This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2016 at 01:25:09 (UTC).

CHECKER CAB PHILADELPHIA, INC. et al v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2014 CHECKER CAB PHILADELPHIA, INC filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-07265

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOCIETY TAXI, INC.

KB TRANS, INC.

MAF TRANS, INC.

MG TRANS CO., INC.

CHECKER CAB PHILADELPHIA, INC.

JANE CAB COMPANY

ATS CAB, INC.

NOBLE CAB, INC.

BOND TAXI, INC.

SF TAXI, INC.

L&M TAXI, INC.

RAV TRANS, INC.

Defendants

ZAYE EL BEY

FELIX A. DELAHOZ

GOOGLE VENTURES, LLC

TIMOTHY JUDELSOHN

JON FELDMAN

RASIER, LLC

VICTOR ABIODUN FAKOLUJO

GEGEN, LLC

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZACHARY L. GRAYSON

Attorney at SALAMAN GRAYSON PC

100 South Broad St

Philadelphia, PA 19110-1003

MICHAEL S. HENRY

Attorney at SALAMAN GRAYSON & HENRY PC

100 S Broad St Suite 650

Philadelphia, PA 19110

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES HICKEY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J. GALLAGHER, PC

1760 Market St., Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DAVID P. TEMPLE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J. GALLAGHER, P.C.

1760 Market St., Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

WESLEY R. PAYNE

Attorney at WHITE AND WILLIAMS LLP

1800 One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7395

TONYA MICHELLE HARRIS

Attorney at WHITE & WILLIAMS LLP

1650 Market St, One Liberty Pl Suite 1800

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7395

STEPHEN A. SWEDLOW

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP

500 West Madison St Suite 2450

Chicago, IL 60661

A. SCOTT BOLDEN

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

1301 K Street Nw, Suite 1000 East Tower

Washington, DC 20005-3317

CAROLYN P. SHORT

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

Three Logan Square, 1717 Market Street, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

NIPUN J. PATEL

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SHANNON ELISE MCCLURE

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

Three Logan, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Travis Kalanick by USPS Certified Mail on January 5, 2015 (HENRY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

#78

(#78) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT re 69 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (aeg, ) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#77

(#77) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 76 ) IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/7/2015. 8/10/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, ) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN P. SHORT on behalf of JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHORT, CAROLYN) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#73

(#73) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by GOOGLE VENTURES, LLC.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply Brief)(SWEDLOW, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID P. TEMPLE on behalf of ZAYE EL BEY, GEORGE ROBERT HOLMES, JR, FELIPE ISRAEL MUNOZ MORENO, PHARIDE ERNEST ROUFAI, WILLIAM E. SMITH, DAVID A. BIEKER, JONATHON M. BRANNAN, SHAHRAIR CHOWDHURY, FELIX A. DELAHOZ, VICTOR ABIODUN FAKOLUJO, WAQAR Y. GRUMMAN, JEAN LITARD JEAN-PHILLIPPE, TIMOTHY JUDELSOHN, IGOR KHMIL, RAYMOND REYES, LEE RUDAKEWYCH, ISFANDIYOR THUSANOV (TEMPLE, DAVID) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#79

(#79) NOTICE by JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. of Supplemental Authority (SHORT, CAROLYN) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

#76

(#76) MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SHORT, CAROLYN) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#80

(#80) Statement of Corporate Affiliations by GOOGLE VENTURES, LLC. (SWEDLOW, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#74

(#74) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE VENTURES LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 73 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/4/2015. 8/4/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, ) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES HICKEY on behalf of ZAYE EL BEY, GEORGE ROBERT HOLMES, JR, FELIPE ISRAEL MUNOZ MORENO, PHARIDE ERNEST ROUFAI, WILLIAM E. SMITH, DAVID A. BIEKER, JONATHON M. BRANNAN, SHAHRAIR CHOWDHURY, FELIX A. DELAHOZ, VICTOR ABIODUN FAKOLUJO, WAQAR Y. GRUMMAN, JEAN LITARD JEAN-PHILLIPPE, TIMOTHY JUDELSOHN, IGOR KHMIL, RAYMOND REYES, LEE RUDAKEWYCH, ISFANDIYOR THUSANOV (HICKEY, JAMES) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Edgar Estrada re: served Summons and Complaint upon Google Ventures, LLC by Personal service on 1/21/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HENRY, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/6/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 02/05/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SHANNON ELISE MCCLURE on behalf of JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCCLURE, SHANNON) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#81

(#81) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ZACHARY L. GRAYSON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(GRAYSON, ZACHARY) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by NIPUN J. PATEL on behalf of JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(PATEL, NIPUN) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kenneth Browning re: served Summons and Complaint upon Uber Technologies, Rasier LLC, Gegen LLC on 1/23/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HENRY, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/6/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 02/05/2015)

#75

(#75) DEFENDANT GOOGLE VENTURES, LLC'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 68 ) filed by GOOGLE VENTURES, LLC. (aeg, ) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ZACHARY L. GRAYSON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(GRAYSON, ZACHARY) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) Statement of Corporate Affiliations by GOOGLE VENTURES, LLC. (SWEDLOW, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) NOTICE by JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. of Supplemental Authority (SHORT, CAROLYN) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT re 69 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (aeg, ) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 76 ) IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/7/2015. 8/10/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, ) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SHORT, CAROLYN) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) DEFENDANT GOOGLE VENTURES, LLC'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 68 ) filed by GOOGLE VENTURES, LLC. (aeg, ) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE VENTURES LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 73 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/4/2015. 8/4/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, ) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by GOOGLE VENTURES, LLC.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply Brief)(SWEDLOW, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) RESPONSE in Opposition re 68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Second filed by AF TAXI, INC., AG TAXI, INC., AGB TRANS, INC., ATS CAB, INC., BATYAM CAB COMPANY, BOND TAXI, INC., BSP TRANS, INC., CHECKER CAB PHILADELPHIA, INC., DB TAXICAB CO., DG CAB, INC., DR CAB, INC., FAD TRANS, INC., GA CAB, INC., GD CAB, INC., GLOBAL CAB, INC., GN TRANS, INC., GOD BLESS AMERICA TRANS, INC., GOR TRANS, INC., GRACE TRANS, INC., IA TRANS CO, INC., IL TRANS, INC., JANE CAB COMPANY, JAYDAN, INC., KB TRANS, INC., L&M TAXI, INC., LAN TRANS CO., LMB TAXI, INC., MAF TRANS, INC., MDS TRANS, INC., MG TRANS CO., INC., MO TAXI, INC., NOBLE CAB, INC., RAV TRANS, INC., RD CAB, INC., SAJ TRANS, INC., SF TAXI, INC., SOCIETY TAXI, INC., SS TAXI CAB, INC., STEELE TAXI, INC., TGIF TRANS, INC., V &S TAXI, INC., VAL TRANS, INC., VB TRANS, INC., VSM TRANS, INC.. (HENRY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs re: Fredericks and Palmer served Summons and Complaint upon Waqar Ghumman on 1/5/15, Shahariar Chowdry 1/4/15, Pharide Roufai on 1/4/15, Zaye El Bey on 1/4/15, Igor Khmil on 1/5/15, Lee Rudakewych on 1/11/15, Victor Fakoluto on 1/5/15, Isfandiyor Tuhsavov 1/5/15. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HENRY, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/6/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Edgar Estrada re: served Summons and Complaint upon Google Ventures, LLC by Personal service on 1/21/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HENRY, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/6/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kenneth Browning re: served Summons and Complaint upon Uber Technologies, Rasier LLC, Gegen LLC on 1/23/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HENRY, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/6/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by NIPUN J. PATEL on behalf of JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(PATEL, NIPUN) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SHANNON ELISE MCCLURE on behalf of JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCCLURE, SHANNON) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN P. SHORT on behalf of JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, TRAVIS KALANICK, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHORT, CAROLYN) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES HICKEY on behalf of ZAYE EL BEY, GEORGE ROBERT HOLMES, JR, FELIPE ISRAEL MUNOZ MORENO, PHARIDE ERNEST ROUFAI, WILLIAM E. SMITH, DAVID A. BIEKER, JONATHON M. BRANNAN, SHAHRAIR CHOWDHURY, FELIX A. DELAHOZ, VICTOR ABIODUN FAKOLUJO, WAQAR Y. GRUMMAN, JEAN LITARD JEAN-PHILLIPPE, TIMOTHY JUDELSOHN, IGOR KHMIL, RAYMOND REYES, LEE RUDAKEWYCH, ISFANDIYOR THUSANOV (HICKEY, JAMES) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID P. TEMPLE on behalf of ZAYE EL BEY, GEORGE ROBERT HOLMES, JR, FELIPE ISRAEL MUNOZ MORENO, PHARIDE ERNEST ROUFAI, WILLIAM E. SMITH, DAVID A. BIEKER, JONATHON M. BRANNAN, SHAHRAIR CHOWDHURY, FELIX A. DELAHOZ, VICTOR ABIODUN FAKOLUJO, WAQAR Y. GRUMMAN, JEAN LITARD JEAN-PHILLIPPE, TIMOTHY JUDELSOHN, IGOR KHMIL, RAYMOND REYES, LEE RUDAKEWYCH, ISFANDIYOR THUSANOV (TEMPLE, DAVID) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Travis Kalanick by USPS Certified Mail on January 5, 2015 (HENRY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ZAYE EL BEY, GEORGE ROBERT HOLMES, JR, FELIPE ISRAEL MUNOZ MORENO, PHARIDE ERNEST ROUFAI, WILLIAM E. SMITH, DAVID A. BIEKER, JONATHON M. BRANNAN, SHAHRAIR CHOWDHURY, FELIX A. DELAHOZ, VICTOR ABIODUN FAKOLUJO, JON FELDMAN, GEGEN, LLC, GOOGLE VENTURES, LLC, WAQAR Y. GRUMMAN, JEAN LITARD JEAN-PHILLIPPE, TIMOTHY JUDELSOHN, TRAVIS KALANICK, IGOR KHMIL, RASIER, LLC, RAYMOND REYES, LEE RUDAKEWYCH, ISFANDIYOR THUSANOV, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113447.), filed by DR CAB, INC., KB TRANS, INC., LMB TAXI, INC., DB TAXICAB CO., TGIF TRANS, INC., VAL TRANS, INC., GLOBAL CAB, INC., L&M TAXI, INC., NOBLE CAB, INC., BOND TAXI, INC., MO TAXI, INC., MG TRANS CO., INC., SS TAXI CAB, INC., FAD TRANS, INC., AGB TRANS, INC., SF TAXI, INC., LAN TRANS CO., DG CAB, INC., JANE CAB COMPANY, GOD BLESS AMERICA TRANS, INC., GD CAB, INC., GRACE TRANS, INC., RD CAB, INC., MDS TRANS, INC., IL TRANS, INC., JAYDAN, INC., BATYAM CAB COMPANY, CHECKER CAB PHILADELPHIA, INC., STEELE TAXI, INC., SOCIETY TAXI, INC., VB TRANS, INC., MAF TRANS, INC., ATS CAB, INC., IA TRANS CO, INC., SAJ TRANS, INC., VSM TRANS, INC., GOR TRANS, INC., V &S TAXI, INC., BSP TRANS, INC., GN TRANS, INC., AG TAXI, INC., GA CAB, INC., RAV TRANS, INC., AF TAXI, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, ) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.