This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2018 12:46:35

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 03/19/1991 a Intellectual Property - Copyright case was filed by CCC Information Serv against Maclean Hunter in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 2:91-CV-00264
  • Filing Date 03/19/1991
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Intellectual Property - Copyright
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Alan H. Nevas
  • Courthouse Connecticut District

Party Details

  • Defendant Maclean Hunter Market Reports, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • William E. Jackson
    • Stephen M. Feldman
    • Abner W. Sibal
  • Consolidated Plaintiff Thomson Publishing Corp
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Creative Automation Co.
  • Represented By
    • William E. Jackson
    • Stephen M. Feldman
    • Abner W. Sibal
  • Plaintiff CCC Information Services, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Sheldon Karon
    • Stephen M. Heaton
    • Christopher A. Bloom

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/1996
  • Case closed (Former Employee) (Entered: 04/29/1996)
  • 04/29/1996
  • ENDORSEMENT approving [211-1] dismissal stipulation ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 04/29/1996)
  • 04/29/1996
  • (#213) CONSENT JUDGMENT On MacLean Hunter's Motion for a Permanent Injunction ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 04/29/1996)
  • 04/25/1996
  • (#212) NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 16(b) Settlement. Case reported settled on 4/24/96 Dismissal due 5/24/96 ( Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Montz, A.) (Entered: 04/25/1996)
  • 04/24/1996
  • (#211) STIPULATION of dismissal of case as to MacLean Hunter Marke, Creative Automation, Ccc Information Serv, Thomson Publishing (Former Employee) (Entered: 04/25/1996)
  • 01/26/1996
  • ENDORSEMENT granting [210-1] stipulation, withdrawing [197-1] motion for Permanent Injunction Against CCC'S Copyright Infringement, [195-1] motion for Leave to Serve Second Supplemental Pleading Under FRCP 15(d) ( signed by Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith ) (Gothers, M.) Modified on 03/06/1996 (Entered: 01/26/1996)
  • 01/26/1996
  • (#210) JOINT STIPULATION ORDER to Withdraw pending Motions & Set Further Status to by MacLean Hunter Marke, Creative Automation, Ccc Information Serv (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 01/26/1996)
  • 11/16/1995
  • (#209) Supplemental Opposition by Ccc Information Serv to [197-1] motion for Permanent Injunction Against CCC'S Copyright Infringement by MacLean Hunter Marke (Former Employee) (Entered: 11/16/1995)
  • 11/08/1995
  • (#208) Declaration of John F. Heffinger, Jr. by MacLean Hunter Marke Re [207-1] support memorandum by MacLean Hunter Marke, [197-1] motion for Permanent Injunction Against CCC'S Copyright Infringement by MacLean Hunter Marke (Former Employee) (Entered: 11/09/1995)
  • 11/08/1995
  • (#207) SUPPLEMENTAL Brief by MacLean Hunter Marke in support of Proposed [197-1] motion for Permanent Injunction Against CCC'S Copyright Infringement by MacLean Hunter Marke (Former Employee) (Entered: 11/09/1995)
  • 10/23/1995
  • (#204) AFFIDAVIT of Carlos Navarro by Ccc Information Serv Re [197-1] motion for Permanent Injunction Against CCC'S Copyright Infringement by MacLean Hunter Marke (Former Employee) (Entered: 10/23/1995)
  • 10/19/1995
  • Record on Appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals, Regarding [180-1] appeal by MacLean Hunter Marke . Receipt mailed to USCA. (Blue,A.) (Entered: 10/20/1995)
  • 10/17/1995
  • Deadline updated; Brief Deadline set for 10/27/95 [197-1] motion for Permanent Injunction Against CCC'S Copyright Infringement & Responses due 11/6/95 (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 10/20/1995)
  • 10/17/1995
  • MINUTE Entry: [197-1] motion for Permanent Injunction Against CCC'S Copyright Infringement under advisement ( TPS) (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 10/20/1995)
  • 10/17/1995
  • (#203) Motion hearing held re: [197-1] motion for Permanent Injunction Against CCC'S Copyright Infringement by MacLean Hunter Marke ( TPS) (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 10/20/1995)
  • 10/04/1995
  • Motion hearing re: [197-1] motion for Permanent Injunction Against CCC'S Copyright Infringement by MacLean Hunter Marke set at 10:00 10/17/95, [195-1] motion for Leave to Serve Second Supplemental Pleading Under FRCP 15(d) by MacLean Hunter Marke set at 10:00 10/17/95 ( TPS) (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 10/10/1995)
  • 09/22/1995
  • (#202) NOTICE to counsel governing the procedural aspects of the consolidation; mail to all counsel of record. (Former Employee) (Entered: 09/25/1995)
  • 09/20/1995
  • Consolidated Lead Case (Former Employee) (Entered: 09/22/1995)
  • 09/20/1995
  • (#201) ORDER, Consolidating Case with docket number(s):3:95cv1021 ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 09/22/1995)
  • 06/26/1995
  • (#206) Exhibits CONFIDENTIAL - Statements of UNDISPUTED FACTS by MacLean Hunter Marke - (FILED UNDER SEAL) (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 10/27/1995)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.