This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:44:59 (UTC).

Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. DOES 1-28

Case Summary

On 04/13/2015 Dallas Buyers Club, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against DOES 1-28. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard A Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00576

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard A Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dallas Buyers Club, LLC

Defendants

Brooke D. Weller

Doe 22

Doe 8

Gene Yiu

Doe 12

Doe 17

Doe 19

Doe 2

Doe 7

Doe 21

Doe 11

Doe 1

Doe 26

Taylor Bland

Doe 23

Anna Lipman

Teal Williams

Doe 16

Doe 18

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Allen Lowe

Attorney at LOWE GRAHAM JONES

701 5Th Ave, Ste 4800

Seattle, WA 98104-7009

Defendant Attorney

Bradley J Drury

Attorney at JACK W HANEMANN

2120 State Ave Ne, Ste 101

Olympia, WA 98506

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 14-1153, 14-1336, 14-1402,14-1684, 14-1819, 14-1926, 15-133, 15-134, by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/17/2015, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of DANIEL MACEK filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER PERMITTING SUBPOENAS TO INTERNET SERVICE PROVIDERS granting pltf's 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#8

(#8) STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DOE 11 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 3, Doe 8, Doe 15 and Doe 25, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#25

(#25) MOTION for Leave to Extend Time and Conduct FRCP Discovery by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement Cases) Noting Date 12/25/2015, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

#26

(#26) DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC re 25 MOTION for Leave to Extend Time and Conduct FRCP Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 12, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

#28

(#28) ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The Court DENIES in part and GRANTS in part Plaintiff's Motion located at dkt. 25 ; Plaintiff must file an amended complaint naming all remaining Doe defendants within 30 days of this Order; Plaintiff must serve all of those remaining defendants within 60 days of the filing of the amended complaint; Plaintiff must seek entry of default against any defaulting named defendant within 30 days after the expiration of the time for the defendant to answer or otherwise respond. Plaintiff must also seek default judgment or otherwise resolve its claim against a defaulted defendant within 30 days of the entry of default. (AD) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#29

(#29) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Taylor Bland, Gene Yiu, Brooke D. Weller, Gerry Amburgey, Anthony Florio, Ravina Singh, Teal Williams, Anna Lipman, Susan Rath, Sadie Kennedy with JURY DEMAND, filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#30

(#30) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 26 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

#31

(#31) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/12/2016)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Ravina Singh, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/19/2016)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Ravina Singh, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 26 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Taylor Bland, Gene Yiu, Brooke D. Weller, Gerry Amburgey, Anthony Florio, Ravina Singh, Teal Williams, Anna Lipman, Susan Rath, Sadie Kennedy with JURY DEMAND, filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The Court DENIES in part and GRANTS in part Plaintiff's Motion located at dkt. 25 ; Plaintiff must file an amended complaint naming all remaining Doe defendants within 30 days of this Order; Plaintiff must serve all of those remaining defendants within 60 days of the filing of the amended complaint; Plaintiff must seek entry of default against any defaulting named defendant within 30 days after the expiration of the time for the defendant to answer or otherwise respond. Plaintiff must also seek default judgment or otherwise resolve its claim against a defaulted defendant within 30 days of the entry of default. (AD) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 12, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC re 25 MOTION for Leave to Extend Time and Conduct FRCP Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION for Leave to Extend Time and Conduct FRCP Discovery by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement Cases) Noting Date 12/25/2015, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 3, Doe 8, Doe 15 and Doe 25, filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER denying pltf's 21 Motion for leave to issue FRCP 45 subpoenas to nonparties; pltf must file an amended complaint with only named dfts; dismissed Doe defendants shall remain as currently named i.e. as Doe 1, and so on by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DOE 14 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DOE 11 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER PERMITTING SUBPOENAS TO INTERNET SERVICE PROVIDERS granting pltf's 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of DANIEL MACEK filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/17/2015, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 14-1153, 14-1336, 14-1402,14-1684, 14-1819, 14-1926, 15-133, 15-134, by Plaintiff Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against defendant(s) DOES 1-28 (Receipt # 0981-3977278) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form121))(Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less