This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 15:20:03 (UTC).

Corrica et al v. City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Corrica filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky and Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-03812

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky

Judge

Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Akeem Corrica

Reanna Chung

Kevon Mohamed

Debra Mohamed

Defendants

John and Jane Doe 1 through 10

City of New York

Police Officer James StLouis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Marinelli

299 Broadway, Ste. 1501

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorneys

David Allen Cooper

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church St

New York, NY 10007

David De La Garza Bassett

Attorney at NYC Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to City of New York, James StLouis. (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#9

(#9) MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Status Conference held pm 3/3/15 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: The next conference will be held by telephone on May 22, 2015 at 12:30 p.m., to be initiated by counsel for the plaintiff (Chambers: 718-613-2400). See annexed conference calendar for detailed scheduling and rulings. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by City of New York, James StLouis. (Bassett, David) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David Allen Cooper on behalf of City of New York, James StLouis (aty to be noticed) (Cooper, David) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/21/14 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: A status conference will be held by telephone on February 20, 2015 at 2:15 p.m., to be initiated by counsel for the plaintiff (Chambers: 718-613-2400). Scheduling order entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against City of New York, John and Jane Doe 1 through 10, James StLouis filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7006654 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Akeem Corrica, Reanna Chung, Kevon Mohamed, Debra Mohamed. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for City, # 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for StLouis) (Marinelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by City of New York, James StLouis. (Bassett, David) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#10

(#10) Letter requesting, with the consent of plaintiff's counsel, that the Court schedule a settlement conference by City of New York, James StLouis (Cooper, David) Modified on 4/20/2015 (Toritto, Jim). (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Bassett, David) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter requesting, with the consent of plaintiff's counsel, that the Court schedule a settlement conference by City of New York, James StLouis (Cooper, David) Modified on 4/20/2015 (Toritto, Jim). (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Status Conference held pm 3/3/15 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: The next conference will be held by telephone on May 22, 2015 at 12:30 p.m., to be initiated by counsel for the plaintiff (Chambers: 718-613-2400). See annexed conference calendar for detailed scheduling and rulings. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David Allen Cooper on behalf of City of New York, James StLouis (aty to be noticed) (Cooper, David) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/21/14 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: A status conference will be held by telephone on February 20, 2015 at 2:15 p.m., to be initiated by counsel for the plaintiff (Chambers: 718-613-2400). Scheduling order entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by City of New York, James StLouis. (Bassett, David) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by City of New York, James StLouis. (Bassett, David) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Bassett, David) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to City of New York, James StLouis. (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against City of New York, John and Jane Doe 1 through 10, James StLouis filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7006654 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Akeem Corrica, Reanna Chung, Kevon Mohamed, Debra Mohamed. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for City, # 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for StLouis) (Marinelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.