This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:57:38 (UTC).

Cobbler Nevada, LLC v. Doe 1 et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2015 Cobbler Nevada, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01408

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Thomas S. Zilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cobbler Nevada LLC

Defendants

Doe 1

Sandra L. Groves

Doe 5

Doe 4

Doe 9

Emily Crowe-Goldberg

Doe 8

Eric Furgeson

Doe 3

Doe 2

Doe 7

Doe 6

Kamaljit Lidder

Doe 10

Daniel Rueda

Cassandra Wallace

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Allen Lowe

Attorney at LOWE GRAHAM JONES

701 5Th Ave, Ste 4800

Seattle, WA 98104-7009

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against ALL defendant(s) with JURY DEMAND. (Receipt # 0981-4147664) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party Cobbler Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Lowe, David) Modified on 9/3/2015 edit filer info. (RE) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 15-1404, 1406, by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC for Cobbler Nevada, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cobbler Nevada, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/2/2015, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of Daniel Macek filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#7

(#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Copyright Report sent via US Postal Service to US Copyright Office). (RE) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

#8

(#8) EXHIBIT A-B re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SSM) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#17

(#17) PRAECIPE re 15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s) by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

#18

(#18) MOTION for Leave by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Cases, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/15/2016, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

#19

(#19) DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC re 18 MOTION for Leave (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 4, filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 9 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 10 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

#23

(#23) MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Leave to extend time for service and to conduct early discovery, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (AD) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#24

(#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 5 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#25

(#25) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Kamaljit Lidder, Cassandra Wallace, Daniel Rueda, Emily Crowe-Goldberg, Sandra L. Groves, Eric Furgeson with JURY DEMAND, filed by Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Kamaljit Lidder, Cassandra Wallace, Daniel Rueda, Emily Crowe-Goldberg, Sandra L. Groves, Eric Furgeson with JURY DEMAND, filed by Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 5 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Leave to extend time for service and to conduct early discovery, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (AD) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 10 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 9 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 4, filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC re 18 MOTION for Leave (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Leave by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Cases, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/15/2016, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PRAECIPE re 15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s) by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PRAECIPE re 14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s) of Dismissal of Doe 3 by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings. Judge Ricardo S Martinez no longer assigned to case by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SSM) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXHIBIT A-B re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Copyright Report sent via US Postal Service to US Copyright Office). (RE) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Daniel Macek filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/2/2015, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC for Cobbler Nevada, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cobbler Nevada, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 15-1404, 1406, by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against ALL defendant(s) with JURY DEMAND. (Receipt # 0981-4147664) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party Cobbler Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Lowe, David) Modified on 9/3/2015 edit filer info. (RE) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less