This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2016 at 07:10:37 (UTC).

CDMO, Inc. et al v. Comfort Dental Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2014 CDMO, Inc filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Comfort Dental Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard P. Matsch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00871

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard P. Matsch

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CDMO, Inc.

CDET, Inc.

Defendant

Comfort Dental Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neil L. Arney

Attorney at Kutak Rock, LLP-Denver

1801 California Street, #3100

Denver, CO 80202-2626

Thomas James Kenny

Attorney at Kutak Rock, LLP-Omaha

1650 Farnam Street, The Omaha Building

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Defendant Attorneys

William Frederick Jones

Attorney at Moye White, LLP

1400 16Th Street, 16 Market Square, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202-1486

Dean Elliot Richardson

Attorney at Moye White, LLP

1400 16Th Street, 16 Market Square, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202-1486

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COMFORT DENTAL GROUP, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-3794009)Attorney Neil L. Arney added to party CDET, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Neil L. Arney added to party CDMO, Inc. (pty:pla), filed by CDMO, Inc., CDET, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit E-1, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Summons)(Arney, Neil) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

#2

(#2) Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 03/26/2014)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent form issued pursuant to Local Rule (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 03/26/2014)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Prevent Defendant Comfort Dental Group, Inc. from Enforcing Provisions of the Master Franchisor Agreement and Request for Hearing by Plaintiffs CDET, Inc., CDMO, Inc.. (Arney, Neil) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

#5

(#5) BRIEF in Support of 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Prevent Defendant Comfort Dental Group, Inc. from Enforcing Provisions of the Master Franchisor Agreement and Request for Hearing filed by Plaintiffs CDET, Inc., CDMO, Inc.. (Arney, Neil) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

6 #2

Exhibit L

6 #1

Exhibit K-1

#6

No Description Available

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas James Kenny on behalf of CDET, Inc., CDMO, Inc. Attorney Thomas James Kenny added to party CDET, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Thomas James Kenny added to party CDMO, Inc. (pty:pla) (Kenny, Thomas) (Entered: 04/10/2014)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CDMO, Inc., CDET, Inc.. Comfort Dental Group, Inc. waiver sent on 3/27/2014, answer due 5/27/2014. (Arney, Neil) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Frederick Jones on behalf of Comfort Dental Group, Inc.Attorney William Frederick Jones added to party Comfort Dental Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jones, William) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dean Elliot Richardson on behalf of Comfort Dental Group, Inc.Attorney Dean Elliot Richardson added to party Comfort Dental Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Richardson, Dean) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Prevent Defendant Comfort Dental Group, Inc. from Enforcing Provisions of the Master Franchisor Agreement and Request for Hearing by Defendant Comfort Dental Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Re Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. 4])(Richardson, Dean) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

#12

(#12) ORDER Granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time re 4 : Defendant shall have up to,and including, May 12, 2014, in which to file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/2/2014.(jsmit) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time re 4 : Defendant shall have up to,and including, May 12, 2014, in which to file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/2/2014.(jsmit) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Prevent Defendant Comfort Dental Group, Inc. from Enforcing Provisions of the Master Franchisor Agreement and Request for Hearing by Defendant Comfort Dental Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Re Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. 4])(Richardson, Dean) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dean Elliot Richardson on behalf of Comfort Dental Group, Inc.Attorney Dean Elliot Richardson added to party Comfort Dental Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Richardson, Dean) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Frederick Jones on behalf of Comfort Dental Group, Inc.Attorney William Frederick Jones added to party Comfort Dental Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jones, William) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CDMO, Inc., CDET, Inc.. Comfort Dental Group, Inc. waiver sent on 3/27/2014, answer due 5/27/2014. (Arney, Neil) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas James Kenny on behalf of CDET, Inc., CDMO, Inc. Attorney Thomas James Kenny added to party CDET, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Thomas James Kenny added to party CDMO, Inc. (pty:pla) (Kenny, Thomas) (Entered: 04/10/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Craig Bahr (Exhibit 1) regarding Brief in Support of Motion, 5 by Plaintiffs CDET, Inc., CDMO, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K-1, # 2 Exhibit L)(Arney, Neil) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BRIEF in Support of 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Prevent Defendant Comfort Dental Group, Inc. from Enforcing Provisions of the Master Franchisor Agreement and Request for Hearing filed by Plaintiffs CDET, Inc., CDMO, Inc.. (Arney, Neil) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Prevent Defendant Comfort Dental Group, Inc. from Enforcing Provisions of the Master Franchisor Agreement and Request for Hearing by Plaintiffs CDET, Inc., CDMO, Inc.. (Arney, Neil) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent form issued pursuant to Local Rule (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 03/26/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 03/26/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against COMFORT DENTAL GROUP, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-3794009)Attorney Neil L. Arney added to party CDET, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Neil L. Arney added to party CDMO, Inc. (pty:pla), filed by CDMO, Inc., CDET, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit E-1, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Summons)(Arney, Neil) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMFORT DENTAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Frederick Jones