This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 02:54:55 (UTC).

Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. Radenkovic

Case Summary

On 05/30/2014 Dallas Buyers Club, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Radenkovic. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Gary Feinerman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-04000

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Defendants

John Doe 24

John Doe, 27

John Doe 29

John Doe 26

John Doe, 4

John Doe 8

John Doe 30

John Doe 13

Jorie Weiss

John Doe 18

Timothy Murray

Gary Rebout

John Doe 7

John Doe 15

Pamela Buhlman

Does 1-30

John Doe 11

John Doe 5

John Doe 16

John Doe, 19

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Michael A. Hierl

Attorney at Hughes Socol PIers Resnick & Dym Ltd

Three First National Plaza, 70 West Madison Street, Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60602

Todd Sheldon Parkhurst

Attorney at Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Three First National Plaza, 70 W Madison Street, Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60602

Karyn L Bass Ehler

Attorney at Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.

70 W. Madison Street, #4000

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by DALLAS BUYERS CLUB, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9530193. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DALLAS BUYERS CLUB, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DALLAS BUYERS CLUB, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DALLAS BUYERS CLUB, LLC by Karyn L Bass Ehler (Bass Ehler, Karyn) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

#6

(#6) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ea, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 8/5/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 7/292014. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the initial status hearing and Initial Status Report.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

#61

(#61) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing set for 5/14/2015 at 9:00 a.m. 60 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

#62

(#62) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 6/15/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Enter orders as to Defendants Sandra Holland and Eloisa Marquez.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#63

(#63) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 6/15/2015 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#64

(#64) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/14/2015.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#65

(#65) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/14/2015.(jlj, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#66

(#66) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Pamela Buhlman (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#67

(#67) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. Stipulated Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Fred Vukadinovic (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#68

(#68) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal of Defendant Buhlman 66 , and Plaintiff and Defendant Vukadinovic have filed a stipulation of dismissal 67 , the terms of which are set forth therein. This resolves all claims against all Defendants. All pending motions are denied as moot. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#69

(#69) MAILED copyright report with copy of minute order dated 6/15/2015 to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: # 1 certified order)(cc, ) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) MAILED copyright report with copy of minute order dated 6/15/2015 to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: # 1 certified order)(cc, ) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal of Defendant Buhlman 66 , and Plaintiff and Defendant Vukadinovic have filed a stipulation of dismissal 67 , the terms of which are set forth therein. This resolves all claims against all Defendants. All pending motions are denied as moot. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. Stipulated Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Fred Vukadinovic (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Pamela Buhlman (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/14/2015.(jlj, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/14/2015.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 6/15/2015 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 6/15/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Enter orders as to Defendants Sandra Holland and Eloisa Marquez.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing set for 5/14/2015 at 9:00 a.m. 60 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 5/14/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for default judgment 57 is granted. Defendant Eloisa Marquez is liable to Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club in the amount of $13,150.25. Defendant Sandra Holland is liable to Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club in the amount of $13,150.25. An injunction order will issue as well. Plaintiff shall submit draft injunction order.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. in support of motion for discovery 9 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 8/5/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 7/292014. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the initial status hearing and Initial Status Report.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ea, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DALLAS BUYERS CLUB, LLC by Karyn L Bass Ehler (Bass Ehler, Karyn) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DALLAS BUYERS CLUB, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DALLAS BUYERS CLUB, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by DALLAS BUYERS CLUB, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9530193. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less