This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:34:08 (UTC).

Clear With Computers LLC v. eBags, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2014 Clear With Computers LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against eBags, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Leonard Davis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:14-CV-00511

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Leonard Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clear With Computers LLC

Defendant

eBags, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard C Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

Two Fox Point Center, 6 Denny Road, Suite 307

Wilmington, DE 19809

Andrew W. Spangler

Attorney at Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

208 N. Green Street, Ste 300

Longview, TX 75601

Defendant Attorney

George T Scott

Attorney at Sheridan Ross PC

1560 Broadway, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202-1541

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against eBags, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4670529.), filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clear With Computers LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Clear With Computers LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to eBags, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard C Weinblatt on behalf of Clear With Computers LLC (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 05/29/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS REISSUED as to eBags, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed as to eBags, Inc. on 9/5/2014, by cert mail; answer due: 9/26/2014. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/25/2014)

#9

(#9) ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by eBags, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Scott, George) Modified on 9/29/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#10

(#10) ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eBags, Inc..( Scott, George) Modified on 9/29/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/29/2014)

#11

(#11) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eBags, Inc..( Scott, George) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

#12

(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First - Amended Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eBags, Inc..( Scott, George) (Entered: 10/02/2014)

#13

(#13) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eBags, Inc..( Scott, George) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Clear With Computers LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

#15

(#15) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims asserted in this suit between plaintiff Clear With Computers, LLC and defendant eBags, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims asserted in this suit between plaintiff Clear With Computers, LLC and defendant eBags, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Clear With Computers LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eBags, Inc..( Scott, George) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Defendant's Unopposed First - Amended Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eBags, Inc..( Scott, George) (Entered: 10/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eBags, Inc..( Scott, George) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eBags, Inc..( Scott, George) Modified on 9/29/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by eBags, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Scott, George) Modified on 9/29/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service Executed as to eBags, Inc. on 9/5/2014, by cert mail; answer due: 9/26/2014. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS REISSUED as to eBags, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard C Weinblatt on behalf of Clear With Computers LLC (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 05/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to eBags, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Clear With Computers LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clear With Computers LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against eBags, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4670529.), filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where eBags, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Clear With Computers LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George T Scott