This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2016 at 09:36:06 (UTC).

COOK v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2014 COOK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-02338

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARLEEN COOK

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

3Rd Party Defendant

THE STANLEY WORKS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER J. SCUDERI

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF PETER J. SCUDERI

2000 Market St Suite 2925

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

KENNETH M. DUBROW

Attorney at THE CHARTWELL LAW OFFICES LLP

1735 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JAMES JOHN WALSH

Attorney at THE CHARTWELL LAW OFFICES LLP

1735 Market St 29Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY D. REMICK

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH M. DUBROW on behalf of HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(DUBROW, KENNETH) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES JOHN WALSH on behalf of HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(WALSH, JAMES) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DARLEEN COOK. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. waiver sent on 4/25/2014, answer due 6/24/2014. (SCUDERI, PETER) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCUMENTS OF DEFENDANT by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (DUBROW, KENNETH) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 5/19/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/16/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER that THE PARTIES' REQUEST FOR THE COURT'S APPROVAL OF THEIR STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DEFENDANT'S DOCUMENTS (ECF NO. 5) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/21/2014. 5/21/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Memorandum, # 4 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, JAMES) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..(WALSH, JAMES) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY TO HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 6/10/2014. 6/10/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF 14 DAYS AFTER THE RESPONSE DATE TO ANSWER DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/10/2014. 6/12/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 06/12/2014)

#11

(#11) MEMORANUDM of Law in Response re 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DARLEEN COOK. Certificate of Service. (SCUDERI, PETER) Modified on 6/24/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 06/23/2014)

#12

(#12) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against THE STANLEY WORKS, INC., filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Certificate of Service)(amas) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. THE STANLEY WORKS, INC. waiver sent on 8/27/2014, answer due 10/27/2014. (DUBROW, KENNETH) (Entered: 08/27/2014)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY D. REMICK on behalf of THE STANLEY WORKS, INC. with Jury Demand(REMICK, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

#15

(#15) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. by THE STANLEY WORKS, INC..(REMICK, BRADLEY) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#16

(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT against HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., filed by DARLEEN COOK. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (amas) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#17

(#17) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IS HEREBY MOOT BY PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF HER AMENDED COMPLAINT ON 9/4/204. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/9/2014.9/10/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jmg, ) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to 12 Third Party Complaint by THE STANLEY WORKS, INC..(REMICK, BRADLEY) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Change of Address by KENNETH M. DUBROW(DUBROW, KENNETH) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Change of Address by KENNETH M. DUBROW(DUBROW, KENNETH) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to 12 Third Party Complaint by THE STANLEY WORKS, INC..(REMICK, BRADLEY) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IS HEREBY MOOT BY PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF HER AMENDED COMPLAINT ON 9/4/204. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/9/2014.9/10/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jmg, ) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT against HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., filed by DARLEEN COOK. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (amas) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. by THE STANLEY WORKS, INC..(REMICK, BRADLEY) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY D. REMICK on behalf of THE STANLEY WORKS, INC. with Jury Demand(REMICK, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. THE STANLEY WORKS, INC. waiver sent on 8/27/2014, answer due 10/27/2014. (DUBROW, KENNETH) (Entered: 08/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against THE STANLEY WORKS, INC., filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Certificate of Service)(amas) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANUDM of Law in Response re 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DARLEEN COOK. Certificate of Service. (SCUDERI, PETER) Modified on 6/24/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 06/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF 14 DAYS AFTER THE RESPONSE DATE TO ANSWER DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/10/2014. 6/12/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 06/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY TO HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 6/10/2014. 6/10/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..(WALSH, JAMES) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Memorandum, # 4 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, JAMES) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that THE PARTIES' REQUEST FOR THE COURT'S APPROVAL OF THEIR STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DEFENDANT'S DOCUMENTS (ECF NO. 5) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/21/2014. 5/21/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCUMENTS OF DEFENDANT by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (DUBROW, KENNETH) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 5/19/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DARLEEN COOK. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. waiver sent on 4/25/2014, answer due 6/24/2014. (SCUDERI, PETER) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES JOHN WALSH on behalf of HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(WALSH, JAMES) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH M. DUBROW on behalf of HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(DUBROW, KENNETH) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE099935), filed by DARLEEN COOK.(jmv, ) (Entered: 04/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC. A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY D. REMICK(Designation Retained)