This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2017 at 10:58:11 (UTC).

Commonwealth Laboratories v. QuinTron Instrument Company

Case Summary

On 09/10/2015 Commonwealth Laboratories filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against QuinTron Instrument Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-2010

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commonwealth Laboratories

Defendant

QuinTron Instrument Company

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/09/2015. [271142]Entry of Appearance due 09/24/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/24/2015. Docketing Statement due 09/24/2015. Appellant's brief is due 11/09/2015.

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Daniel R. Johnson as principal counsel for Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2015 by US mail. [273887]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Joseph A. Kromholz as of counsel for Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2015 by US mail. [273888]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2015 by US mail. [273889]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2015 by US mail. [273890]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2015 by US mail. [273891]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Lawrence D. Goodman as of counsel for Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/23/2015 by US mail. [274569]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/23/2015 by US mail. [274570]

#9

(#9) Entry of appearance for Erin M. Choi (Tanner) as of counsel for Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275407]

#15

(#15) Entry of appearance for Lee Ellen Stapleton as principal counsel for Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 10/29/2015 by email. [284614]

#16

(#16) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 10/30/2015 by email. [284972]

#17

(#17) Entry of appearance for Jodi Ann Pandolfi as of counsel for Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 11/03/2015 by email. [285805]

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc., Brief for Defendant-Appellant [19], [18], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Brief due 11/20/2015. Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc. brief is due 12/21/2015. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [287009]

#21

(#21) TENDERED from Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Title: CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF. Service: 11/09/2015 by email, US mail. [287287]

#24

(#24) CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc. [21]. Number of Pages: 55. Service: 11/09/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 11/16/2015. Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc. brief is due 12/21/2015. [287309]

#26

(#26) TENDERED from Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 12/21/2015 by email. [297864]

#27

(#27) BRIEF FILED for Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc. [26]. Number of Pages: 28. Service: 12/21/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 12/28/2015. Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc. reply brief is due 01/07/2016. [298149]

#0130683729

(#0130683729) TENDERED from Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 11/06/2015 by email, US mail. [286928]. This brief has been rejected. See Doc No.[20]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130683729) TENDERED from Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 11/06/2015 by email, US mail. [286928]. This brief has been rejected. See Doc No.[20]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) BRIEF FILED for Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc. [26]. Number of Pages: 28. Service: 12/21/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 12/28/2015. Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc. reply brief is due 01/07/2016. [298149]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) TENDERED from Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 12/21/2015 by email. [297864]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc. [21]. Number of Pages: 55. Service: 11/09/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 11/16/2015. Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc. brief is due 12/21/2015. [287309]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) TENDERED from Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Title: CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF. Service: 11/09/2015 by email, US mail. [287287]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc., Brief for Defendant-Appellant [19], [18], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Brief due 11/20/2015. Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc. brief is due 12/21/2015. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [287009]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Entry of appearance for Jodi Ann Pandolfi as of counsel for Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 11/03/2015 by email. [285805]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 10/30/2015 by email. [284972]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Entry of appearance for Lee Ellen Stapleton as principal counsel for Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 10/29/2015 by email. [284614]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 10/26/2015 by email, US mail. [283493]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275411]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of appearance for Erin M. Choi (Tanner) as of counsel for Appellee Commonwealth Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 09/25/2015 by email. [275407]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/23/2015 by US mail. [274570]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Lawrence D. Goodman as of counsel for Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/23/2015 by US mail. [274569]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2015 by US mail. [273891]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2015 by US mail. [273890]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2015 by US mail. [273889]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Joseph A. Kromholz as of counsel for Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2015 by US mail. [273888]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Daniel R. Johnson as principal counsel for Appellant QuinTron Instrument Company, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2015 by US mail. [273887]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/09/2015. [271142]Entry of Appearance due 09/24/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/24/2015. Docketing Statement due 09/24/2015. Appellant's brief is due 11/09/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.