This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 21:16:43 (UTC).

Chip-Tech, Ltd. v. AVX Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2015 Chip-Tech, Ltd filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against AVX Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-03868

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Ronald M. Whyte

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Schuten Electronics, Inc.

Chip-Tech, Ltd.

Defendants

Panasonic Corporation of North America

KOA Corporation

Panasonic Corporation

Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America

SANYO Electric Co.Ltd.

TDK Corporation

KEMET Electronics Corporation

Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of North America

Vishay Intertechnology, Inc.

TDK U.S.A. Corporation

Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC

KOA Speer Electronics, Inc.

KEMET Corporation

ROHM Co. Ltd.

Sanyo North America Corporation

Panasonic Industrial Devices Sales Company of America

Panasonic Electronic Devices Co. Ltd.

TDK-EPC Corporation

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shana E. Scarlett

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Solomon B. Cera

Attorney at Cera LLP

595 Market Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105-2835

Ryan James McEwan

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.

555 Montgomery Street, Suite 1210

San Francisco, CA 94111

James Gerard Beebe Dallal

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.

555 Montgomery Street, Suite 1210

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joseph R. Saveri

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.

555 Montgomery Street, Suite 1210

San Francisco, CA 94111

C. Andrew Dirksen

Attorney at Cera LLP

595 Market Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Andrew Michael Purdy

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.

555 Montgomery Street, Suite 1210

San Francisco, CA 94111

Matthew Sinclair Weiler

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.

555 Montgomery Street, Suite 1210

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Scott A. Stempel

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

John Clayton Everett, Jr.

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Michelle Park Chiu

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

Katie Michelle Yablonka

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

275 Battery St., 23Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jason C. Murray

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

515 South Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Emily Tomoko Kuwahara

Attorney at Crowell and Moring

515 S. Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jordan Lee Ludwig

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

515 S. Flower St., 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Joshua Courtney Stokes

Attorney at Crowell & Moring

515 S. Flower St., 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Bruce Douglas Sokler

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo

701 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Proposed Summons)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/24/2015) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Proposed Summons (AMENDED))(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/26/2015) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to AVX Corporation, KEMET Corporation, KEMET Electronics Corporation, KOA Corporation, KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, SANYO Electric Co.Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, TDK Corporation, TDK U.S.A. Corporation, TDK-EPC Corporation, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Chip-Tech, Ltd.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/28/2015) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chip-Tech, Ltd. re 7 MOTION to Relate Case (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/28/2015) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Murray (Murray, Jason) (Filed on 9/2/2015) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#38

(#38) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING RELATED CASE DETERMINATION BEFORE HON. RONALD M. WHYTE: Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2015. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#39

(#39) ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 30 Stipulation Re Waiver of Service of Summons and Time to Respond to Complaint. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#40

(#40) PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED ( 15-3868-RMW; 15-4878-HRL15-3820-RMW) filed by Schuten Electronics, Inc. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/27/2015) Modified on 10/28/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#41

(#41) RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (re 40 filed by Chip-Tech, Ltd.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/29/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Appearance of Joshua Courtney Stokes, Emily T. Kuwahara, Jordan L. Ludwig, and Katie Yablonka of the law firm of Crowell & Moring LLP On Behalf Of Defendant KOA Speer Electronics, Inc (Stokes, Joshua) (Filed on 10/29/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#43

(#43) APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRUCE SOKLER TO APPEAR IN PRO HAC VICE and (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9953534.) filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Sokler, Bruce) (Filed on 10/29/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#44

(#44) ORDER Granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as Bruce D. Sokler for Defendant AVX Corporation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/9/2015. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#45

(#45) Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte in case 5:15-cv-03820-RMW; granting (40) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:15-cv-03868-RMW. Associated Cases: 5:15-cv-03868-RMW, 5:15-cv-03820-RMW, 5:15-cv-03907-RMW, 5:15-cv-04042-RMW, 5:15-cv-04201-RMW, 5:15-cv-04206-RMW, 5:15-cv-04878(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#46

(#46) Initial Case Management Order by Judge Ronald M. Whyte.Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2015. The pending stipulations regarding waiver of service of summons and time to respond to the complaints (Case No. 15-cv-3820, Dkt. No. 26; Case No. 15-cv-4042, Dkt. No. 24; Case No. 15-cv-4201, Dkt. No. 21; and Case No. 15-4206, Dkt. No. 10) are ACCEPTED, subject to modification of the time to respond, to be discussed at the initial CMC.Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy's motion to appoint lead counsel (Case No. 15-cv-3820, Dkt. No. 46)is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and may be resubmitted in accordance with the procedures outlined in this order. The hearing on Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy's motion set for November 13, 2015 is hereby VACATED.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Initial Case Management Order by Judge Ronald M. Whyte.Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2015. The pending stipulations regarding waiver of service of summons and time to respond to the complaints (Case No. 15-cv-3820, Dkt. No. 26; Case No. 15-cv-4042, Dkt. No. 24; Case No. 15-cv-4201, Dkt. No. 21; and Case No. 15-4206, Dkt. No. 10) are ACCEPTED, subject to modification of the time to respond, to be discussed at the initial CMC.Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy's motion to appoint lead counsel (Case No. 15-cv-3820, Dkt. No. 46)is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and may be resubmitted in accordance with the procedures outlined in this order. The hearing on Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy's motion set for November 13, 2015 is hereby VACATED.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte in case 5:15-cv-03820-RMW; granting (40) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:15-cv-03868-RMW. Associated Cases: 5:15-cv-03868-RMW, 5:15-cv-03820-RMW, 5:15-cv-03907-RMW, 5:15-cv-04042-RMW, 5:15-cv-04201-RMW, 5:15-cv-04206-RMW, 5:15-cv-04878(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER Granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as Bruce D. Sokler for Defendant AVX Corporation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/9/2015. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRUCE SOKLER TO APPEAR IN PRO HAC VICE and (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9953534.) filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Sokler, Bruce) (Filed on 10/29/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of Appearance of Joshua Courtney Stokes, Emily T. Kuwahara, Jordan L. Ludwig, and Katie Yablonka of the law firm of Crowell & Moring LLP On Behalf Of Defendant KOA Speer Electronics, Inc (Stokes, Joshua) (Filed on 10/29/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (re 40 filed by Chip-Tech, Ltd.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/29/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED ( 15-3868-RMW; 15-4878-HRL15-3820-RMW) filed by Schuten Electronics, Inc. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/27/2015) Modified on 10/28/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 30 Stipulation Re Waiver of Service of Summons and Time to Respond to Complaint. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING RELATED CASE DETERMINATION BEFORE HON. RONALD M. WHYTE: Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2015. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN CLAYTON EVERETT, JR. PRO HAC VICE by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte, granting 32 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Courtney Stokes (Stokes, Joshua) (Filed on 9/2/2015) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Murray (Murray, Jason) (Filed on 9/2/2015) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chip-Tech, Ltd. re 7 MOTION to Relate Case (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/28/2015) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Chip-Tech, Ltd.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/28/2015) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to AVX Corporation, KEMET Corporation, KEMET Electronics Corporation, KOA Corporation, KOA Speer Electronics, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, ROHM Co. Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, SANYO Electric Co.Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, TDK Corporation, TDK U.S.A. Corporation, TDK-EPC Corporation, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Proposed Summons (AMENDED))(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/26/2015) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015) (Entered: 08/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Proposed Summons)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/24/2015) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-9782101.). Filed byChip-Tech, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Civil Cover Sheet)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/24/2015) Modified on 8/25/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less