This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:45:09 (UTC).

CYVA Research Holdings, LLC v. AuctionArms.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2015 CYVA Research Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AuctionArms com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01941

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYVA Research Holdings, LLC

Defendant

AuctionArms.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stevenson Moore, V

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Krystal La'Shae McCool

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Barrett Chistopher Lesher

Attorney at Hallett & Perrin PC - Dallas

1445 Ross Avenue, Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75202

Bryan Paul Stevens

Attorney at Hallett & Perrin PC - Dallas

1445 Ross Avenue, Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AuctionArms.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5504280.), filed by CYVA Research Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Krystal La'Shae Gibbens on behalf of CYVA Research Holdings, LLC (Gibbens, Krystal) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CYVA Research Holdings, LLC (Gibbens, Krystal) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gibbens, Krystal) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stevenson Moore, V on behalf of CYVA Research Holdings, LLC (Moore, Stevenson) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to AuctionArms.com, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CYVA Research Holdings, LLC. AuctionArms.com, Inc. served on 12/3/2015, answer due 12/24/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

#8

(#8) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1541. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/22/16. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/24/2016)

#9

(#9) ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by AuctionArms.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesher, Barrett) Modified on 2/11/2016 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#10

(#10) ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by AuctionArms.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesher, Barrett) Modified on 2/17/2016 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/17/2016)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to District Court of Utah by AuctionArms.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Exhibit A-6, # 8 Exhibit A-7, # 9 Exhibit A-8, # 10 Exhibit A-9, # 11 Exhibit A-10, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue)(Stevens, Bryan) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#12

(#12) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE by CYVA Research Holdings, LLC Joint Letter Concerning Claim Construction for Section 101 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Massand, Neal) Modified on 2/23/2016 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/22/2016)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE by CYVA Research Holdings, LLC Joint Letter Concerning Claim Construction for Section 101 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Massand, Neal) Modified on 2/23/2016 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to District Court of Utah by AuctionArms.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Exhibit A-6, # 8 Exhibit A-7, # 9 Exhibit A-8, # 10 Exhibit A-9, # 11 Exhibit A-10, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue)(Stevens, Bryan) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by AuctionArms.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesher, Barrett) Modified on 2/17/2016 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by AuctionArms.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesher, Barrett) Modified on 2/11/2016 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1541. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/22/16. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CYVA Research Holdings, LLC. AuctionArms.com, Inc. served on 12/3/2015, answer due 12/24/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to AuctionArms.com, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stevenson Moore, V on behalf of CYVA Research Holdings, LLC (Moore, Stevenson) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gibbens, Krystal) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CYVA Research Holdings, LLC (Gibbens, Krystal) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Krystal La'Shae Gibbens on behalf of CYVA Research Holdings, LLC (Gibbens, Krystal) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AuctionArms.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5504280.), filed by CYVA Research Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CYVA Research Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan Paul Stevens

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barrett Chistopher Lesher