This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:46:01 (UTC).

Convergent Media Solutions LLC v. AT&T Inc

Case Summary

On 06/26/2015 Convergent Media Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-02156

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Defendant

AT&T Inc

Counter Defendant

Convergent Media Solutions LLC

Counter Claimant

AT&T Services Inc

Consolidated Defendants

Roku Inc

Netflix Inc

Hulu LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Bryant C Boren

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1001 Page Mill Road, Building One, Suite 200

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Brian Douglas Johnston

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

2001 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

Johnson Kuncheria

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

2001 Ross Ave, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

Kurt M Pankratz

Attorney at Baker Botts - Dallas

2001 Ross Ave, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

Roger J Fulghum

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana St Suite 3000

Houston, TX 77002

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brent N Bumgardner

Anthony M Vecchione

John Paul Murphy

Ryan Paul Griffin

Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Kelly D Hine

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 N. Akard Street, Suite 3300

Dallas, TX 75201

Bobbie J. Wilson

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

505 Howard Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Matthew Cook Bernstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11988 El Camino Real, Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92130

Miguel Jose Bombach

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11988 El Camino Real, Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92130-2594

Patrick John McKeever

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11988 El Camino Real, Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92130

Stevan R Stark

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 Third Ave, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Convergent Media Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Strategic Intellectual Solutions LLC for Convergent Media Solutions LLC. (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Godbey. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#4

(#4) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (bdb) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc. (bdb) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Case Notice of Related Cases filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#7

(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for AT&T, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AT&T Inc ; served on 9/10/2015. (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

#9

(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer AT&T Inc answer due 11/5/2015. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/2/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

#28

(#28) RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC re: 23 (Consolidated response to motions filed in related cases. See footnote 1.) Order (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Bumgardner, Brent) Modified docket text on 12/30/2015 (ali). (Entered: 12/04/2015)

#29

(#29) Appendix in Support filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC re 28 Response/Objection Appendix in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 to 1-C, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1-D to 1-F, # 3 Exhibit(s) 1-G to 1-M) (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

#30

(#30) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7237824) filed by Hulu LLC, Netflix Inc, Roku Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wilson, Bobbie) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

#31

(#31) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 28 Response/Objection filed by Hulu LLC, Netflix Inc, Roku Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bombach, Miguel) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting 31 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 12/28/2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/9/2015) (mem) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

#33

(#33) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bobbie J. Wilson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/9/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

#34

(#34) ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC. Related document: 26 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Bumgardner, Brent) Modified on 12/22/2015 to enhance text (dss). (Entered: 12/21/2015)

#35

(#35) REPLY filed by Hulu LLC, Netflix Inc, Roku Inc re: 28 RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC. (Bombach, Miguel) Modified docket text on 12/30/2015 (ali). (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Vacation filed by Hulu LLC, Netflix Inc, Roku Inc (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Vacation filed by Hulu LLC, Netflix Inc, Roku Inc (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) REPLY filed by Hulu LLC, Netflix Inc, Roku Inc re: 28 RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC. (Bombach, Miguel) Modified docket text on 12/30/2015 (ali). (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC. Related document: 26 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Bumgardner, Brent) Modified on 12/22/2015 to enhance text (dss). (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bobbie J. Wilson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/9/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER granting 31 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 12/28/2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/9/2015) (mem) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 28 Response/Objection filed by Hulu LLC, Netflix Inc, Roku Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bombach, Miguel) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7237824) filed by Hulu LLC, Netflix Inc, Roku Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wilson, Bobbie) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Appendix in Support filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC re 28 Response/Objection Appendix in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 to 1-C, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1-D to 1-F, # 3 Exhibit(s) 1-G to 1-M) (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC re: 23 (Consolidated response to motions filed in related cases. See footnote 1.) Order (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Bumgardner, Brent) Modified docket text on 12/30/2015 (ali). (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AT&T Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate AT&T Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate AT&T Teleholdings, Inc. for AT&T Services Inc. (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryant C Boren on behalf of AT&T Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Boren, Bryant) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer AT&T Inc answer due 11/5/2015. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/2/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AT&T Inc ; served on 9/10/2015. (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 09/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for AT&T, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Related Case Notice of Related Cases filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc. (bdb) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (bdb) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Godbey. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Convergent Media Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Strategic Intellectual Solutions LLC for Convergent Media Solutions LLC. (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AT&T, Inc. filed by Convergent Media Solutions LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-6894296) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1, # 3 Exhibit(s) A to Ex. 1, # 4 Exhibit(s) B-1 to Ex. 1, # 5 Exhibit(s) B-2 to Ex. 1, # 6 Exhibit(s) C-1 to Ex. 1, # 7 Exhibit(s) C-2 to Ex. 1, # 8 Exhibit(s) D-1 to Ex. 1, # 9 Exhibit(s) D-2 to Ex. 1) (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roku, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NETFLIX INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hulu, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Services Inc is a litigant