This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2016 at 09:05:45 (UTC).

Daniels v. Credit Protection Association, LP

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Daniels filed an Other lawsuit against Credit Protection Association, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Judith E. Levy and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-11647

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Judith E. Levy

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clayton Daniels

Defendant

Credit Protection Association, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Michael Menditto

Attorney at Hyslip & Taylor, LLC, LPA

1100 W. Cermak Rd, B410

Chicago, IL 60185

Lori A. Leigh

26400 Lahser Rd., Suite 107

Southfield, MI 48033

Jeffrey S. Hyslip

Attorney at Hyslip & Taylor LLC, LPA

1100 W. Cermak Road, Suite B410

Chicago, IL 60608

Defendant Attorney

Justin M. Penn

Attorney at Hinshaw and Culbertson

222 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER Permitting Filing of Responsive Pleading re 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Credit Protection Association, LP identifying Corporate Parent Etan General, Inc. for Credit Protection Association, LP. (Penn, Justin) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Menditto on behalf of Clayton Daniels. (Menditto, David) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Credit Protection Association, LP waiver sent on 5/7/2015, answer due 7/6/2015. (Hyslip, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Penn on behalf of Credit Protection Association, LP. (Penn, Justin) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Clayton Daniels against Credit Protection Association, LP with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-5152087 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Outside of State - County of 1st Defendant: Outside of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hyslip, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Instanter by Credit Protection Association, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Penn, Justin) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori A. Leigh on behalf of Clayton Daniels. (Leigh, Lori) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Permitting Filing of Responsive Pleading re 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Instanter by Credit Protection Association, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Penn, Justin) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Credit Protection Association, LP identifying Corporate Parent Etan General, Inc. for Credit Protection Association, LP. (Penn, Justin) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Penn on behalf of Credit Protection Association, LP. (Penn, Justin) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Credit Protection Association, LP waiver sent on 5/7/2015, answer due 7/6/2015. (Hyslip, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Menditto on behalf of Clayton Daniels. (Menditto, David) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori A. Leigh on behalf of Clayton Daniels. (Leigh, Lori) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Clayton Daniels against Credit Protection Association, LP with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-5152087 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Outside of State - County of 1st Defendant: Outside of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hyslip, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.