This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:56:16 (UTC).

Clear With Computers LLC v. Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2014 Clear With Computers LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:14-CV-00089

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clear With Computers LLC

Petitioners

The Mens Wearhouse, Inc.

Bad Boy, Inc.

Altec Industries Inc

Bad Boy Mowers, Inc.

Defendant

Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard C Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

Two Fox Point Center, 6 Denny Road, Suite 307

Wilmington, DE 19809

John J Edmonds

Attorney at Collins Edmonds Schlather & Tower, PLLC

1616 South Voss Road, Suite 125

Houston, TX 77057

Andrew W. Spangler

Attorney at Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

208 N. Green Street, Ste 300

Longview, TX 75601

Petitioner Attorneys

Herbert A Yarbrough, III

Attorney at Yarbrough Wilcox, PLLC

100 E Ferguson, Suite 1015

Tyler, TX 75702

Jennifer Haltom Doan

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100, P O Box 6227

Texarkana, TX 75505

Defendant Attorneys

James Youngkwang Wang

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Dallas

1717 Main St., Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael Andrew Bittner

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Dallas

1717 Main St., Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#26

#27

#28

#29

#30

#31

#32

#33

#34

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT JUDGMENT affirming the Order of the District Court as to 27 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Clear With Computers LLC. Circuit Judges: Moore, Taranto, and Hughes. (Attachments: # 1 USCA-Federal Circuit Ntc of Entry without Opinion, # 2 Info Sheet - Rehearing, # 3 Info Sheet - Writ of Certiorari)(dlc, ) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 32 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, 31 Amended Order & Judgment, and certified copy of docket sheet. (dlc, ) (Entered: 05/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 27 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Clear With Computers LLC (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) AMENDED ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Lead Case 6:14-cv-79 and all consolidated member cases are hereby CLOSED. Any and all outstanding motions are hereby DENIED as MOOT, and the counterclaims of Altec and Men's Wearhouse are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as MOOT. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/12/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT re 27 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Clear With Computers LLC. USCA-Federal Circuit Case Number 15-1528 (dlc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Clear With Computers LLC for proceedings held on 2/4/2015 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap, (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 4/2/15, by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 27 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, Order of Dismissal & Order Dismissing Case in Lead Case, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet(dlc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 25 Order Dismissing Case, 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Clear With Computers LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5130599. Appeal Record due by 4/15/2015. (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Edmonds on behalf of Clear With Computers LLC (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Lead Case 6:14-cv-79 and all consolidated member cases are hereby CLOSED. All outstanding motions are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/20/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC (Bittner, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clear With Computers LLC. Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC served on 3/5/2014, answer due 3/26/2014. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 02/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard C Weinblatt on behalf of Clear With Computers LLC (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Clear With Computers LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clear With Computers LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Volvo Construction Equipment North America LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4519065.), filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clear With Computers LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mens Wearhouse Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bad Boy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTEC INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant