This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 06:56:44 (UTC).

Checkmate Strategic Group Inc v. Yahoo Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2005 Checkmate Strategic Group Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Yahoo Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge fernando m. olguin and Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:05-CV-04588

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge fernando m. olguin

Judge

Judge Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Checkmate Strategic Group Inc

Petitioners

Ruben Lerma

Larry Ebest

Cyberactive Inc

Backwater Safari Guide Service

Steven Helfand

Daniel Harris

CommodityNews.Net

Defendants

Does

Yahoo Inc

Not Classified By Court

Randal S Ford

Tuscaloosa, AL 35402

Dennis Barba

Chagrin Falls, OH 44023

Chase and Sam.com

XM Works Inc

Elana R Levine

Darren Cohen

Da Vinci Design Group LLC

Digital Playroom Inc

Scott A Miller

Special Master

Gary L Taylor

Orange, CA 92868

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

David B Owen

Attorney at Nemecek & Cole

15260 Ventura Blvd, Ste 920

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-5399

Darren T Kaplan

Attorney at Chitwood Harley Harnes

1230 Peachtree Street, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309

Gregory E Keller

Attorney at Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

1230 Peachtree Street Ne Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309

Richard L Kellner

Attorney at Kabateck Brown Kellner LLP

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Roy L Jacobs

Attorney at Roy Jacobs & Associates

60 East 42Nd Street 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10165

Shawn Khorrami

Attorney at Khorrami Boucher, LLP

444 South Flower Street 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Frank C Liuzzi

Attorney at O'Reilly Collins & Danko

1900 O'Farrell St, Ste 360

San Mateo, CA 94403

Hassan A Zavareei

Attorney at Tycko and Zavareei

2000 L Street, Nw, Suite 808

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

David K Caplan

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

9720 Wilshire Boulevard Penthouse Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Dennis L Wilson

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

9720 Wilshire Boulevard, Penthouse Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Ellie Schwimmer

Attorney at Keats McFarland & Wilson

9720 Wilshire Blvd, Ste Ph

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Emil W Herich

Attorney at Keats McFarland and Wilson

9720 Wilshire Blvd, Penthouse Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Larry W McFarland

Attorney at Keats McFarland & Wilson

9720 Wilshire Blvd, Ste Ph

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Patrick J Carome

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr

2445 M Street, N W

Washington, DC 20037

Scott Kline

Attorney at Andrews Kurth

1717 Main Street, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Terry L Higham

Attorney at Barton Klugman and Oetting LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3485

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Charles M Thompson

Attorney at Charles M Thompson PC

1401 Doug Baker Blvd, Suite 107-135

Birmingham, AL 35242

C Benjamin Nutley

Attorney at Kendrick & Nutley

1055 E Colorado Blvd., 5Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91106

James Garrett Kendrick

Attorney at Kendrick & Nutley

1055 E. Colorado Blvd., 5Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91106

Steven L Miller

Attorney at Steven L Miller Law Office APC

16133 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 645

Encino, CA 91436

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendants Yahoo Inc, Does 1 through 100, inclusive.(Filing fee $ 250 paid) jury demanded. , filed by plaintiff Checkmate Strategic Group Inc.(pj, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Checkmate Strategic Group Inc. (pj, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(pj, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the date of the FRCP 16(b) scheduling conference and to report to the Court not later than 14 days after they confer on a discovery plan and the other matters required by FRCP 26(f) and the Local Rules of this Court. (jp, ) (Entered: 07/01/2005)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Checkmate Strategic Group Inc, upon Yahoo Inc., a California corporation served on 6/29/2005, answer due 7/19/2005. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal statute, upon CT Corporation System, agent for service of process by leaving the documents with Gerome Jones, Process Specialist. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (jp, ) (Entered: 07/08/2005)

#6

(#6) FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint. Yahoo Inc answer due 9/2/2005. filed by defendant Yahoo Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)

#7

(#7) Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/08/2005)

#8

(#8) APPLICATION for attorney Patrick J. Carome to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE Paid. filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc. Lodged proposed order. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/09/2005)

#9

(#9) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder : Granting 8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick J. Carome on behalf of Defendant, designating Larry W. McFarland as local counsel. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/09/2005)

#229

(#229) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Special Master Gary L. Taylor (Retired) filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/2/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Appointing the Honorable Gary L. Taylor (Retired) as Special Master)(Caplan, David) (Entered: 10/07/2009)

#230

(#230) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Stipulation for Order. Filer utilized the Motion to Appoint Special Master event in docketing this filing, and set this matter on the judge's calendar for 11/2/2009. As this matter was filed as a Stipulation, clerk has removed this Stipulation, only, from the 11/2/2009 calendar RE: Stipulation Regarding the Appointment of the Honorable Gary L. Taylor (Retired) as Special Master filed 10/7/2009 229 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (gk) (Entered: 10/08/2009)

#231

(#231) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder Appointing The Honorable Gary L. Taylor (Retired) as Special Master. The Court, ORDERS as follows: the Honorable Judge Gary L. Taylor U.S.D.J. (retired) is appointed by this Court as a Special Master to perform the functions of the Special Master, as detailed in Paragraph 32. v.(k) of the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement. Re: Stipulation 229 . (mg) (Entered: 10/08/2009)

#232

(#232) RESULTS REPORT of RESULTS OF SPECIAL MASTER'S INDEPENDENT REVIEW OF PROCESSES AND PROCEDURES filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc. (Wilson, Dennis) (Entered: 01/06/2010)

#233

(#233) NOTICE Notice of Filing of Results of Special Master's Independent Review of Processes and Procedures and Request that the Court Discharge the Honorable Gary L. Taylor as Special Master filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc. (Wilson, Dennis) (Entered: 01/06/2010)

#234

(#234) NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant, Yahoo! re Notice (Other) 233 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Discharging the Honorable Gary L. Taylor (Retired) as Special Master)(Wilson, Dennis) (Entered: 01/06/2010)

#235

(#235) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc, re Report 232 (Wilson, Dennis) (Entered: 01/07/2010)

#236

(#236) ORDER DISCHARGING THE HONORABLE GARY L. TAYLOR (RETIRED) AS SPECIAL MASTER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court orders that the Honorable Gary L. Taylor U.S.D.J. (retired) has completed the functions of the Special Master, as detailed in Paragraph 32. v. (k) of the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement, and is discharged by this Court as a Special Master. (gk) (Entered: 01/08/2010)

#237

(#237) MOTION for Leave to File Objections Instanter; OBJECTIONS to the Proposed Settlement filed by Objector Dennis Barba. (gk) (Entered: 01/11/2010)

224 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#237) MOTION for Leave to File Objections Instanter; OBJECTIONS to the Proposed Settlement filed by Objector Dennis Barba. (gk) (Entered: 01/11/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#236) ORDER DISCHARGING THE HONORABLE GARY L. TAYLOR (RETIRED) AS SPECIAL MASTER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court orders that the Honorable Gary L. Taylor U.S.D.J. (retired) has completed the functions of the Special Master, as detailed in Paragraph 32. v. (k) of the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement, and is discharged by this Court as a Special Master. (gk) (Entered: 01/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#235) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc, re Report 232 (Wilson, Dennis) (Entered: 01/07/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#234) NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant, Yahoo! re Notice (Other) 233 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Discharging the Honorable Gary L. Taylor (Retired) as Special Master)(Wilson, Dennis) (Entered: 01/06/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#233) NOTICE Notice of Filing of Results of Special Master's Independent Review of Processes and Procedures and Request that the Court Discharge the Honorable Gary L. Taylor as Special Master filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc. (Wilson, Dennis) (Entered: 01/06/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#232) RESULTS REPORT of RESULTS OF SPECIAL MASTER'S INDEPENDENT REVIEW OF PROCESSES AND PROCEDURES filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc. (Wilson, Dennis) (Entered: 01/06/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#231) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder Appointing The Honorable Gary L. Taylor (Retired) as Special Master. The Court, ORDERS as follows: the Honorable Judge Gary L. Taylor U.S.D.J. (retired) is appointed by this Court as a Special Master to perform the functions of the Special Master, as detailed in Paragraph 32. v.(k) of the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement. Re: Stipulation 229 . (mg) (Entered: 10/08/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#230) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Stipulation for Order. Filer utilized the Motion to Appoint Special Master event in docketing this filing, and set this matter on the judge's calendar for 11/2/2009. As this matter was filed as a Stipulation, clerk has removed this Stipulation, only, from the 11/2/2009 calendar RE: Stipulation Regarding the Appointment of the Honorable Gary L. Taylor (Retired) as Special Master filed 10/7/2009 229 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (gk) (Entered: 10/08/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#229) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Special Master Gary L. Taylor (Retired) filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/2/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Appointing the Honorable Gary L. Taylor (Retired) as Special Master)(Caplan, David) (Entered: 10/07/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#228) ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 204 filed by Da Vinci Design Group LLC, CCA # 07-55594. The motion for reconsideration is denied. Order received in this district on 5/1/2008. (dmap) (Entered: 05/05/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION for attorney Darren T. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE Paid. filed by Plaintiff Checkmate Strategic Group Inc. Lodged order. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/09/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder : Granting 8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick J. Carome on behalf of Defendant, designating Larry W. McFarland as local counsel. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/09/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION for attorney Patrick J. Carome to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE Paid. filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc. Lodged proposed order. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/09/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Yahoo Inc. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/08/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint. Yahoo Inc answer due 9/2/2005. filed by defendant Yahoo Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Checkmate Strategic Group Inc, upon Yahoo Inc., a California corporation served on 6/29/2005, answer due 7/19/2005. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal statute, upon CT Corporation System, agent for service of process by leaving the documents with Gerome Jones, Process Specialist. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (jp, ) (Entered: 07/08/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the date of the FRCP 16(b) scheduling conference and to report to the Court not later than 14 days after they confer on a discovery plan and the other matters required by FRCP 26(f) and the Local Rules of this Court. (jp, ) (Entered: 07/01/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(pj, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Checkmate Strategic Group Inc. (pj, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendants Yahoo Inc, Does 1 through 100, inclusive.(Filing fee $ 250 paid) jury demanded. , filed by plaintiff Checkmate Strategic Group Inc.(pj, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cyberactive Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Yahoo! Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn Khorrami

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darren T. Kaplan