This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 11:26:31 (UTC).

DeCastro v. Progressive Northern Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 DeCastro filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Northern Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00983

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Desiree DeCastro

Defendant

Progressive Northern Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Birka-White

Attorney at Birka-White Law Offices

65 Oak Court

Danville, CA 94526

Ines Olevic-Saleh

Attorney at Jesse Sbaih & Associates, LTD

170 S. Green Valley Parkway, Suite 280

Henderson, NV 89012

Jesse M. Sbaih

Attorney at Jesse Sbaih & Associates, Ltd.

170 S. Green Valley Parkway, Suite 280

Henderson, NV 89012

Mindy M. Wong

Attorney at Birka-White Law Offices

65 Oak Court

Danville, CA 94526

Defendant Attorneys

J. Stephen Peek

Attorney at Holland & Hart, LLP

9555 Hillwood Drive, 2Nd Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Joseph G. Went

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

9555 Hillwood Drive, Second Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89131

Jeffrey S. Cashdan

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Zachary A. McEntyre

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES against Progressive Northern Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3280459), filed by Desiree DeCastro. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/28/2014. Proof of service due by 10/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Sbaih, Jesse) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (ASB) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel David M. Birka-White and Mindy M. Wong to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s) upon approval of the Verified Petition. Verified Petition due by 8/2/2014.(no image attached) (ASB) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Desiree DeCastro. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Olevic-Saleh, Ines) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#5

(#5) VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David M. Birka-White and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jesse M. Sbaih (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3291166) filed by Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro . Motion ripe 6/26/2014. (Wong, Mindy) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#6

(#6) VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mindy M. Wong and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jesse M. Sbaih (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3291168) filed by Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro . Motion ripe 6/27/2014. (Wong, Mindy) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting 5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David M. Birka-White for Desiree DeCastro and approving Attorney Jesse M. Sbaih as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 06/27/2014. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting 6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mindy M. Wong for Desiree DeCastro and approving Attorney Jesse M. Sbaih as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 06/27/2014. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro. (Sbaih, Jesse) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

#28

(#28) CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Progressive Northern Insurance Company and against Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 4/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#27

(#27) ORDER granting without prejudice 14 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#26

(#26) REPLY to Response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Went, Joseph) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

#25

(#25) ORDER ON STIPULATION granting 24 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to file a reply to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Replies due by 11/18/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

#24

(#24) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ; by Defendant Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Went, Joseph) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro. Replies due by 11/3/2014. (Birka-White, David) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

#22

(#22) ORDER ON STIPULATION granting 21 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to file a response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/24/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ; by Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro. (Birka-White, David) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting 17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey S. Cashdan for Progressive Northern Insurance Company and approving J. Stephen Peek as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2014. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Progressive Northern Insurance Company and against Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 4/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER granting without prejudice 14 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) REPLY to Response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Went, Joseph) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER ON STIPULATION granting 24 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to file a reply to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Replies due by 11/18/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ; by Defendant Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Went, Joseph) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro. Replies due by 11/3/2014. (Birka-White, David) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER ON STIPULATION granting 21 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to file a response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/24/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ; by Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro. (Birka-White, David) (Entered: 09/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting 17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey S. Cashdan for Progressive Northern Insurance Company and approving J. Stephen Peek as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2014. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting 18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Zachary A. McEntyre for Progressive Northern Insurance Company and approving J. Stephen Peek as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2014. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Progressive Northern Insurance Company re 1 Complaint. (MAJ) (Main Document 10 replaced on 7/11/2014) (MAJ). (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro. (Sbaih, Jesse) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Granting 6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mindy M. Wong for Desiree DeCastro and approving Attorney Jesse M. Sbaih as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 06/27/2014. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Granting 5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David M. Birka-White for Desiree DeCastro and approving Attorney Jesse M. Sbaih as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 06/27/2014. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mindy M. Wong and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jesse M. Sbaih (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3291168) filed by Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro . Motion ripe 6/27/2014. (Wong, Mindy) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David M. Birka-White and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jesse M. Sbaih (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3291166) filed by Plaintiff Desiree DeCastro . Motion ripe 6/26/2014. (Wong, Mindy) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Desiree DeCastro. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Olevic-Saleh, Ines) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel David M. Birka-White and Mindy M. Wong to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s) upon approval of the Verified Petition. Verified Petition due by 8/2/2014.(no image attached) (ASB) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (ASB) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES against Progressive Northern Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3280459), filed by Desiree DeCastro. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/28/2014. Proof of service due by 10/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Sbaih, Jesse) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.