This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2018 at 00:12:59 (UTC).

CMG Worldwide Inc. v. Maximum Family Games, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2014 CMG Worldwide Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Maximum Family Games, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-05124

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMG Worldwide Inc.

Defendants

Maximum Family Games, LLC

Slitherine Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew S. Jick(Designation Retained)

Erin R. Ranahan(Designation Retained)

Saul Soheyl Rostamian(Designation Retained)

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Scott MacKay(Designation Retained)

Jason Mattson Flom(Designation Retained)

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT SLITHERINE LIMITED filed by CMG Worldwide Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)

#41

(#41) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT MAXIMUM FAMILY GAMES, LLC filed by CMG Worldwide Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)

#38

(#38) SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2016 - 5/24/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 25, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by CMG Worldwide Inc. filed by CMG Worldwide Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 6, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Maximum Family Games, LLC to Respond to First Amended Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Maximum Family Games, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 8, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Maximum Family Games, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 17, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT SLITHERINE LIMITED filed by CMG Worldwide Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT MAXIMUM FAMILY GAMES, LLC filed by CMG Worldwide Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2016 - 5/24/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 25, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by CMG Worldwide Inc. filed by CMG Worldwide Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 6, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Maximum Family Games, LLC to Respond to First Amended Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Maximum Family Games, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 8, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Maximum Family Games, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 17, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S Jick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saul S Rostamian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin R Ranahan