This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:58:10 (UTC).

Clear With Computers LLC v. Rag & Bone Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2014 Clear With Computers LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Rag Bone Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Leonard Davis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:14-CV-00254

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Leonard Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clear With Computers LLC

Defendants

Rag & Bone Inc

Rag & Bone Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard C Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

Two Fox Point Center, 6 Denny Road, Suite 307

Wilmington, DE 19809

Andrew W. Spangler

Attorney at Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

208 N. Green Street, Ste 300

Longview, TX 75601

Defendant Attorneys

David Asher Swetnam-Burland

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

184 Main St, Po Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243-3070

Peter J Brann

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

184 Main St, Po Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243-3070

Stacy O Stitham

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

184 Main St, Po Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243-3070

Jennifer Parker Ainsworth

Attorney at Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

909 Ese Loop 323, Suite 400, P.O. Box 7339

Tyler, TX 75711-7339

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rag & Bone Holdings LLC, Rag & Bone Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4601530.), filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clear With Computers LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Clear With Computers LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Rag & Bone Holdings LLC, Rag & Bone Inc.and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard C Weinblatt on behalf of Clear With Computers LLC (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Clear With Computers LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Rag & Bone Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rag & Bone Holdings LLC (Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacy O Stitham on behalf of Rag & Bone Holdings LLC (Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J Brann on behalf of Rag & Bone Holdings LLC (Brann, Peter) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Rag & Bone Holdings LLC (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2014)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT RAG & BONE HOLDINGS, LLC'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rag & Bone Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#15

(#15) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

#16

(#16) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:14cv079 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/05/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/05/2014)

#17

(#17) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims asserted in this suit between plaintiff Clear With Computers, LLC and defendant Rag & Bone Holdings, LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims asserted in this suit between plaintiff Clear With Computers, LLC and defendant Rag & Bone Holdings, LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:14cv079 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/05/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rag & Bone Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT RAG & BONE HOLDINGS, LLC'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Rag & Bone Holdings LLC (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J Brann on behalf of Rag & Bone Holdings LLC (Brann, Peter) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacy O Stitham on behalf of Rag & Bone Holdings LLC (Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rag & Bone Holdings LLC (Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Rag & Bone Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Clear With Computers LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard C Weinblatt on behalf of Clear With Computers LLC (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Rag & Bone Holdings LLC, Rag & Bone Inc.and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Clear With Computers LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clear With Computers LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Rag & Bone Holdings LLC, Rag & Bone Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4601530.), filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rag & Bone Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Clear With Computers LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Asher Swetnam-Burland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETER J. BRANN