This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:18:49 (UTC).

Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. Does 1-39

Case Summary

On 01/28/2015 Dallas Buyers Club, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Does 1-39. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard A Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00134

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard A Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dallas Buyers Club, LLC

Defendants

John Doe 19

John Doe 37

John Doe 21

John Doe 29

John Doe 26

John Doe 8

John Doe 30

John Doe 13

John Doe 16

John Doe 18

John Doe 33

John Doe 7

John Doe 15

John Doe 27

John Doe 22

John Doe 24

John Doe 32

John Doe 11

John Doe 38

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Allen Lowe

Attorney at LOWE GRAHAM JONES

701 5Th Ave, Ste 4800

Seattle, WA 98104-7009

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin R Justus

Attorney at LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

7900 Se 28Th St. Fl. 5

Mercer Is, WA 98040-6005

Al Van Kampen

Attorney at ROHDE & VAN KAMPEN

1001 Fourth Avenue, Ste 4050

Seattle, WA 98154

Other Attorneys

Venkat Balasubramani

Attorney at FOCAL PLLC

800 Fifth Avenue Suite 4100

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Receipt # 0981-3889831) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Report on Copyrights (AO Form121))(Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 14-cv-1153, 14-cv-1336, 14-cv-1402, 14-cv-1684, 14-cv-1819, 14-cv-1926, 15-cv-133, by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/30/2015, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/30/2015)

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of Daniel Macek filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/30/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting pltf's 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant John Doe 37. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant John Doe 25. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#38

(#38) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 7 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) John Doe 16, John Doe 23, John Doe 4, John Doe 13 and John Doe 15, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#40

(#40) STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) John Doe 11, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#42

(#42) Second STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#43

(#43) MOTION for Leave to Permit Alternative Service by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/22/2016, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Venkat Balasubramani on behalf of Defendant John Doe 14. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#46

(#46) NOTICE OF DOE 14S INTENT TO FILE OPPOSITION re 43 MOTION for Leave to Permit Alternative Service ; filed by Defendant John Doe 14. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) NOTICE OF DOE 14S INTENT TO FILE OPPOSITION re 43 MOTION for Leave to Permit Alternative Service ; filed by Defendant John Doe 14. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Venkat Balasubramani on behalf of Defendant John Doe 14. (Balasubramani, Venkat) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC re 43 MOTION for Leave to Permit Alternative Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MOTION for Leave to Permit Alternative Service by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/22/2016, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Second STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) John Doe 11, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) John Doe 16, John Doe 23, John Doe 4, John Doe 13 and John Doe 15, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 7 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) John Doe 32, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant John Doe 27. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant John Doe 25. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant John Doe 37. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting pltf's 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Daniel Macek filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/30/2015, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 14-cv-1153, 14-cv-1336, 14-cv-1402, 14-cv-1684, 14-cv-1819, 14-cv-1926, 15-cv-133, by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Receipt # 0981-3889831) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Report on Copyrights (AO Form121))(Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less