This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2016 at 12:40:05 (UTC).

DC ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2014 DC ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-01293

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WASHINGTON LATIN PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL

EAGLE ACADEMY PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL

DC ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS

D.C. ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS

Defendants

JEFFREY S. DEWITT

VINCENT C. GRAY

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Amicus Curiae

SUZANNE WELLS

MATTHEW FRUMIN

S.H.A.P.P.E.

FAITH GIBSON HUBBARD

NANCY SARAH SMITH

VICTOR REINOSO

CATHY REILLY

STEPHEN SMITH

MARTIN WELLES

BLACK ALLIANCE FOR EDUCATIONAL OPTIONS

21ST CENTURY SCHOOL FUND

PEDRO RUBIO

EBONI-ROSE THOMPSON

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen V. Carey

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE & DORR LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Ryan J. Huschka

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE & DORR LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Sherry A. Ingram

Attorney at THE MARCUS FIRM, PLLC

1730 Rhode Island Avenue, Nw, Suite 713

Washington, DC 20036

Carl J. Nichols

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE & DORR LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Stephen Howard Marcus

1730 Rhode Island Aenue, Nw, Suite 713

Washington, DC 20036

Sherry Ann Ingram

Attorney at THE MARCUS FIRM

1730 Rhode Island Avenue, Nw, Suite 713

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas Stuart Rosenbloom

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

441 4Th Street, Nw, One Judiciary Square- 6Th Floor South

Washington, DC 20001

Matthew Robert Blecher

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

441 4Th Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

Chad Wayne Copeland

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

441 4Th Street, Nw, Suite 630 South

Washington, DC 20001

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

John Edward Heintz

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

1825 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Daniel Patrick Schaefer

Attorney at DICKSTEIN SHAPIRO LLP

1825 I Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jodi Trulove

2949 Brandywine Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20008

Dennis M. Cariello

Attorney at HOGAN MARREN, LTD.

40 Broad Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Joleen Roslyn Okun

Attorney at OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART, P.C.

1909 K Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3793947) filed by DC ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Corporate Disclosure, # 9 Corporate Disclosure, # 10 Corporate Disclosure)(Ingram, Sherry) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

#2

(#2) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DC ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS (sth, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

#3

(#3) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EAGLE ACADEMY PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL (sth, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

#4

(#4) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON LATIN PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL (sth, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JEFFREY S. DEWITT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Blecher on behalf of All Defendants (Blecher, Matthew) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to VINCENT C. GRAY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Stuart Rosenbloom on behalf of All Defendants (Rosenbloom, Douglas) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by JEFFREY S. DEWITT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY (Blecher, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2014)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen V. Carey on behalf of D.C. ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS, EAGLE ACADEMY PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL, WASHINGTON LATIN PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL (Carey, Stephen) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#35

(#35) PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE and Request for Mediation Referral by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Blecher, Matthew) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#34

(#34) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JEFFREY S. DEWITT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY.(Blecher, Matthew) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

#33

(#33) NOTICE Regarding Proposed Schedule by JEFFREY S. DEWITT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY (Rosenbloom, Douglas) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#32

(#32) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/30/15. (lctsc2) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

#31

(#31) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/30/15. (lctsc2) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

#30

(#30) RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by D.C. ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS, EAGLE ACADEMY PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL, WASHINGTON LATIN PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL. (Huschka, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

#29

(#29) TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan, held on June 16, 2015. Page Numbers: 1-73. Date of Issuance: 8/11/15. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne; telephone number: 202-354-3186. Court Reporter Email Address: Bryan_Wayne@dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.

Redaction Request due 9/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2015.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#28

(#28) Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule by D.C. ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS (Marcus, Stephen) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen V. Carey on behalf of D.C. ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS, EAGLE ACADEMY PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL, WASHINGTON LATIN PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL (Carey, Stephen) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE and Request for Mediation Referral by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Blecher, Matthew) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JEFFREY S. DEWITT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY.(Blecher, Matthew) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE Regarding Proposed Schedule by JEFFREY S. DEWITT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY (Rosenbloom, Douglas) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/30/15. (lctsc2) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/30/15. (lctsc2) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by D.C. ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS, EAGLE ACADEMY PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL, WASHINGTON LATIN PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL. (Huschka, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan, held on June 16, 2015. Page Numbers: 1-73. Date of Issuance: 8/11/15. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne; telephone number: 202-354-3186. Court Reporter Email Address: Bryan_Wayne@dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.

    Redaction Request due 9/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2015.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule by D.C. ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS (Marcus, Stephen) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by JEFFREY S. DEWITT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY (Blecher, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule Revising and Extending Current Deadlines by JEFFREY S. DEWITT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY (Rosenbloom, Douglas) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by JEFFREY S. DEWITT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY (Blecher, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Stuart Rosenbloom on behalf of All Defendants (Rosenbloom, Douglas) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to VINCENT C. GRAY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Blecher on behalf of All Defendants (Blecher, Matthew) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JEFFREY S. DEWITT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON LATIN PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL (sth, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EAGLE ACADEMY PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL (sth, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DC ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS (sth, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3793947) filed by DC ASSOCIATION OF CHARTERED PUBLIC SCHOOLS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Corporate Disclosure, # 9 Corporate Disclosure, # 10 Corporate Disclosure)(Ingram, Sherry) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.