This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:16:03 (UTC).

Cobbler Nevada, LLC v. Doe 1 et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2015 Cobbler Nevada, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01614

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Thomas S. Zilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cobbler Nevada, LLC

Cobbler Nevada LLC

Defendants

Doe 14

Doe 1

Doe 13

Doe 5

Doe 4

Doe 9

Doe 8

Doe 12

Doe 17

Doe 16

Doe 3

Doe 2

Doe 7

Doe 11

Doe 6

Doe 10

Doe 15

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Allen Lowe

Attorney at LOWE GRAHAM JONES

701 5Th Ave, Ste 4800

Seattle, WA 98104-7009

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin R Justus

Attorney at LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

7900 Se 28Th St. Fl. 5

Mercer Is, WA 98040-6005

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-4189533) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party Cobbler Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 15-1404, 1406, 1408, 1420, 1421, 1430, 1431, 1432, 1435, 1443, by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC for Cobbler Nevada, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cobbler Nevada, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/9/2015, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#7

(#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Report sent via US Postal to Copyright Office). (RE) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting pltf's 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 17 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant Doe 17. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 6, filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 11 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 9 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/29/2015)

16 #1

Supplement Cases

#16

No Description Available

17 #1

Exhibit A-E

#17

No Description Available

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC re 16 MOTION for Leave (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Cases, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/15/2016, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 9 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 14 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 11 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 6, filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant Doe 17. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 17 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting pltf's 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada LLC. (Report sent via US Postal to Copyright Office). (RE) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Daniel Macek filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/9/2015, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC for Cobbler Nevada, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cobbler Nevada, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 15-1404, 1406, 1408, 1420, 1421, 1430, 1431, 1432, 1435, 1443, by Plaintiff Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-4189533) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party Cobbler Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Cobbler Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less