This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:07:06 (UTC).

Daniel v. Armslist LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2015 Daniel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Armslist LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Rudolph T Randa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01387

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Rudolph T Randa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yasmeen Daniel

Defendants

Broc Elmore

Estate of Radcliffe Haughton

Armslist, LLC

ABC Insurance Company

Brian Mancini

Jonathan Gibbon

DEF Insurance Company

Devin Linn

Armslist LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alla Lefkowitz

Attorney at Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence

840 1St St - Ste 400

Washington, DC 20002

Brett A Eckstein

Attorney at Cannon & Dunphy SC

595 N Barker Rd, Po Box 1750

Brookfield, WI 53008-1750

Jonathan E Lowy

Attorney at Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence

840 1St St - Ste 400

Washington, DC 20002

Kelly Sampson

Attorney at Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence

840 1St St - Ste 400

Washington, DC 20002

Patrick O Dunphy

Attorney at Cannon & Dunphy SC

595 N Barker Rd, Po Box 1750

Brookfield, WI 53008-1750

Arunabha Bhoumik

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Jacqueline C Wolff

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Nirav S Shah

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Samantha J Katze

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher M Scaperlanda

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2040

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4497

Eric J Van Schyndle

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2040

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4497

Michael D McClintock

Attorney at McAfee & Taft PC

Two Leadership Sq, 211 N Robinson - 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Zachary A Oubre

Attorney at McAfee & Taft PC

Two Leadership Sq, 211 N Robinson - 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Joshua D Maggard

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2040

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4497

John F Fuchs

Attorney at Fuchs & Boyle SC

1233 N Mayfair Rd - Ste 210

Milwaukee, WI 53226-4253

Kevin M Fetherston

Attorney at Peterson Johnson & Murray SC

788 N Jefferson St - Ste 500

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4700

Terry E Johnson

Attorney at Peterson Johnson & Murray SC

788 N Jefferson St - Ste 500

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4700

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#26

#27

#28

#29

#30

#31

#32

#33

#34

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Yasmeen Daniel re 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Wolff, Jacqueline)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M Scaperlanda on behalf of Armslist LLC, Broc Elmore, Jonathan Gibbon, Brian Mancini. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher Scaperlanda (Scaperlanda, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A Oubre on behalf of Armslist LLC, Broc Elmore, Jonathan Gibbon, Brian Mancini. Attorney(s) appearing: Zachary A.P. Oubre (Oubre, Zachary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D McClintock on behalf of Armslist LLC, Broc Elmore, Jonathan Gibbon, Brian Mancini. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael D. McClintock (McClintock, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Armslist LLC, Broc Elmore, Jonathan Gibbon, Brian Mancini re 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order of Dismissal, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Law Review Article, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet)(McClintock, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Armslist LLC, Broc Elmore, Jonathan Gibbon, Brian Mancini. (Van Schyndle, Eric)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RE-FILED; SEE 29 Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Armslist LLC, Broc Elmore, Jonathan Gibbon, Brian Mancini. (Van Schyndle, Eric) Modified on 1/19/2016 (blr).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DISCLOSURE Statement by Armslist LLC, Broc Elmore, Jonathan Gibbon, Brian Mancini. (Van Schyndle, Eric)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Alla Lefkowitz on behalf of Yasmeen Daniel. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan E Lowy (Lefkowitz, Alla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Alla Lefkowitz on behalf of Yasmeen Daniel. Attorney(s) appearing: Alla Lefkowitz (Lefkowitz, Alla)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha J Katze on behalf of Yasmeen Daniel. Attorney(s) appearing: Samantha J. Katze (Katze, Samantha)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Nirav S Shah on behalf of Yasmeen Daniel. Attorney(s) appearing: Nirav S. Shah (Shah, Nirav)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Arunabha Bhoumik on behalf of Yasmeen Daniel. Attorney(s) appearing: Arunabha Bhoumik (Bhoumik, Arunabha)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline C Wolff on behalf of Yasmeen Daniel. Attorney(s) appearing: Jacqueline C. Wolff (Wolff, Jacqueline)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 12/9/2015 APPROVING 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendant Linn shall file any motion to dismiss/responsive pleading to the Complaint by 1/31/2016. If plaintiffs file motion to remand, Linn to file motion to dismiss/responsive pleading within 30 days of the Court's decision on the motion. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 12/9/2015 APPROVING 3 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendants Armslist LLC, Elmore, Gibbon, Mancini shall file any motion to dismiss/responsive pleading to the Complaint by 1/31/2016. If plaintiffs file motion to remand, above defendants to file motion to dismiss/responsive pleading within 30 days of the Court's decision on the motion. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Yasmeen Daniel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunphy, Patrick)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION Granting Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Armslist, LLC, Broc Elmore, Jonathan Gibbon, Brian Mancini. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Schyndle, Eric)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 11/23/15. Judge J P Stadtmueller recused. Case reassigned to Judge Rudolph T Randa for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(nm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brian Mancini, Armslist, LLC, Broc Elmore, Jonathan Gibbon from Milwaukee, Case Number: 15-CV-008710 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2225215) (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Affidavit, # 7 Affidavit, # 8 Affidavit, # 9 Affidavit, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maggard, Joshua)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Armslist LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DEF Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alla Lefkowitz