This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:53:53 (UTC).

Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2014 Core Wireless Licensing S a r l filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LG Electronics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00912

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.

Defendants

LG Electronics, Inc.

LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Henry Charles Bunsow

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory, Smith & Allison LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brian A E Smith

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory, Smith & Allison LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Cliff Win, Jr.

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory, Smith & Allison LLP-Redwood

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Craig Y Allison

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory, Smith & Allison LLP-Redwood

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Denise M DeMory

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory, Smith & Allison LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Dino Hadzibegovic

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory, Smith & Allison LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Matthew Franklin Greinert

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory, Smith & Allison LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Robin K. Curtis

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory, Smith & Allison LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Ziyong Li

Attorney at Bunsow, De Mory, Smith & Allison LLP-Redwood

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Defendant Attorneys

Herbert H Finn

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

James Mark Mann

Attorney at Mann Tindel & Thompson

300 W. Main

Henderson, TX 75652

Kevin Sean Kudlac

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - Austin

300 West 6Th Street, Ste 2050

Austin, TX 78701

Nicholas A Brown

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

4 Embarcadero Center, Ste 3000

San Francisco, CA 94111-5983

Richard D Harris

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Declaratory Relief, and Patent Infringement against LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4855990.), filed by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - '634 Patent, # 2 Exhibit 2 - '321 Patent, # 3 Exhibit 3 - '151 Patent, # 4 Exhibit 4 - '536 Patent, # 5 Exhibit 5 - '143 Patent, # 6 Exhibit 6 - '022 Patent, # 7 Exhibit 7 - '271 Patent, # 8 Exhibit 8 - '664 Patent, # 9 Exhibit 9 - '818 Patent, # 10 Exhibit 10 -'850 Patent, # 11 Exhibit 11 - '049 Patent, # 12 Exhibit 12 - RE44828, # 13 Exhibit 13 - '398 Patent, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Policy, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Guide, # 16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. identifying Corporate Parent Conversant Intellectual Property Management, Inc. for Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/26/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Charles Bunsow on behalf of Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. (Bunsow, Henry) (Entered: 10/13/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. served on 9/26/2014, answer due 10/17/2014; LG Electronics, Inc. served on 9/26/2014, answer due 10/17/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Y Allison on behalf of Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. (Allison, Craig) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/03/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

#13

(#13) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:14-cv-911. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

#14

(#14) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Franklin Greinert on behalf of Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. (Greinert, Matthew) Modified on 1/5/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 01/05/2015)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert H Finn on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Finn, Herbert) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

#16

(#16) FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Mann, James) Modified on 6/17/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 06/17/2015)

#17

(#17) ORDER - Attorney Matthew Franklin Greinert terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/20/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#18

(#18) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE LG Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint by LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc..(Finn, Herbert) Modified on 10/14/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#19

(#19) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunsow, Henry) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Claim for Declaratory Judgment of FRAND Royalty Rate Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/23/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Claim for Declaratory Judgment of FRAND Royalty Rate Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/23/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunsow, Henry) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE LG Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint by LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc..(Finn, Herbert) Modified on 10/14/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER - Attorney Matthew Franklin Greinert terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/20/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Mann, James) Modified on 6/17/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert H Finn on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Finn, Herbert) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Franklin Greinert on behalf of Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. (Greinert, Matthew) Modified on 1/5/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:14-cv-911. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/03/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Allison, Craig) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc..( Harris, Richard) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Y Allison on behalf of Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. (Allison, Craig) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. served on 9/26/2014, answer due 10/17/2014; LG Electronics, Inc. served on 9/26/2014, answer due 10/17/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Charles Bunsow on behalf of Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. (Bunsow, Henry) (Entered: 10/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/26/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l. identifying Corporate Parent Conversant Intellectual Property Management, Inc. for Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Declaratory Relief, and Patent Infringement against LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4855990.), filed by Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - '634 Patent, # 2 Exhibit 2 - '321 Patent, # 3 Exhibit 3 - '151 Patent, # 4 Exhibit 4 - '536 Patent, # 5 Exhibit 5 - '143 Patent, # 6 Exhibit 6 - '022 Patent, # 7 Exhibit 7 - '271 Patent, # 8 Exhibit 8 - '664 Patent, # 9 Exhibit 9 - '818 Patent, # 10 Exhibit 10 -'850 Patent, # 11 Exhibit 11 - '049 Patent, # 12 Exhibit 12 - RE44828, # 13 Exhibit 13 - '398 Patent, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Policy, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Guide, # 16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dino Hadzibegovic

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cliff Win, Jr.