This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 08:23:20 (UTC).

Castaneda-Flores et al v. Maricopa, County of et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2014 Castaneda-Flores filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Maricopa, County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Susan R Bolton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-01960

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Susan R Bolton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brenda Santana

Octavio Castaneda-Flores

Defendants

Unknown Cuellar

Arizona, State of

Wendy Rush

W Tattnall Rush

Sally Cuellar

Michael Gannon

Unknown Gannon

Maricopa, County of

Unknown Parties

Connie Oberly

Christopher Oberly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebecca S Masterson

Attorney at Smith Masterson Law LLC

1440 E Missouri Ave., Ste. 225

Phoenix, AZ 85014

Dulce Gonzalez Rivas

Attorney at Alagha Law PLLC

P.O. Box 30587

Phoenix, AZ 85046

Joel B Robbins

Attorney at Robbins & Curtin PLLC

301 E Bethany Home Rd., Ste. B100

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3312

Benjamin Leigh Rundall

Attorney at Robbins & Curtin PLLC

301 E Bethany Home Rd., Ste. B100

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3312

Dori Lynn Zavala

Attorney at Zavala Law Offices LLC

1440 E Missouri Ave., Ste. 225

Phoenix, AZ 85014

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie Susan Elliott

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

15 S 15Th Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85007

James B Bowen

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1275 W Washington

Phoenix, AZ 85007-2926

G Michael Tryon

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1275 W Washington St.

Phoenix, AZ 85007

Ann Thompson Uglietta

Attorney at Maricopa County Attorneys Office - Civil Services Division

222 N Central Ave., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85004

J Kenneth Mangum

Attorney at Maricopa County Attorney's Office -Phoenix (Central Ave

222 N Central Ave., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2206

Sarah Nicole O'Keefe

Attorney at Burch & Cracchiolo PA

702 E Osborn Rd., Ste. 200

Phoenix, AZ 85014

Brian Kaven

Attorney at Burch & Cracchiolo PA

Po Box 16882

Phoenix, AZ 85011-6882

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2016
  • (#220) NOTICE of Settlement by Arizona, State of, Michael Gannon, Christopher Oberly, Connie Oberly. (Tryon, G) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • (#219) NOTICE of Settlement by Maricopa, County of, W Tattnall Rush, Wendy Rush. (Mangum, J) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • (#218) NOTICE of Deposition of Brenda Santana, filed by Arizona, State of, Michael Gannon, Christopher Oberly, Connie Oberly. (Elliott, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • (#217) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona, State of, Michael Gannon, Christopher Oberly, Connie Oberly. (Elliott, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • (#216) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona, State of, Michael Gannon, Christopher Oberly, Connie Oberly. (Elliott, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • (#215) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Octavio Castaneda-Flores. (Robbins, Joel) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • (#214) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Octavio Castaneda-Flores. (Robbins, Joel) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • (#213) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona, State of, Michael Gannon, Christopher Oberly, Connie Oberly. (Elliott, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • (#212) NOTICE of Deposition of Brenda Santana, filed by Maricopa, County of, W Tattnall Rush, Wendy Rush. (Mangum, J) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • (#211) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Sally Cuellar. (Kaven, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2014
  • (#10) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Octavio Castaneda-Flores: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8-29-2014 to W. Tattnall Rush. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Process)(Masterson, Rebecca) *Modified on 9/19/2014; same PDF document as #9 and #11* (REW). (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • (#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Octavio Castaneda-Flores: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 7-8-2014 to Maricopa County . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Process)(Masterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • (#8) NOTICE re: of Service by Octavio Castaneda-Flores re: 3 Order . (Zavala, Dori) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Defendant Sally Cuellar by Octavio Castaneda-Flores. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zavala, Dori) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Sally Cuellar, Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • (#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Octavio Castaneda-Flores. (Masterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • (#4) SUMMONS Submitted by Octavio Castaneda-Flores. (Masterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • (#3) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/9/14. (MAW) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10839981. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-01960-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2014-008249. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-10839981 filed by Arizona, State of, Maricopa, County of, W Tattnall Rush, Sally Cuellar, Michael Gannon, Christopher Oberly. (submitted by James Bowen) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(REK) (Entered: 09/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.