This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 02:30:27 (UTC).

Cosper v. FanDuel, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2015 Cosper filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against FanDuel, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III and Judge Sarah S. Vance. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-06720

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III

Judge

Judge Sarah S. Vance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jon Cosper

Defendants

DraftKings, Inc.

FanDuel, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lanson Leon Bordelon

Attorney at Dugan Law Firm

One Canal Place, 365 Canal St., Suite 1000

New Orleans, LA 70130

David Baylis Franco

Attorney at Dugan Law Firm

One Canal Place, 365 Canal St., Suite 1000

New Orleans, LA 70130

James R. Dugan, II

Attorney at Dugan Law Firm

One Canal Place, 365 Canal St., Suite 1000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Seth Andrew Schmeeckle

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard (New Orleans)

60L Poydras St., Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Daniel Rault Martiny

Attorney at Martiny & Associates

131 Airline Hwy., Suite 201

Metairie, LA 70001

Joseph P. Lopinto, III

Attorney at Martiny & Associates

131 Airline Hwy., Suite 201

Metairie, LA 70001

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

#2

(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (jeg) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by FanDuel, Inc. . (Schmeeckle, Seth) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/11/16. (jjs) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

#4

(#4) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Dugan, James) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to DraftKings, Inc., FanDuel, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(clc) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#3

(#3) Rico Standing Order. by Clerk on 12/11/15.(jjs) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#7

(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Stay Pending JPML Determination by DraftKings, Inc., FanDuel, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, B, C, D and E, # 3 Proposed Order)Attorney Seth Andrew Schmeeckle added to party FanDuel, Inc.(pty:dft).(Schmeeckle, Seth) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to FanDuel, Inc. answer due 2/3/2016.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/12/16. (jjs) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

#8

(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by FanDuel, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FanDuel, Inc., Corporate Parent FanDuel Limited for FanDuel, Inc. (Schmeeckle, Seth) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

#9

(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by DraftKings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lopinto, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2016)

#11

(#11) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, by FanDuel, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schmeeckle, Seth) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to FanDuel, Inc. answer due 2/3/2016.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/12/16. (jjs) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, by FanDuel, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schmeeckle, Seth) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/11/16. (jjs) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by DraftKings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lopinto, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by FanDuel, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FanDuel, Inc., Corporate Parent FanDuel Limited for FanDuel, Inc. (Schmeeckle, Seth) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Stay Pending JPML Determination by DraftKings, Inc., FanDuel, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, B, C, D and E, # 3 Proposed Order)Attorney Seth Andrew Schmeeckle added to party FanDuel, Inc.(pty:dft).(Schmeeckle, Seth) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by FanDuel, Inc. . (Schmeeckle, Seth) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to DraftKings, Inc., FanDuel, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(clc) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Dugan, James) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rico Standing Order. by Clerk on 12/11/15.(jjs) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (jeg) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against DraftKings, Inc., FanDuel, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5146286) filed by Jon Cosper. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney James R. Dugan, II added to party Jon Cosper(pty:pla).(Dugan, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2015: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmm). (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.