This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/24/2021 at 00:37:16 (UTC).

Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. v. Illinois National Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2014 Cushman Wakefield, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Illinois National Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan H. Lefkow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-08725

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan H. Lefkow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

ACE American Insurance Company, Inc.

RLI Insurance Company

Illinois National Insurance Company

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Ryan A. Hargrave

Attorney at McKool Smith PC

Suite 1500, 300 Crescent Court

Dallas, TX 75201

Daniel Wagner London

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

59 Maiden Lane, 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Daniel Anthony Johnson

Attorney at Leader & Berkon LLP

630 Third Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Kristen Grace Rossetti

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

47Th Floor, One Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Avery Roderick Williams

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

Suite 1500, 300 Crescent Court

Dallas, TX 75205

Skyler J. Silvertrust

Attorney at Willkie Far & Gallagher LLP

300 N. Lasalle Dr. - 50Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

Linda D. Kornfeld

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christopher A Wadley

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP

One North Franklin Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

Perry Ian Kreidman

59 Maiden Lane, 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

David Bradley Franklin

Attorney at London Fischer Llp

59 Maiden Lane, 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Melissa Lynn Swindel

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

39Th Floor, 59 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Kyle Christopher Seay

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP

One North Franklin Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

Christopher J Shannon

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek Llp

1 North Franklin St., Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

Michelle Marie Bracke

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West Adams Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60661

Michael John Duffy

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

Andrew Shilling Johnson

Attorney at Schoenberg Finkel Newman & Rosenberg, LLC

222 South Riverside Plaza, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60606

Douglas K. Eisenstein

Attorney at Bressler Amery & Ross

17 State Street, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Robert Novack

Attorney at Carlton Fields, P.A.

180 Park Avenue, Suite 106

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Bradley Steven Levison

Attorney at Choate Herschman Levison, LLC

401 S Lasalle St, Suite 1302G

Chicago, IL 60605

Robert Marc Chemers

Attorney at Pretzel & Stouffer, Chtd.

One South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606-4673

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Avery Roderick Williams

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

Suite 1500, 300 Crescent Court

Dallas, TX 75205

Linda D. Kornfeld

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Christopher A Wadley

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP

One North Franklin Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

Perry Ian Kreidman

59 Maiden Lane, 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

David Bradley Franklin

Attorney at London Fischer Llp

59 Maiden Lane, 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Michelle Marie Bracke

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West Adams Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60661

Andrew Shilling Johnson

Attorney at Schoenberg Finkel Newman & Rosenberg, LLC

222 South Riverside Plaza, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60606

Douglas K. Eisenstein

Attorney at Bressler Amery & Ross

17 State Street, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Robert Novack

Attorney at Carlton Fields, P.A.

180 Park Avenue, Suite 106

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Bradley Steven Levison

Attorney at Choate Herschman Levison, LLC

401 S Lasalle St, Suite 1302G

Chicago, IL 60605

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#409

#408

#407

#406

#405

#404

366 #3

Declaration of Jo-Ann Spinelli

366 #2

Declaration of Brian Sweeney

366 #1

Declaration of Robert Novack

#366

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

834 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#409) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #408 , this case is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#408) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and without Costs (Duffy, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#407) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The status hearing set for 12/17/2019 is stricken and reset to 1/7/2020 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to the next status hearing, no appearance will be necessary. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#406) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The status hearing set for 12/3/2019 is stricken and reset to 12/17/2019 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to the next status hearing, no appearance will be necessary. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#405) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The status hearing set for 11/20/2019 is stricken and reset to 12/3/2019 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to the next status hearing, no appearance will be necessary. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#404) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The status hearing set for 10/9/2019 is stricken and reset to 11/20/2019 at 9:30 a.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to the next status hearing, no appearance will be necessary. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#403) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The parties report the case has settled. Motion for judgment #366 is denied as moot. The Court is unavailable on 9/25/2019. The status hearing set for that date is stricken and reset to 10/9/2019 at 9:00 a.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to the next status hearing, no appearance will be necessary. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#402) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The parties have not reported whether the case has settled. Per the court's last order (dkt. #401 ), the parties must submit a proposed judgment order by 5:00 p.m. today. Any party not consenting to a proposed judgment order must submit its own proposed judgment order. Each order should identify which parties agree to it. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#401) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The unopposed motion for extension of time #399 is granted. Status hearing set for 8/28/2019 is stricken and reset to 9/25/2019 at 9:30 a.m. If the case has not settled by 9/18/2019 the parties shall submit a proposed judgment order to the Court. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#400) NOTICE of Motion by Ashley L. Conaghan for presentment of extension of time #399 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 8/28/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Conaghan, Ashley) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
391 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. as to Illinois National Insurance Company on 11/3/2014, answer due 11/24/2014. (Mathias, John) (Entered: 11/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. as to ACE American Insurance Company, Inc. on 11/3/2014, answer due 11/24/2014. (Mathias, John) (Entered: 11/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. by Matthew Steven Riley (Riley, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ACE American Insurance Company, Inc., Illinois National Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, RLI Insurance Company (pg, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (nsf, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. (Mathias, John) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. by Christopher C. Dickinson (Dickinson, Christopher) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. by John H. Mathias, Jr (Mathias, John) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mathias, John) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10020859.(Mathias, John) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Cushman & Wakefield of Pennsylvania, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RLI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation is a litigant