This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 05:44:03 (UTC).

Davis v. Department Stores National Bank et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2015 Davis filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Department Stores National Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-02268

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tommy D. Davis

Defendants

Capital One

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Silver State Schools Credit Union

HSBC Bank

WebBank

Department Stores National Bank

First National Bank of Omaha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David H. Krieger

Attorney at Haines & Krieger, LLC

8985 S. Eastern Avenue, Suite 350

Henderson, NV 89123

Michael Kind

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group, APC

7854 W. Sahara Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Danny Horen

7854 W. Sahara Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Defendant Attorneys

Brandon Claus Fernald

Attorney at Fernald Law Group LLP

6236 Laredo Street

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Bob L. Olson

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

3883 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 1100

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Charles E Gianelloni

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

3883 Howard Hughes Parkway

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Michael R Brooks

Attorney at Brooks Hubley, LLP

1645 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Shaun Rose

Attorney at Brooks Hubley LLP

1645 Village Center Circle, Suit #200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Ramir Mitchell Hernandez

Attorney at Brooks Hubley, LLP

1645 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

J. Christopher Jorgensen

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

3993 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Darren T Brenner

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1160 Town Center Drive, Suite 330

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Matthew I Knepper

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1160 Town Center Drive, Suite 330

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Joseph G. Went

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

9555 Hillwood Drive, Second Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89131

Nicole E. Lovelock

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

9555 Hillwood Drive, 2Nd Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89134

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#34

#35

#36

#37

#38

#39

#40

#41

#42

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael Kind is substituted in the place of Danny J. Horen for Plaintiff Tommy D.Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 03/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) REQUEST for Judicial Notice re 40 Response to Motion ; by Plaintiff Tommy D. Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kind, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) RESPONSE to 36 Motion for Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Tommy D. Davis. Replies due by 3/16/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kind, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Tommy D. Davis. Responses due by 3/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kind, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiff Tommy D. Davis. (Kind, Michael) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ANSWER to Complaint re 1 Petition for Removal, filed by Department Stores National Bank.(Knepper, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant HSBC Bank. Responses due by 3/6/2016. (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by HSBC Bank that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate HSBC Card Services, Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC Investments (North America) Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC Overseas Holdings (UK) Limited, Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings plc, Other Affiliate HSBC Finance Corporation fka Household International, Inc. for HSBC Bank added. . (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tommy D. Davis. HSBC Bank served on 11/19/2015, answer due 2/9/2016; WebBank served on 11/25/2015, answer due 12/16/2015. (Kind, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ANSWER to Complaint re 1 Petition for Removal, filed by HSBC Bank.(Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Silver State Schools Credit Union. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To Respond to Complaint by Defendant Capital One. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SSSCU'S ANSWER to Complaint re 1 Petition for Removal, filed by Silver State Schools Credit Union.(Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Olson, Bob) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint re 1 Petition for Removal, and Jury Demand filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/19/2015. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/23/2016.(Olson, Bob) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 4 Notice of Change of Attorney by Plaintiff Tommy D. Davis. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Kind, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Plaintiff Tommy D. Davis. (Kind, Michael) Corrected image 5 added on 12/8/2015. (EDS). (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, on 12/2/2015. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/20/2015. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (PS) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-15-722628-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-3909925), filed by Silver State Schools Credit Union. Proof of service due by 12/3/2015. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/11/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER STATE SCHOOLS CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where WEBBANK is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK is a litigant