This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2016 at 16:50:26 (UTC).

Cox v. HOVG, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Cox filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against HOVG, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Susan C Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:15-CV-01111

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Susan C Bucklew

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Cox

Defendant

HOVG, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa R. Wilcox

Attorney at Wilcox Law, PA

Suite 100, 721 1St Avenue N.

St Petersburg, FL 33701

William John Gadd

Attorney at W. John Gadd, Attorney at Law

Suite 250, 2727 Ulmerton Rd

Clearwater, FL 33762

Defendant Attorney

Sangeeta Spengler

Attorney at Golden Scaz Gagain, PLLC

201 N Armenia Ave

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa R. Wilcox on behalf of Ronald Cox (Wilcox, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by July 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/7/2015. (KTW) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ronald Cox. Related case(s): no (Gadd, William) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

#7

(#7) COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT CODE (RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED) CERTIFICATE of service by Ronald Cox . (Gadd, William) Modified on 6/2/2015 (BSN). (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 1 Complaint by HOVG, LLC. (Spengler, Sangeeta) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

#6

(#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Defendant shall file its response to the complaint by June 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/1/2015. (KTW) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HOVG, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number tpa 300030) filed by Ronald Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BSN) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS issued as to HOVG, LLC. (BSN) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Ronald Cox. (Gadd, William) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by HOVG, LLC. (Spengler, Sangeeta) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/29/2015)

#8

(#8) RETURN of service executed on 5-12-15 by Ronald Cox as to HOVG, LLC. (Gadd, William) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by HOVG, LLC. (Spengler, Sangeeta) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by HOVG, LLC. Related case(s): No (Spengler, Sangeeta) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ronald Cox. (Gadd, William) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa R. Wilcox on behalf of Ronald Cox (Wilcox, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by July 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/7/2015. (KTW) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 1 Complaint by HOVG, LLC. (Spengler, Sangeeta) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Ronald Cox. (Gadd, William) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by HOVG, LLC. Related case(s): No (Spengler, Sangeeta) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by HOVG, LLC. (Spengler, Sangeeta) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of service executed on 5-12-15 by Ronald Cox as to HOVG, LLC. (Gadd, William) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT CODE (RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED) CERTIFICATE of service by Ronald Cox . (Gadd, William) Modified on 6/2/2015 (BSN). (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Defendant shall file its response to the complaint by June 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/1/2015. (KTW) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by HOVG, LLC. (Spengler, Sangeeta) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ronald Cox. Related case(s): no (Gadd, William) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ronald Cox. (Gadd, William) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS issued as to HOVG, LLC. (BSN) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against HOVG, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number tpa 300030) filed by Ronald Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BSN) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.