This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2016 at 05:17:23 (UTC).

Commonwealth of Virginia ex rel. Integra Rec LLC v. Countrywide Securities Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2014 Commonwealth of Virginia ex rel Integra Rec LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Countrywide Securities Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge David J. Novak (Settlement) and District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00706

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge David J. Novak (Settlement)

Judge

District Judge M. Hannah Lauck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commonwealth of Virginia ex rel. Integra Rec LLC

Defendants

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

HSBC Securities (USA), Inc.

Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.

Wamu Capital Corp.

Goldman Sachs & Co.

UBS Securities LLC

Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated

Credit Suisse (USA) LLC

Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.

RBS Securities Inc.

Barclays Capital, Inc.

Countrywide Securities Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christy Elizabeth Harris-Lipford

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

900 E Main St

Richmond, VA 23219

Mark Rankin Herring

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General (Richmond)

900 E Main St

Richmond, VA 23219

Rhodes Beahm Ritenour

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General (Richmond)

900 E Main St

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorneys

Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr.

Attorney at DurretteCrump PLC

1111 East Main Street, 16Th Floor

Richmond, VA 23219

John Eliot Beerbower

Attorney at Hunton & Williams LLP (Richmond)

951 E Byrd St, Riverfront Plaza - East Tower

Richmond, VA 23219

Ashley Lionel Taylor, Jr.

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

1001 Haxall Point, Po Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23219

Dean Joel Kitchens

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP (CA-NA)

333 South Grand Avenue, 46Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Geoffrey Manson Sigler

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP (DC)

1050 Connecticut Ave Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Brian Emory Pumphrey

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

901 E Cary St

Richmond, VA 23219-4030

Lauren Ann Moskowitz

Attorney at Cravath Swaine & Moore LLP

825 Eighth Ave

New York, NY 10019

Michael Timothy Reynolds

Attorney at Cravath Swaine & Moore LLP

825 Eighth Ave

New York, NY 10019

Richard Wayland Clary

Attorney at Cravath Swaine & Moore LLP

825 Eighth Ave

New York, NY 10019

Matthew Paul Bosher

Attorney at Hunton & Williams LLP (Richmond)

951 E Byrd St, Riverfront Plaza - East Tower

Richmond, VA 23219

Edward Joseph Fuhr

Attorney at Hunton & Williams LLP

951 E Byrd St, Riverfront Plaza

Richmond, VA 23219

David Ian Horowitz

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (CA/NA)

333 South Hope St, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert Alexander Pilmer

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (CA/NA)

333 South Hope St, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brendan David O'Toole

Attorney at Williams Mullen (Richmond)

200 South 10Th Street, 16Th Floor, Po Box 1320

Richmond, VA 23218

Bryan Alan Fratkin

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

901 E Cary St

Richmond, VA 23219-4030

Alexis Laraine Shapiro

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP (MA-NA)

53 State St

Boston, MA 02109

Jason Lee Krajcer

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP (DC-NA)

901 New York Ave Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#62

#63

#64

#65

#66

#67

#68

#69

#70

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) RESPONSE in Support re 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Expedited Hearing filed by Commonwealth of Virginia ex rel. Integra Rec LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Ritenour, Rhodes) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE of Appearance by Trent James Benishek on behalf of UBS Securities LLC (Benishek, Trent) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE by Credit Suisse (USA) LLC re 59 Opposition (Byrum, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE by Credit Suisse (USA) LLC re 17 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer of Venue or, Alternatively, Centralization by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Byrum, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE by Credit Suisse (USA) LLC re 15 MOTION to Change Venue to the Central District of California Where a Substantively Identical Multidistrict Litigation Proceeding is Pending (Byrum, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE by UBS Securities LLC re 59 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Sigler, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Declaration re 59 Opposition to Motion to Remand by Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Pumphrey, Brian) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Declaration re 59 Opposition to Motion to Remand by Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Pumphrey, Brian) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Declaration re 59 Opposition to Motion to Remand by Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Pumphrey, Brian) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE by RBS Securities Inc. re 59 Opposition (James, Charles) (Entered: 11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Dean J. Kitchens and Certification of Local Counsel Geoffrey M. Sigler Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4163617. by UBS Securities LLC. (Sigler, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by UBS Securities LLC. (Sigler, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Goldman Sachs & Co.. (Piepgrass, Stephen) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension for extension of time to respond and for entry of joint briefing order by Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pumphrey, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Credit Suisse (USA) LLC. (Byrum, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter mailed to counsel of record for RBS Securities, Inc. to notify they have not been admitted to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Copy of Local Rule 83.1 also attached. (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 83.1)(jsmi, ) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Countrywide Securities Corp. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO ALL ADVERSE PARTIES by Countrywide Securities Corp. (jsmi, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2014: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal) (jsmi, ). (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL PART 2: ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS by Countrywide Securities Corp. re 1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15, # 5 Exhibit 16 - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 16 - Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 17, # 8 Exhibit 18, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Letter, # 11 Receipt)(jsmi, ) Modified on 10/17/2014 (jsmi, ). (Attachment 8 replaced on 10/17/2014) (jsmi, ). (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL PART 1: from City of Richmond Circuit Court, case number CL14-399 (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 34683026935), filed by Countrywide Securities Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(jsmi, ) Modified on 10/17/2014 (jsmi, ). (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA THE is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Securities Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where WASHINGTON MUTUAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBS Securities LLC is a litigant