This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2016 at 15:22:50 (UTC).

Collins v. DIRECTV, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2014 Collins filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against DIRECTV, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson and Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-00635

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson

Judge

Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Collins

Defendants

DIRECTV, Inc.

DIRECTV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradford B Lear

Attorney at Lear Werts LLP

2003 W Broadway Ste 107

Columbia, MO 65203

George Allan Hanson

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

460 Nichols Rd Ste 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Ryan D O'Dell

Attorney at Steuve Siegel Hanson LLP

550 West C St Ste 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

Timothy Steven Gilpin

Attorney at Gilpin Law Office

1874 S Boulder

Tulsa, OK 74119

Todd C Werts

Attorney at Lear Werts LLP

2003 W Broadway Ste 107

Columbia, MO 65203

Defendant Attorneys

Patricia Jean Martin

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC (St. Louis)

211 N Broadway Ste 1500

St. Louis, MO 63102

Rachel B Crawford

Attorney at Newton O'Connor Turner & Ketchum PC

15 W 6Th St Ste 2700

Tulsa, OK 74119-5423

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

16 #1

Exhibit 1-Acfalle Order

#16

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC (With attachments) (Crawford, Rachel) (Entered: 12/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DIRECTV, Inc. (Crawford, Rachel) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent DIRECTV Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The DIRECTV Group, Inc., Corporate Parent DIRECTV for DIRECTV, LLC) by DIRECTV, LLC (Crawford, Rachel) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (hbo, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to DIRECTV, LLC Returned Executed (Re: 2 Complaint ) by Samuel Collins (Hanson, George) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (hbo, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (hbo, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing DIRECTV, Inc.,and DIRECTV, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Patricia J. Martin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1392586) by DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC (With attachments) (Crawford, Rachel) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Judge James H Payne. Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 14-CV-635-GKF-TLW (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel B Crawford on behalf of DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC (Crawford, Rachel) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Attorney(s) George A. Hanson and Ryan D. O'Dell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1384229) by Samuel Collins (With attachments) (Gilpin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Attorney(s) Todd C. Werts and Bradford B. Lear to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1380339) by Samuel Collins (With attachments) (Gilpin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing George Allan Hanson, Ryan D O'Dell and Bradford B. Lear to file by November 12, 2014 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lal, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Samuel Collins (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1374985) by Samuel Collins (Gilpin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Samuel Collins (Gilpin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Steven Gilpin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford B. Lear(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan D O'Dell