This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 15:49:23 (UTC).

Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Gordon et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2012 Consumer Financial Protection Bureau filed an Other lawsuit against Gordon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:12-CV-06147

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Ronald S.W. Lew

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Consumer Financial Protection Bureau

Petitioners

Kifle Deborah

Maria Estrada

Los Angeles, CA 90011

Defendants

Chance Edward Gordon

Abraham Michael Pessar

Division One Investment and Loan Inc

Processing Division LLC

Gordon Law Firm PC

Not Classified By Court

San San Wei

San Leandro, CA 94579

Thein Myint

San Leandro, CA 94579

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

Leonard L Gumport

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2627

Receiver

Robb Evans and Associates LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Leon Berwick

Attorney at US Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Bradley H Cohen

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P O Box 883

Washington, DC 20044

Ethan Davis

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Tamra Tyree Moore

Attorney at US Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Carmen L Christopher

Attorney at Consumer Financial Protection Bureau

1700 G Street Nw

Washington, DC 20552

Crystal Renee Sumner

Attorney at Consumer Federal Financial Protection

1700 G Street Nw

Washington, DC 20552

James A Meade

Attorney at Consumer Financial Protection Bureau

1700 G Street Nw

Washington, DC 20552

Kent A Kawakami

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 N Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Laura Schneider

Attorney at Consumer Financial Protection Bureau

1700 G Street N W

Washington, DC 20552

Petitioner Attorney

Ryan Andrew Ellis

Attorney at Ellis and Abouelsood

30 Corporate Park Suite 314

Irvine, CA 92606

Defendant Attorney

Gary Kurtz

Attorney at Gary Kurtz Law Offices

20335 Ventura Blvd Suite 200

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider Attorney

Leonard L Gumport

Attorney at Gumport Mastan

550 S Hope Street Suite 825

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2627

Receiver Attorneys

Gary O Caris

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

Lesley Anne Fleetwood Hawes

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#189

#190

#191

#192

#193

#194

#195

#196

#197

185 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#197) ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 189 filed by Chance Edward Gordon, CCA # 13-56484. The appellant's motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending the United States Supreme Court's decision in Noel Canning v. National Labor Relations Board, 705 F.3d 490 (D.C. Cir. 2013), cert. granted, 133 S. Ct. 2861 (2013) is granted in part. This appeal is stayed until August 22, 2014. At or prior to the expiration of the stay, the appellant shall file the opening brief or a status report and motion for appropriate relief. If the opening brief is filed, the answering brief shall be due September 22, 2014. The optional reply brief is due 14 daysafter service of the answering brief.The filing of the opening brief or the failure to file a further motion willterminate the stay. Order received in this district on 6/18/2014. (dmap) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#196) ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 189 filed by Chance Edward Gordon CCA # 13-56484. Appellant's motion to stay appellate proceedings pending the United States Supreme Court's decision in Noel Canning v. National Labor Relations Board, 705 F.3d 490 (D.C. Cir. 2013), cert granted, 133 S. Ct. 2861 (2013), is granted. This case is stayed until June 17, 2014. On or before the expiration of the stay, appellant shall file the opening brief or file a status report and an appropriate motion. If appellant files the opening brief, the answering brief will be due July 17, 2014 and the optional reply brief will be due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. Order received in this district on 3/27/2014. (dmap) (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#195) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradley H Cohen counsel for Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. Ethan P. Davis is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Cohen, Bradley) (Entered: 11/04/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#194) NOTICE of Registry Deposit filed by Temporary Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary) (Entered: 11/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#193) ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and against Chance Edward Gordon, Gordon Law Firm PC jointly and severally in the principal amount of $ $11,403,338.63, interest in the amount of $.00, attorneys fees of $.00, costs of $.00. RE: Judgment 188 (lc) (Entered: 09/09/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#192) Mediation Questionnaire filed by Defendant Chance Edward Gordon (Darden, Christopher) (Entered: 09/08/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#191) ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and against Chance Edward Gordon, Gordon Law Firm PC in the principal amount of $11,403,338.63, interest in the amount of $.00, attorneys fees of $.00, costs of $.00. RE: Judgment 188 (lc) (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#190) NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 13-56484, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 189 as to Defendant Chance Edward Gordon. (car) (Entered: 08/26/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#189) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendant Chance Edward Gordon. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,, 180 , Judgment, Permanent Injunction,,,,,, 188 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-12599632 paid.) (Darden, Christopher) (Entered: 08/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#188) FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Percy Anderson: It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendants Chance Gordon and The Gordon Law Firm, P.C. (collectively, the "Gordon Defendants") whether acting directly or through any other person, are permanently restrained, enjoined, and prohibited from directly or indirectly engaging in any conduct in violation of the Consumer Financial Protection Act, 12 U.S.C. Sections 5531(a), 5536(a), 5564, & 5565, and the Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Rule, 12 C.F.R. Section 1015, etc. A judgment for equitable monetary relief is hereby entered in favor of the plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and against the Gordon Defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $11,403,338.63, with post-judgment interest at the legal rate. See document for details. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated) (gk) (Entered: 07/26/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
177 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: Granting 6 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application Exceed Page limit on Memorandum and Authorities in support of Plaintiffs Ex parte application for a temporary Order with an asset freeze and other equitable relief and Order Show Cause. (et) (Entered: 07/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DECLARATION of LAURA SCHNEIDER pursuant to FRCP 65(b) in Support of PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION for a Temporary Restraining Order, Order for with an asset freeze and other equitable relief and for Order to Show Cause re: why Preliminary Injunction should not issued 4 and EX PARTE APPLICATION to Temporarily Seal Entire File and Docket 2 , filed by Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (et) (Entered: 07/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PLAINTIFFS RECOMMENDATION FOR TEMPORARY RECEIVER filed by Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (et) (Entered: 07/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limit on Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order with an asset freeze and other equitable relief and Order to Show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issued and incorporated memorandum filed by Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. Lodged Proposed Order.(et) (Entered: 07/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM in Support of PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION for a Temporary Restraining Order, Order for with an asset freeze and other equitable relief and for Order to Show Cause re: why Preliminary Injunction should not issued filed by Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protectio n Bureau 4 filed by Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (et) (Entered: 07/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION for a Temporary Restraining Order, Order for with an asset freeze and other equitable relief and for Order to Show Cause re: why Preliminary Injunction should not issued filed by Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. Lodged Proposed Order.(et) (Entered: 07/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: Granting 2 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application temporarily Seal Entire File and Docket. (et) (Entered: 07/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Temporarily Seal Entire File and Docket and Memorandum in support therof filed by Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau.(et) (Entered: 07/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants Division One Investment and Loan Inc, Chance Edward Gordon, Gordon Law Firm PC, Abraham Michael Pessar, Processing Division LLC. Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner.(Filing fee $ 350: NO FEE REQUIRED.), filed by Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Attachments: # 1 Summons). (et) (Entered: 07/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gordon Law Firm PC is a litigant

Latest cases where Robb Evans & Associates LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Consumer Financial Protection Bureau is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tamra Tyree Moore