This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 04:07:22 (UTC).

DELVILA et al v. LICIARDELLO et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 DELVILA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LICIARDELLO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-02521

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TONY MASON

ADEJAH LEWIS

KHARON FORTUNE LEWIS

LUIS SARMIENTO

Defendants

THOMAS KUHN

RICHARD CUJDIK

ERIC DIAL

JOHN O'HANLON

HARDY

CHRISTOPHER HULMES

JONATHAN SPEISER

KEVIN CUDDAHY

STEPHEN DMYTRYK

LINWOOD NORMAN

KEVIN DEVLIN

GIULIAN

A. VIEGA

ERIC JOHNSON

TAYLOR

COONER

81 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID WESLEY CORNISH

Attorney at CORNERSTONE LEGAL GROUP

1510 Cecil B. Moore Ave Ste 301

Philadelphia, PA 19121

Other Attorneys

STEPHEN LEDVA, JR.

Attorney at MINTZER, SAROWITZ, ZERIS, LEDVA & MEYERS LLP

1500 Market Street, Suite 4100

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK ALL ACTION WITH THE FLAG "12-5690-PD" CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES EXCEPT FOR THE LEAD CASE, CIV. NO. 12-5690. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ALL ACTIONS WITH THE FLAG "12-5690-PD" THAT HAVE BEEN ASSIGNED TO ME FOR PRE-TRIAL ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/18/13. 5/8/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DAVID APONTE, PATRICK BANNING, GREGORY BARBER, PERRY BETTS, WILLIAM BLACKBURN, JOSEPH BOLOGNA, FRANK BONNETT, CHRISTOPHER BROOKS, JAMIE BROWN, SHAWN CAREY, CARMONA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, THOMAS CLANCY, COONER, COONEY, KEVIN CUDDAHY, JEFFREY CUDJIK, RICHARD CUJDIK, KEVIN DEVLIN, ERIC DIAL, DIDONATO, STEPHEN DMYTRYK, MICHAEL EDINGER, ELLINGSWORTH, FLYNN, ERIK GARNETT, GIULIAN, JOSEPH GOODWIN, KEVIN GORMAN, ROOSEVELT HAGINS, JR, HARDY, HARVEY, HOLTS, CHRISTOPHER HULMES, GINA JACKSON, ERIC JOHNSON, JONES, CHARLES KAPUSNIAK, THOMAS KELLY, KINTOCK GROUP JANE DOE 1-20, KINTOCK GROUP JOHN DOE EMPLOYEES 1-20, THOMAS KUHN, RICHARD KURTH, THOMAS LICIARDELLO, JOSEPH LISTER, NATHAN LONDON, LYNCH, MAURICIO MALDONADO, MCCAULEY, JOSEPH MCCLOSKEY, MIMM, LINWOOD NORMAN, VINCENT NOWAKOWSKI, JOHN O'HANLON, JAMES O'NEILL, ROBERT OTTO, MARK PALMA, SHAUN PARKER, PHILADELPHIA POLICE CHEMISTS JANE DOE 1-12, PHILADELPHIA POLICE CHEMISTS JOHN DOE 1-12, PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICERS JANE DOES 1-35, PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICERS JOHN DOES 1-35, ERIK PROSS, CHARLES RAMSEY, STEVEN RATKA, JAMES REILLY, BRIAN REYNOLDS, RICHARD ROSS, JR, SCOTT SCHWEIZER, SEIGAFUSE, LESLIE SIMMONS(PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICER), LESLIE SIMMONS(PHILADELPHA POLICE OFFICER, BADGE #4561), RAYMOND SINGLETON, JAMES SMITH, JONATHAN SPEISER, MICHAEL SPICER, CARL STUBBS, TAYLOR, THE KINTOCK GROUP, THOMAS TOLSTOY, DENISE TURPIN, A. VIEGA, JEFFREY WALKER, JAMES WEISS, RICKMAN WILLIAMS-JACKSON, THOMAS WRIGHT(DEPUTY COMMISSIONER), THOMAS WRIGHT(PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICER, BADGE #6123), LEROY ZIEGLER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120661.), filed by SELENA SARMIENTO, STEPHEN LEWIS, AUREA OCASIO, ZAKIYYAH LEWIS, ADEJAH LEWIS, KEVIN BETHEL, LUIS SARMIENTO, MICHELLE FLEXER, JUAN DELVILA, SHEYANNA SARMIENTO, LOUIE SARMIENTO, KHARON FORTUNE LEWIS, JUAN SOLER, CHRISTINE HANDY, TONY MASON.(rt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2015: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rt, ). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SELECT SIX "BELLWETHER" CASES, PURSUANT TO THE SCHEDULE SET OUT HEREIN. THESE SIX CASES WILL BE REMOVED FROM SUSPENSE AND CONSOLIDATED FOR DISPOSITION. THE REMAINDER OF THE CASES SHALL REMAIN IN SUSPENSE UNTIL THE BELLWETHER CASES ARE RESOLVED. A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 7/28/15 AT 3:00 PM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 6613) BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/3/15. 6/3/15 ENTERED & E-MAILED. COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS.(fdc) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/2/2015 04:30 PM.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/1/15. 6/1/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN LEDVA, JR on behalf of KINTOCK GROUP JANE DOE 1-20, KINTOCK GROUP JOHN DOE EMPLOYEES 1-20, THE KINTOCK GROUP (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LEDVA, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE SHALL BE MARKED AS RELATED TO CIV. NO. 12-5690, PLACED IN SUSPENSE AND MARKED AS CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/11/15. 5/11/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN LEDVA, JR on behalf of KINTOCK GROUP JANE DOE 1-20, KINTOCK GROUP JOHN DOE EMPLOYEES 1-20, THE KINTOCK GROUP (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LEDVA, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SELECT SIX "BELLWETHER" CASES, PURSUANT TO THE SCHEDULE SET OUT HEREIN. THESE SIX CASES WILL BE REMOVED FROM SUSPENSE AND CONSOLIDATED FOR DISPOSITION. THE REMAINDER OF THE CASES SHALL REMAIN IN SUSPENSE UNTIL THE BELLWETHER CASES ARE RESOLVED. A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 7/28/15 AT 3:00 PM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 6613) BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/3/15. 6/3/15 ENTERED & E-MAILED. COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS.(fdc) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER THAT PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/2/2015 04:30 PM.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/1/15. 6/1/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE SHALL BE MARKED AS RELATED TO CIV. NO. 12-5690, PLACED IN SUSPENSE AND MARKED AS CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/11/15. 5/11/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK ALL ACTION WITH THE FLAG "12-5690-PD" CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES EXCEPT FOR THE LEAD CASE, CIV. NO. 12-5690. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS ORDER ON THE DOCKETS OF ALL ACTIONS WITH THE FLAG "12-5690-PD" THAT HAVE BEEN ASSIGNED TO ME FOR PRE-TRIAL ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/18/13. 5/8/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DAVID APONTE, PATRICK BANNING, GREGORY BARBER, PERRY BETTS, WILLIAM BLACKBURN, JOSEPH BOLOGNA, FRANK BONNETT, CHRISTOPHER BROOKS, JAMIE BROWN, SHAWN CAREY, CARMONA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, THOMAS CLANCY, COONER, COONEY, KEVIN CUDDAHY, JEFFREY CUDJIK, RICHARD CUJDIK, KEVIN DEVLIN, ERIC DIAL, DIDONATO, STEPHEN DMYTRYK, MICHAEL EDINGER, ELLINGSWORTH, FLYNN, ERIK GARNETT, GIULIAN, JOSEPH GOODWIN, KEVIN GORMAN, ROOSEVELT HAGINS, JR, HARDY, HARVEY, HOLTS, CHRISTOPHER HULMES, GINA JACKSON, ERIC JOHNSON, JONES, CHARLES KAPUSNIAK, THOMAS KELLY, KINTOCK GROUP JANE DOE 1-20, KINTOCK GROUP JOHN DOE EMPLOYEES 1-20, THOMAS KUHN, RICHARD KURTH, THOMAS LICIARDELLO, JOSEPH LISTER, NATHAN LONDON, LYNCH, MAURICIO MALDONADO, MCCAULEY, JOSEPH MCCLOSKEY, MIMM, LINWOOD NORMAN, VINCENT NOWAKOWSKI, JOHN O'HANLON, JAMES O'NEILL, ROBERT OTTO, MARK PALMA, SHAUN PARKER, PHILADELPHIA POLICE CHEMISTS JANE DOE 1-12, PHILADELPHIA POLICE CHEMISTS JOHN DOE 1-12, PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICERS JANE DOES 1-35, PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICERS JOHN DOES 1-35, ERIK PROSS, CHARLES RAMSEY, STEVEN RATKA, JAMES REILLY, BRIAN REYNOLDS, RICHARD ROSS, JR, SCOTT SCHWEIZER, SEIGAFUSE, LESLIE SIMMONS(PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICER), LESLIE SIMMONS(PHILADELPHA POLICE OFFICER, BADGE #4561), RAYMOND SINGLETON, JAMES SMITH, JONATHAN SPEISER, MICHAEL SPICER, CARL STUBBS, TAYLOR, THE KINTOCK GROUP, THOMAS TOLSTOY, DENISE TURPIN, A. VIEGA, JEFFREY WALKER, JAMES WEISS, RICKMAN WILLIAMS-JACKSON, THOMAS WRIGHT(DEPUTY COMMISSIONER), THOMAS WRIGHT(PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICER, BADGE #6123), LEROY ZIEGLER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120661.), filed by SELENA SARMIENTO, STEPHEN LEWIS, AUREA OCASIO, ZAKIYYAH LEWIS, ADEJAH LEWIS, KEVIN BETHEL, LUIS SARMIENTO, MICHELLE FLEXER, JUAN DELVILA, SHEYANNA SARMIENTO, LOUIE SARMIENTO, KHARON FORTUNE LEWIS, JUAN SOLER, CHRISTINE HANDY, TONY MASON.(rt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2015: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rt, ). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.