller GT, Inc., Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc., Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc., Garber Delray Inc, C.S.I. Motors, Inc., ADA Motors Inc., Bellavia Buick, Inc., Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc., Garber Chevrolet, Inc, Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, FOC, Inc, G.S. Autoplex, LLC, Biener Auto Group, Inc., Westchester Autoplex, Inc., LFO, Inc, Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc., Cascade Auto Group, Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc., Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc., N.R. Automotive, Inc., Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc., Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc., Hoffman Ford, Inc., Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, Route 22 Nissan, Inc., Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc., Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Tenafly Kia, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc, Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD, Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc., TTV Motors, Inc., Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Hudson Auto Sales, Inc., Skyline Automobiles Inc., Nissan of Manhattan, Inc., Fitz Motors, Inc., Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., Elk Grove Toyota, Burien Chevrolet, Inc, FBI, Inc, Valley Motors, Inc., Sendell Motors, Inc., CDOHY, Inc, Soutar's, Salerno Duane, Inc., Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc., Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Paul Miller, Inc., Hillside Automotive, Inc., Garber CDJR, Inc, Drew Ford, Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc., FLAPM, Inc, Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc., Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc., D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC, Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc.(moh) (nm). (Entered: 03/12/2015)

#3

(#3) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/13/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/19/2015) (spo) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Truecar, Inc..(Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harold Paul Weinberger on behalf of Truecar, Inc.. (Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Norman Christopher Simon on behalf of Truecar, Inc.. (Simon, Norman) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Maxwell Arrow on behalf of Truecar, Inc.. (Arrow, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to 2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Truecar, Inc..(Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Robert E. Chudakoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of all Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10848350. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ADA Motors Inc., Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp, Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc., Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc., Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc., Beaver Motors Inc., Bellavia Buick, Inc., Biener Auto Group, Inc., Brentlinger Enterprises, Burien Chevrolet, Inc, C.S.I. Motors, Inc., CDOHY, Inc, Cascade Auto Group, Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC, Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Elk Grove Toyota, FBI, Inc, FLAPM, Inc, FOC, Inc, Fitz Motors, Inc., Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Drew Ford, Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc., Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc., G.S. Autoplex, LLC, Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc, Garber CDJR, Inc, Garber Chevrolet, Inc, Garber Delray Inc, Garber Doral, Inc, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc., Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc., Hillside Automotive, Inc., Hoffman Ford, Inc., Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc., Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Hudson Auto Sales, Inc., Infinity of Manhattan, Inc., Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc., L&S Motors Inc., LFO, Inc, Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc., Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc., N.R. Automotive, Inc., Nissan of Manhattan, Inc., Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Paul Miller GT, Inc., Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Paul Miller, Inc., Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc., Route 22 Automobiles, Inc., Route 22 Nissan, Inc., Salerno Duane, Inc., Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Sendell Motors, Inc., Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD, Skyline Automobiles Inc., Soutar's, Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc, TTV Motors, Inc., Tenafly Kia, Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Valley Motors, Inc., Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Westchester Autoplex, Inc., Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc., Wilson Imports, Inc., World Auto Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

#29

(#29) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Truecar, Inc..(Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#31

(#31) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. /Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Truecar, Inc.. (Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#32

(#32) MOTION for Michael P. Sherban to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs. Document filed by ADA Motors Inc., Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Auto Mall Hyundai, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Hyundai, Auto Mall Nissan, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Nissan Superstore, Automall Imports LLC d/b/a Atlantic Chevrolet Cadillac, BP Auto Group LLC d/b/a Hackettstown Hyundai, Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp, Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc., Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc., Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc., Beans-Class Ford, Mercury, Inc. d/b/a New Holland Toyota d/b/a New Holland Ford d/b/a New Holland Dodge Chrysler Jeep, Beaver Motors Inc., Bellavia Buick, Inc., Biener Auto Group, Inc., Bill Wright, Inc. d/b/a Bill Wright Toyota, Brentlinger Enterprises, Burien Chevrolet, Inc, Burke Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Naperville Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, C.S.I. Motors, Inc., CDOHY, Inc, Cascade Auto Group, Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Champaign Motors, Inc. d/b/a Champaign Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., Curran Volkswagen, Inc., D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC, DJ Gaudet, LLC d/b/a Autoserv Kia, Dan Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Lexus of Naperville, Dan Wolfs Chevrolet of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Chevrolet of Naperville, Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Don Beyer Motors, Inc. d/b/a Beyer Kia Alexandria (Fairfax Co), Downs North Bakersfield, Inc. d/b/a North Bakersfield Toyota, Eleven, Inc. d/b/a Honda of Decatur, Elk Grove Toyota, Empire Holdings PAV, L.L.C. d/b/a Princeton Audi, FBI, Inc, FLAPM, Inc, FOC, Inc, FVWPAB, LLC d/b/a Flemington Audi, Fitz Motors, Inc., Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Drew Ford, Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Fred Beans Cadillac Oldsmobile, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Cadillac Buick GMC, Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Fred Beans Ford Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Hyundai of Doylestown, Fred Beans Imports, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Nissan of Limerick, Fred Beans Motors of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Kia of Limerick, Fred Beans Motors, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Mitsubishi, Fred Beans of Boyertown, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Boyertown, Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc., Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc., G.S. Autoplex, LLC, Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc, Garber CDJR, Inc, Garber Chevrolet, Inc, Garber Delray Inc, Garber Doral, Inc, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Garcia Imports, Inc. d/b/a Garcia Honda, Garcia Infiniti, Garrands Nissan, Inc., Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Kia (Fairfax Co), Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Subaru, Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc., Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc., Healey Chevrolet, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet, Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC d/b/a Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep & Ram, Healey Ford Lincoln, LLC d/b/a Healey Ford, Healey KIA, Healey Mitsubishi, Hempstead Auto Co., Inc. d/b/a Jaguar of Great Neck/Roslyn, Hempstead Auto Sales LLC d/b/a Millennium Honda, Heritage Jaguar of Freeport, Inc. d/b/a Heritage Jaguar, Hillside Automotive, Inc., Hoffman Ford, Inc., Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc., Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Hudson Auto Sales, Inc., Hutchins Motors Inc. d/b/a OConnor Auto Group, Infinity of Manhattan, Inc., JJM Atlantic Automotive LLC d/b/a Atlantic CJDR, JS Autoworld, LLC d/b/a Atlantic Toyota, JS Huntington Motors LLC d/b/a Chevrolet of Huntington, Jerry Damson Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda d/b/a Jerry Damson Acura, Jerry Damson Nissan, L.L.C. d/b/a Jerry Damson Nissan, Jim Curley Pontiac-GMC Truck, Inc. d/b/a Jim Curley Kia, Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Joseph H. Nolette, LLC d/b/a Plaza Cadillac, K.C. Imports, Inc. d/b/a Curttright Honda, Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc., Kraft Motorcar Company of Tallahassee, Inc. d/b/a Kraft Nissan, L&S Motors Inc., LFO, Inc, Larson Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Tacoma d/b/a Mercedes Benz of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Cadillac d/b/a Larson Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram d/b/a Volkswagen of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Hyundai, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Buick/GMC, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc., Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc., Massapequa Imports LLC d/b/a Lexus of Rockville Center, McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, McCafferty Motors of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Kia of Mechanicsburg, Millennium Super Store LLC d/b/a Millennium Toyota, Miller Motor Car Corporation d/b/a Miller Honda, Murphy Cadillac, Inc., N.R. Automotive, Inc., Nissan of Manhattan, Inc., North Bay Cadillac Co., Inc., Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Buick, Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Chevrolet, Painter Sun Country Chrysler Inc. d/b/a Painter Sun Country Mitsubishi, Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Paul Miller GT, Inc., Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Paul Miller, Inc., Platinum Volkswagen, LLC, Plaza-Lincoln Mercury, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lincoln, Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Renton C, Inc. d/b/a Pros Fiat, Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc., Route 22 Automobiles, Inc., Route 22 Nissan, Inc., Rowe Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Precision Toyota of Tucson, Salerno Duane, Inc., Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Mitsubishi, Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Subaru, Schumacher Volkswagen, Inc., Sendell Motors, Inc., Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD, Skyline Automobiles Inc., Soutar's, Sowell Automotive, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai of La Quinta, Sunrise Automall LLC d/b/a Atlantic Honda, Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc, Syosset Hyundai, LLC d/b/a Advantage Hyundai, TTV Motors, Inc., Taylor Chrysler Dodge, Inc. d/b/a Taylor Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Tenafly Kia, The Robert Larson Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Tacoma, Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Twenty-Two, Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda Florence, Valley Motors, Inc., Village Euro Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Norwell d/b/a Porsche Norwell, Village Imports, Inc. d/b/a Nissan Village, Village Motors Group, Inc. d/b/a Honda Village, Village Motors North, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai Village d/b/a Volvo Village of Danvers, Village Motors South, Inc. d/b/a Volvo Village of Hingham, Village Motors, Inc. d/b/a Boston Volvo Village, W.S. Healey Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet Buick, Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Westchester Autoplex, Inc., Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc., Wilson Imports, Inc., Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Naperville, World Auto Group, Inc..(Sherban, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#33

(#33) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. Attorney Michael Sherban terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/13/2015) (tn) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#34

(#34) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by ADA Motors Inc., Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Auto Mall Hyundai, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Hyundai, Auto Mall Nissan, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Nissan Superstore, Automall Imports LLC d/b/a Atlantic Chevrolet Cadillac, BP Auto Group LLC d/b/a Hackettstown Hyundai, Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp, Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc., Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc., Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc., Beans-Class Ford, Mercury, Inc. d/b/a New Holland Toyota d/b/a New Holland Ford d/b/a New Holland Dodge Chrysler Jeep, Beaver Motors Inc., Bellavia Buick, Inc., Biener Auto Group, Inc., Bill Wright, Inc. d/b/a Bill Wright Toyota, Brentlinger Enterprises, Burien Chevrolet, Inc, Burke Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Naperville Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, C.S.I. Motors, Inc., CDOHY, Inc, Cascade Auto Group, Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Champaign Motors, Inc. d/b/a Champaign Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., Curran Volkswagen, Inc., D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC, DJ Gaudet, LLC d/b/a Autoserv Kia, Dan Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Lexus of Naperville, Dan Wolfs Chevrolet of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Chevrolet of Naperville, Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Don Beyer Motors, Inc. d/b/a Beyer Kia Alexandria (Fairfax Co), Downs North Bakersfield, Inc. d/b/a North Bakersfield Toyota, Eleven, Inc. d/b/a Honda of Decatur, Elk Grove Toyota, Empire Holdings PAV, L.L.C. d/b/a Princeton Audi, FBI, Inc, FLAPM, Inc, FOC, Inc, FVWPAB, LLC d/b/a Flemington Audi, Fitz Motors, Inc., Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Drew Ford, Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Fred Beans Cadillac Oldsmobile, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Cadillac Buick GMC, Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Fred Beans Ford Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Hyundai of Doylestown, Fred Beans Imports, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Nissan of Limerick, Fred Beans Motors of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Kia of Limerick, Fred Beans Motors, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Mitsubishi, Fred Beans of Boyertown, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Boyertown, Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc., Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc., G.S. Autoplex, LLC, Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc, Garber CDJR, Inc, Garber Chevrolet, Inc, Garber Delray Inc, Garber Doral, Inc, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Garcia Imports, Inc. d/b/a Garcia Honda, Garcia Infiniti, Garrands Nissan, Inc., Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Kia (Fairfax Co), Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Subaru, Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc., Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc., Healey Chevrolet, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet, Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC d/b/a Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep & Ram, Healey Ford Lincoln, LLC d/b/a Healey Ford, Healey KIA, Healey Mitsubishi, Hempstead Auto Co., Inc. d/b/a Jaguar of Great Neck/Roslyn, Hempstead Auto Sales LLC d/b/a Millennium Honda, Heritage Jaguar of Freeport, Inc. d/b/a Heritage Jaguar, Hillside Automotive, Inc., Hoffman Ford, Inc., Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc., Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Hudson Auto Sales, Inc., Hutchins Motors Inc. d/b/a OConnor Auto Group, Infinity of Manhattan, Inc., JJM Atlantic Automotive LLC d/b/a Atlantic CJDR, JS Autoworld, LLC d/b/a Atlantic Toyota, JS Huntington Motors LLC d/b/a Chevrolet of Huntington, Jerry Damson Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda d/b/a Jerry Damson Acura, Jerry Damson Nissan, L.L.C. d/b/a Jerry Damson Nissan, Jim Curley Pontiac-GMC Truck, Inc. d/b/a Jim Curley Kia, Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Joseph H. Nolette, LLC d/b/a Plaza Cadillac, K.C. Imports, Inc. d/b/a Curttright Honda, Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc., Kraft Motorcar Company of Tallahassee, Inc. d/b/a Kraft Nissan, L&S Motors Inc., LFO, Inc, Larson Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Tacoma d/b/a Mercedes Benz of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Cadillac d/b/a Larson Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram d/b/a Volkswagen of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Hyundai, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Buick/GMC, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc., Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc., Massapequa Imports LLC d/b/a Lexus of Rockville Center, McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, McCafferty Motors of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Kia of Mechanicsburg, Millennium Super Store LLC d/b/a Millennium Toyota, Miller Motor Car Corporation d/b/a Miller Honda, Murphy Cadillac, Inc., N.R. Automotive, Inc., Nissan of Manhattan, Inc., North Bay Cadillac Co., Inc., Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Buick, Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Chevrolet, Painter Sun Country Chrysler Inc. d/b/a Painter Sun Country Mitsubishi, Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Paul Miller GT, Inc., Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Paul Miller, Inc., Platinum Volkswagen, LLC, Plaza-Lincoln Mercury, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lincoln, Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Renton C, Inc. d/b/a Pros Fiat, Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc., Route 22 Automobiles, Inc., Route 22 Nissan, Inc., Rowe Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Precision Toyota of Tucson, Salerno Duane, Inc., Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Mitsubishi, Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Subaru, Schumacher Volkswagen, Inc., Sendell Motors, Inc., Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD, Skyline Automobiles Inc., Soutar's, Sowell Automotive, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai of La Quinta, Sunrise Automall LLC d/b/a Atlantic Honda, Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc, Syosset Hyundai, LLC d/b/a Advantage Hyundai, TTV Motors, Inc., Taylor Chrysler Dodge, Inc. d/b/a Taylor Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Tenafly Kia, The Robert Larson Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Tacoma, Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Twenty-Two, Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda Florence, Valley Motors, Inc., Village Euro Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Norwell d/b/a Porsche Norwell, Village Imports, Inc. d/b/a Nissan Village, Village Motors Group, Inc. d/b/a Honda Village, Village Motors North, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai Village d/b/a Volvo Village of Danvers, Village Motors South, Inc. d/b/a Volvo Village of Hingham, Village Motors, Inc. d/b/a Boston Volvo Village, W.S. Healey Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet Buick, Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Westchester Autoplex, Inc., Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc., Wilson Imports, Inc., Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Naperville, World Auto Group, Inc.. (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

#35

(#35) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Truecar, Inc.. (Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#36

(#36) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss. TrueCar's motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to the "bait-and-switch," "financing," "transparency" and "rebate" advertisements. It is DENIED as to the "no haggle" and "factory invoice" advertisements. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion. (Docket # 29.) (As further set forth in this Memorandum and Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/6/2016) (mro) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

#37

(#37) INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 36 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Internet Citation) (sj) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 36 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Internet Citation) (sj) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss. TrueCar's motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to the "bait-and-switch," "financing," "transparency" and "rebate" advertisements. It is DENIED as to the "no haggle" and "factory invoice" advertisements. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion. (Docket # 29.) (As further set forth in this Memorandum and Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/6/2016) (mro) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Truecar, Inc.. (Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by ADA Motors Inc., Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Auto Mall Hyundai, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Hyundai, Auto Mall Nissan, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Nissan Superstore, Automall Imports LLC d/b/a Atlantic Chevrolet Cadillac, BP Auto Group LLC d/b/a Hackettstown Hyundai, Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp, Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc., Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc., Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc., Beans-Class Ford, Mercury, Inc. d/b/a New Holland Toyota d/b/a New Holland Ford d/b/a New Holland Dodge Chrysler Jeep, Beaver Motors Inc., Bellavia Buick, Inc., Biener Auto Group, Inc., Bill Wright, Inc. d/b/a Bill Wright Toyota, Brentlinger Enterprises, Burien Chevrolet, Inc, Burke Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Naperville Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, C.S.I. Motors, Inc., CDOHY, Inc, Cascade Auto Group, Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Champaign Motors, Inc. d/b/a Champaign Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., Curran Volkswagen, Inc., D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC, DJ Gaudet, LLC d/b/a Autoserv Kia, Dan Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Lexus of Naperville, Dan Wolfs Chevrolet of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Chevrolet of Naperville, Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Don Beyer Motors, Inc. d/b/a Beyer Kia Alexandria (Fairfax Co), Downs North Bakersfield, Inc. d/b/a North Bakersfield Toyota, Eleven, Inc. d/b/a Honda of Decatur, Elk Grove Toyota, Empire Holdings PAV, L.L.C. d/b/a Princeton Audi, FBI, Inc, FLAPM, Inc, FOC, Inc, FVWPAB, LLC d/b/a Flemington Audi, Fitz Motors, Inc., Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Drew Ford, Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Fred Beans Cadillac Oldsmobile, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Cadillac Buick GMC, Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Fred Beans Ford Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Hyundai of Doylestown, Fred Beans Imports, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Nissan of Limerick, Fred Beans Motors of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Kia of Limerick, Fred Beans Motors, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Mitsubishi, Fred Beans of Boyertown, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Boyertown, Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc., Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc., G.S. Autoplex, LLC, Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc, Garber CDJR, Inc, Garber Chevrolet, Inc, Garber Delray Inc, Garber Doral, Inc, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Garcia Imports, Inc. d/b/a Garcia Honda, Garcia Infiniti, Garrands Nissan, Inc., Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Kia (Fairfax Co), Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Subaru, Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc., Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc., Healey Chevrolet, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet, Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC d/b/a Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep & Ram, Healey Ford Lincoln, LLC d/b/a Healey Ford, Healey KIA, Healey Mitsubishi, Hempstead Auto Co., Inc. d/b/a Jaguar of Great Neck/Roslyn, Hempstead Auto Sales LLC d/b/a Millennium Honda, Heritage Jaguar of Freeport, Inc. d/b/a Heritage Jaguar, Hillside Automotive, Inc., Hoffman Ford, Inc., Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc., Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Hudson Auto Sales, Inc., Hutchins Motors Inc. d/b/a OConnor Auto Group, Infinity of Manhattan, Inc., JJM Atlantic Automotive LLC d/b/a Atlantic CJDR, JS Autoworld, LLC d/b/a Atlantic Toyota, JS Huntington Motors LLC d/b/a Chevrolet of Huntington, Jerry Damson Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda d/b/a Jerry Damson Acura, Jerry Damson Nissan, L.L.C. d/b/a Jerry Damson Nissan, Jim Curley Pontiac-GMC Truck, Inc. d/b/a Jim Curley Kia, Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Joseph H. Nolette, LLC d/b/a Plaza Cadillac, K.C. Imports, Inc. d/b/a Curttright Honda, Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc., Kraft Motorcar Company of Tallahassee, Inc. d/b/a Kraft Nissan, L&S Motors Inc., LFO, Inc, Larson Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Tacoma d/b/a Mercedes Benz of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Cadillac d/b/a Larson Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram d/b/a Volkswagen of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Hyundai, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Buick/GMC, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc., Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc., Massapequa Imports LLC d/b/a Lexus of Rockville Center, McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, McCafferty Motors of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Kia of Mechanicsburg, Millennium Super Store LLC d/b/a Millennium Toyota, Miller Motor Car Corporation d/b/a Miller Honda, Murphy Cadillac, Inc., N.R. Automotive, Inc., Nissan of Manhattan, Inc., North Bay Cadillac Co., Inc., Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Buick, Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Chevrolet, Painter Sun Country Chrysler Inc. d/b/a Painter Sun Country Mitsubishi, Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Paul Miller GT, Inc., Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Paul Miller, Inc., Platinum Volkswagen, LLC, Plaza-Lincoln Mercury, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lincoln, Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Renton C, Inc. d/b/a Pros Fiat, Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc., Route 22 Automobiles, Inc., Route 22 Nissan, Inc., Rowe Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Precision Toyota of Tucson, Salerno Duane, Inc., Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Mitsubishi, Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Subaru, Schumacher Volkswagen, Inc., Sendell Motors, Inc., Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD, Skyline Automobiles Inc., Soutar's, Sowell Automotive, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai of La Quinta, Sunrise Automall LLC d/b/a Atlantic Honda, Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc, Syosset Hyundai, LLC d/b/a Advantage Hyundai, TTV Motors, Inc., Taylor Chrysler Dodge, Inc. d/b/a Taylor Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Tenafly Kia, The Robert Larson Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Tacoma, Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Twenty-Two, Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda Florence, Valley Motors, Inc., Village Euro Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Norwell d/b/a Porsche Norwell, Village Imports, Inc. d/b/a Nissan Village, Village Motors Group, Inc. d/b/a Honda Village, Village Motors North, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai Village d/b/a Volvo Village of Danvers, Village Motors South, Inc. d/b/a Volvo Village of Hingham, Village Motors, Inc. d/b/a Boston Volvo Village, W.S. Healey Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet Buick, Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Westchester Autoplex, Inc., Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc., Wilson Imports, Inc., Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Naperville, World Auto Group, Inc.. (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. Attorney Michael Sherban terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/13/2015) (tn) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION for Michael P. Sherban to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs. Document filed by ADA Motors Inc., Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Auto Mall Hyundai, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Hyundai, Auto Mall Nissan, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Nissan Superstore, Automall Imports LLC d/b/a Atlantic Chevrolet Cadillac, BP Auto Group LLC d/b/a Hackettstown Hyundai, Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp, Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc., Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc., Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc., Beans-Class Ford, Mercury, Inc. d/b/a New Holland Toyota d/b/a New Holland Ford d/b/a New Holland Dodge Chrysler Jeep, Beaver Motors Inc., Bellavia Buick, Inc., Biener Auto Group, Inc., Bill Wright, Inc. d/b/a Bill Wright Toyota, Brentlinger Enterprises, Burien Chevrolet, Inc, Burke Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Naperville Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, C.S.I. Motors, Inc., CDOHY, Inc, Cascade Auto Group, Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Champaign Motors, Inc. d/b/a Champaign Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., Curran Volkswagen, Inc., D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC, DJ Gaudet, LLC d/b/a Autoserv Kia, Dan Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Lexus of Naperville, Dan Wolfs Chevrolet of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Chevrolet of Naperville, Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Don Beyer Motors, Inc. d/b/a Beyer Kia Alexandria (Fairfax Co), Downs North Bakersfield, Inc. d/b/a North Bakersfield Toyota, Eleven, Inc. d/b/a Honda of Decatur, Elk Grove Toyota, Empire Holdings PAV, L.L.C. d/b/a Princeton Audi, FBI, Inc, FLAPM, Inc, FOC, Inc, FVWPAB, LLC d/b/a Flemington Audi, Fitz Motors, Inc., Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Drew Ford, Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Fred Beans Cadillac Oldsmobile, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Cadillac Buick GMC, Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Fred Beans Ford Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Hyundai of Doylestown, Fred Beans Imports, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Nissan of Limerick, Fred Beans Motors of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Kia of Limerick, Fred Beans Motors, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Mitsubishi, Fred Beans of Boyertown, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Boyertown, Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc., Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc., G.S. Autoplex, LLC, Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc, Garber CDJR, Inc, Garber Chevrolet, Inc, Garber Delray Inc, Garber Doral, Inc, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Garcia Imports, Inc. d/b/a Garcia Honda, Garcia Infiniti, Garrands Nissan, Inc., Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Kia (Fairfax Co), Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Subaru, Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc., Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc., Healey Chevrolet, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet, Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC d/b/a Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep & Ram, Healey Ford Lincoln, LLC d/b/a Healey Ford, Healey KIA, Healey Mitsubishi, Hempstead Auto Co., Inc. d/b/a Jaguar of Great Neck/Roslyn, Hempstead Auto Sales LLC d/b/a Millennium Honda, Heritage Jaguar of Freeport, Inc. d/b/a Heritage Jaguar, Hillside Automotive, Inc., Hoffman Ford, Inc., Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc., Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Hudson Auto Sales, Inc., Hutchins Motors Inc. d/b/a OConnor Auto Group, Infinity of Manhattan, Inc., JJM Atlantic Automotive LLC d/b/a Atlantic CJDR, JS Autoworld, LLC d/b/a Atlantic Toyota, JS Huntington Motors LLC d/b/a Chevrolet of Huntington, Jerry Damson Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda d/b/a Jerry Damson Acura, Jerry Damson Nissan, L.L.C. d/b/a Jerry Damson Nissan, Jim Curley Pontiac-GMC Truck, Inc. d/b/a Jim Curley Kia, Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Joseph H. Nolette, LLC d/b/a Plaza Cadillac, K.C. Imports, Inc. d/b/a Curttright Honda, Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc., Kraft Motorcar Company of Tallahassee, Inc. d/b/a Kraft Nissan, L&S Motors Inc., LFO, Inc, Larson Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Tacoma d/b/a Mercedes Benz of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Cadillac d/b/a Larson Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram d/b/a Volkswagen of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Hyundai, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Buick/GMC, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc., Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc., Massapequa Imports LLC d/b/a Lexus of Rockville Center, McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, McCafferty Motors of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Kia of Mechanicsburg, Millennium Super Store LLC d/b/a Millennium Toyota, Miller Motor Car Corporation d/b/a Miller Honda, Murphy Cadillac, Inc., N.R. Automotive, Inc., Nissan of Manhattan, Inc., North Bay Cadillac Co., Inc., Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Buick, Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Chevrolet, Painter Sun Country Chrysler Inc. d/b/a Painter Sun Country Mitsubishi, Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Paul Miller GT, Inc., Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Paul Miller, Inc., Platinum Volkswagen, LLC, Plaza-Lincoln Mercury, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lincoln, Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Renton C, Inc. d/b/a Pros Fiat, Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc., Route 22 Automobiles, Inc., Route 22 Nissan, Inc., Rowe Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Precision Toyota of Tucson, Salerno Duane, Inc., Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Mitsubishi, Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Subaru, Schumacher Volkswagen, Inc., Sendell Motors, Inc., Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD, Skyline Automobiles Inc., Soutar's, Sowell Automotive, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai of La Quinta, Sunrise Automall LLC d/b/a Atlantic Honda, Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc, Syosset Hyundai, LLC d/b/a Advantage Hyundai, TTV Motors, Inc., Taylor Chrysler Dodge, Inc. d/b/a Taylor Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Tenafly Kia, The Robert Larson Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Tacoma, Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Twenty-Two, Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda Florence, Valley Motors, Inc., Village Euro Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Norwell d/b/a Porsche Norwell, Village Imports, Inc. d/b/a Nissan Village, Village Motors Group, Inc. d/b/a Honda Village, Village Motors North, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai Village d/b/a Volvo Village of Danvers, Village Motors South, Inc. d/b/a Volvo Village of Hingham, Village Motors, Inc. d/b/a Boston Volvo Village, W.S. Healey Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet Buick, Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Westchester Autoplex, Inc., Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc., Wilson Imports, Inc., Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Naperville, World Auto Group, Inc..(Sherban, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. /Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Truecar, Inc.. (Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) DECLARATION of Harold P. Weinberger in Support re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Truecar, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Truecar, Inc..(Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 27 Letter in response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter dated 06/04/2015, filed by Infinity of Manhattan, Inc., FBI, Inc, Twenty-Two, Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda Florence, Larson Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Tacoma d/b/a Mercedes Benz of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Cadillac d/b/a Larson Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram d/b/a Volkswagen of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Hyundai, Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc., Dan Wolfs Chevrolet of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Chevrolet of Naperville, Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Chevrolet, Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., K.C. Imports, Inc. d/b/a Curttright Honda, Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc., L&S Motors Inc., Village Imports, Inc. d/b/a Nissan Village, Hempstead Auto Co., Inc. d/b/a Jaguar of Great Neck/Roslyn, Valley Motors, Inc., Route 22 Nissan, Inc., The Robert Larson Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Tacoma, Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Fred Beans of Boyertown, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Boyertown, Burke Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Naperville Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Fred Beans Cadillac Oldsmobile, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Cadillac Buick GMC, Schumacher Volkswagen, Inc., Village Motors Group, Inc. d/b/a Honda Village, JS Autoworld, LLC d/b/a Atlantic Toyota, Wilson Imports, Inc., Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc, DJ Gaudet, LLC d/b/a Autoserv Kia, Bellavia Buick, Inc., Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Sendell Motors, Inc., Kraft Motorcar Company of Tallahassee, Inc. d/b/a Kraft Nissan, Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Sunrise Automall LLC d/b/a Atlantic Honda, Garber Doral, Inc, Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc., Garber Delray Inc, Fred Beans Motors, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Mitsubishi, Plaza-Lincoln Mercury, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lincoln, C.S.I. Motors, Inc., Garber Chevrolet, Inc, ADA Motors Inc., Village Euro Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Norwell d/b/a Porsche Norwell, Heritage Jaguar of Freeport, Inc. d/b/a Heritage Jaguar, Elk Grove Toyota, Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, CDOHY, Inc, Healey Mitsubishi, Fitz Motors, Inc., Fred Beans Ford Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Hyundai of Doylestown, FVWPAB, LLC d/b/a Flemington Audi, Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Bill Wright, Inc. d/b/a Bill Wright Toyota, Dan Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Lexus of Naperville, FOC, Inc, Paul Miller, Inc., Syosset Hyundai, LLC d/b/a Advantage Hyundai, Hillside Automotive, Inc., Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Subaru, Garrands Nissan, Inc., Jerry Damson Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda d/b/a Jerry Damson Acura, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Buick/GMC, Healey KIA, Beaver Motors Inc., Skyline Automobiles Inc., G.S. Autoplex, LLC, Biener Auto Group, Inc., Downs North Bakersfield, Inc. d/b/a North Bakersfield Toyota, Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Buick, Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Kia (Fairfax Co), Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Naperville, Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc., McCafferty Motors of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Kia of Mechanicsburg, D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC, Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Cascade Auto Group, Auto Mall Hyundai, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Hyundai, Brentlinger Enterprises, Miller Motor Car Corporation d/b/a Miller Honda, Curran Volkswagen, Inc., North Bay Cadillac Co., Inc., Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, Empire Holdings PAV, L.L.C. d/b/a Princeton Audi, Hudson Auto Sales, Inc., Beans-Class Ford, Mercury, Inc. d/b/a New Holland Toyota d/b/a New Holland Ford d/b/a New Holland Dodge Chrysler Jeep, Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc., Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Garber CDJR, Inc, Healey Ford Lincoln, LLC d/b/a Healey Ford, Hempstead Auto Sales LLC d/b/a Millennium Honda, Village Motors South, Inc. d/b/a Volvo Village of Hingham, Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Soutar's, Garcia Infiniti, Auto Mall Nissan, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Nissan Superstore, Garcia Imports, Inc. d/b/a Garcia Honda, Village Motors North, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai Village d/b/a Volvo Village of Danvers, Fred Beans Imports, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Nissan of Limerick, Renton C, Inc. d/b/a Pros Fiat, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Healey Chevrolet, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet, Eleven, Inc. d/b/a Honda of Decatur, LFO, Inc, Route 22 Automobiles, Inc., Hoffman Ford, Inc., N.R. Automotive, Inc., Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, BP Auto Group LLC d/b/a Hackettstown Hyundai, Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD, Champaign Motors, Inc. d/b/a Champaign Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Murphy Cadillac, Inc., Massapequa Imports LLC d/b/a Lexus of Rockville Center, Paul Miller GT, Inc., Taylor Chrysler Dodge, Inc. d/b/a Taylor Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Jerry Damson Nissan, L.L.C. d/b/a Jerry Damson Nissan, Westchester Autoplex, Inc., World Auto Group, Inc., Painter Sun Country Chrysler Inc. d/b/a Painter Sun Country Mitsubishi, Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc., JJM Atlantic Automotive LLC d/b/a Atlantic CJDR, Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc., Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp, Don Beyer Motors, Inc. d/b/a Beyer Kia Alexandria (Fairfax Co), Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc., Millennium Super Store LLC d/b/a Millennium Toyota, Automall Imports LLC d/b/a Atlantic Chevrolet Cadillac, Joseph H. Nolette, LLC d/b/a Plaza Cadillac, Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Subaru, TTV Motors, Inc., Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc., Drew Ford, Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc, Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Mitsubishi, Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Jim Curley Pontiac-GMC Truck, Inc. d/b/a Jim Curley Kia, Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Sowell Automotive, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai of La Quinta, Tenafly Kia, Rowe Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Precision Toyota of Tucson, Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc., Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC d/b/a Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep & Ram, Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc., Hutchins Motors Inc. d/b/a OConnor Auto Group, McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Fred Beans Motors of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Kia of Limerick, W.S. Healey Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet Buick, Village Motors, Inc. d/b/a Boston Volvo Village, FLAPM, Inc, Nissan of Manhattan, Inc., JS Huntington Motors LLC d/b/a Chevrolet of Huntington, Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc., Salerno Duane, Inc., Platinum Volkswagen, LLC, Burien Chevrolet, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant may proceed with the motion on the following schedule: Motion due July 13. Response due August 14. Reply due September 10. (Motions due by 7/13/2015. Responses due by 8/14/2015, Replies due by 9/10/2015.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/16/2015) (kko) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Victoria Jean Langton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10849887. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ADA Motors Inc., Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp, Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc., Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc., Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc., Beaver Motors Inc., Bellavia Buick, Inc., Biener Auto Group, Inc., Brentlinger Enterprises, Burien Chevrolet, Inc, C.S.I. Motors, Inc., CDOHY, Inc, Cascade Auto Group, Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC, Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Elk Grove Toyota, FBI, Inc, FLAPM, Inc, FOC, Inc, Fitz Motors, Inc., Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Drew Ford, Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc., Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc., G.S. Autoplex, LLC, Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc, Garber CDJR, Inc, Garber Chevrolet, Inc, Garber Delray Inc, Garber Doral, Inc, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc., Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc., Hillside Automotive, Inc., Hoffman Ford, Inc., Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc., Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Hudson Auto Sales, Inc., Infinity of Manhattan, Inc., Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc., L&S Motors Inc., LFO, Inc, Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc., Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc., N.R. Automotive, Inc., Nissan of Manhattan, Inc., Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Paul Miller GT, Inc., Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Paul Miller, Inc., Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc., Route 22 Automobiles, Inc., Route 22 Nissan, Inc., Salerno Duane, Inc., Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Sendell Motors, Inc., Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD, Skyline Automobiles Inc., Soutar's, Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc, TTV Motors, Inc., Tenafly Kia, Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Valley Motors, Inc., Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Westchester Autoplex, Inc., Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc., Wilson Imports, Inc., World Auto Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Langton, Victoria) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Robert E. Chudakoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of all Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10848350. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ADA Motors Inc., Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp, Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc., Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc., Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc., Beaver Motors Inc., Bellavia Buick, Inc., Biener Auto Group, Inc., Brentlinger Enterprises, Burien Chevrolet, Inc, C.S.I. Motors, Inc., CDOHY, Inc, Cascade Auto Group, Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC, Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Elk Grove Toyota, FBI, Inc, FLAPM, Inc, FOC, Inc, Fitz Motors, Inc., Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Drew Ford, Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc., Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc., G.S. Autoplex, LLC, Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc, Garber CDJR, Inc, Garber Chevrolet, Inc, Garber Delray Inc, Garber Doral, Inc, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc., Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc., Hillside Automotive, Inc., Hoffman Ford, Inc., Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc., Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Hudson Auto Sales, Inc., Infinity of Manhattan, Inc., Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc., L&S Motors Inc., LFO, Inc, Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc., Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc., N.R. Automotive, Inc., Nissan of Manhattan, Inc., Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Paul Miller GT, Inc., Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Paul Miller, Inc., Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc., Route 22 Automobiles, Inc., Route 22 Nissan, Inc., Salerno Duane, Inc., Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Sendell Motors, Inc., Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD, Skyline Automobiles Inc., Soutar's, Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc, TTV Motors, Inc., Tenafly Kia, Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Valley Motors, Inc., Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Westchester Autoplex, Inc., Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc., Wilson Imports, Inc., World Auto Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to 2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Truecar, Inc..(Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Maxwell Arrow on behalf of Truecar, Inc.. (Arrow, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Norman Christopher Simon on behalf of Truecar, Inc.. (Simon, Norman) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harold Paul Weinberger on behalf of Truecar, Inc.. (Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Truecar, Inc..(Weinberger, Harold) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/13/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/19/2015) (spo) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Truecar, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401119086)Document filed by L&S Motors Inc., Brentlinger Enterprises, World Auto Group, Inc., Route 22 Automobiles, Inc., Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Beaver Motors Inc., Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp, Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, Garber Doral, Inc, Wilson Imports, Inc., Infinity of Manhattan, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Paul Miller GT, Inc., Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc., Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc., Garber Delray Inc, C.S.I. Motors, Inc., ADA Motors Inc., Bellavia Buick, Inc., Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc., Garber Chevrolet, Inc, Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, FOC, Inc, G.S. Autoplex, LLC, Biener Auto Group, Inc., Westchester Autoplex, Inc., LFO, Inc, Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc., Cascade Auto Group, Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc., Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc., N.R. Automotive, Inc., Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc., Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc., Hoffman Ford, Inc., Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, Route 22 Nissan, Inc., Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc., Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Tenafly Kia, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc, Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD, Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc., TTV Motors, Inc., Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Hudson Auto Sales, Inc., Skyline Automobiles Inc., Nissan of Manhattan, Inc., Fitz Motors, Inc., Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., Elk Grove Toyota, Burien Chevrolet, Inc, FBI, Inc, Valley Motors, Inc., Sendell Motors, Inc., CDOHY, Inc, Soutar's, Salerno Duane, Inc., Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc., Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Paul Miller, Inc., Hillside Automotive, Inc., Garber CDJR, Inc, Drew Ford, Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc., FLAPM, Inc, Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc., Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc., D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC, Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc.(moh) (nm). (Entered: 03/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (nm). (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norman Christopher Simon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harold P. Weinberger